New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc. v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc.
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Secret Service, Federal Protective Service, Office of Intelligence and Analysis and Federal Protective Services
Case Number: 1:2022cv05928
Filed: July 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #30 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from David Farber dated 9/7/2022., #1 Complaint. The request is granted. The government shall answer or otherwise respond by September 16, 2022. SO ORDERED. ( All Defendants ). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/8/22) (yv)
September 7, 2022 Filing 30 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from David Farber dated 9/7/2022. Document filed by Federal Protective Services, Office of Intelligence and Analysis, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Secret Service..(Farber, David)
August 24, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David E. Farber on behalf of Federal Protective Services, Office of Intelligence and Analysis, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Secret Service..(Farber, David)
August 12, 2022 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint,,,, served. Office of Intelligence and Analysis served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/19/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc)
August 12, 2022 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint,,,, served. Federal Protective Services served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/19/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc)
August 12, 2022 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint,,,, served. United States Secret Service served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/19/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc)
August 12, 2022 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint,,,, served. United States Customs and Border Protection served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/19/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc)
August 12, 2022 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint,,,, served. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/19/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc)
August 12, 2022 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint,,,, served. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/19/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc)
July 15, 2022 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of Intelligence and Analysis..(sj)
July 15, 2022 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Protective Services..(sj)
July 15, 2022 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Secret Service..(sj)
July 15, 2022 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Customs and Border Protection. (sj)
July 15, 2022 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (sj)
July 15, 2022 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (sj)
July 14, 2022 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of Intelligence and Analysis, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc)
July 14, 2022 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Protective Services, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc)
July 14, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Secret Service, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc)
July 14, 2022 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Customs and Border Protection, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc)
July 14, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc)
July 14, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc)
July 14, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Feldman Tarantolo on behalf of New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Tarantolo, Danielle)
July 13, 2022 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 13, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 13, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 13, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marc Raymond Suskin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Federal Protective Service. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
July 13, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Marc Raymond Suskin to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Caption title does not exactly match complaint caption title ( Federal Protective Services). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
July 12, 2022 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc)
July 12, 2022 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of Intelligence and Analysis, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc) Modified on 7/13/2022 (pc).
July 12, 2022 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Protective Service, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc) Modified on 7/13/2022 (pc).
July 12, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Secret Service, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc) Modified on 7/13/2022 (pc).
July 12, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Customs and Border Protection, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc) Modified on 7/13/2022 (pc).
July 12, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc) Modified on 7/13/2022 (pc).
July 12, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc...(Suskin, Marc) Modified on 7/13/2022 (pc).
July 12, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Suskin, Marc)
July 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Protective Service, Office of Intelligence and Analysis, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Secret Service. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26400235)Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request to DHS and ICE, #2 Exhibit B - 2021-HQFO-00013, #3 Exhibit C - BP-2021-000784, #4 Exhibit D - USSS-20210010, #5 Exhibit E - October 15, 2020, USSS Reply, #6 Exhibit F - 2021-ICFO-04458, #7 Exhibit G - 2021-IAFO-00006, #8 Exhibit H - February 2, 2021 NYLAG Response, #9 Exhibit I - February 11, 2021 Letter from DHS, #10 Exhibit J - Administrative Appeal, #11 Exhibit K - September 3, 2021 Letter, #12 Exhibit L - September 3, 2021 Letter, #13 Exhibit M - 2021-HQAP-00226, #14 Exhibit N - 2021-HQAP-00226, #15 Exhibit O - 2021-HQAP-00226, #16 Exhibit P - 2021-HQAP-00227, #17 Exhibit Q - 2021-HQAP-00227, #18 Exhibit R - 2021-HQAP-00227).(Suskin, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc. v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Legal Assistance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Raymond Suskin
Represented By: Danielle Feldman Tarantolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: David E. Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: David E. Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: David E. Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Secret Service
Represented By: David E. Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Protective Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Intelligence and Analysis
Represented By: David E. Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Protective Services
Represented By: David E. Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?