Campos et al v. SP Realty Investments LLC et al
Plaintiff: Abraham Campos, Eder Gordillo, Paulino Carpintero, Samuel Herrera, Yoni De Los Santos, Mr. Segundo Calle, Mr. Jenaro Campoverde, Mr. Pellumb Katanolli, Mr. Cesar Supacela, Mr. Nicolas Zhagnay, Cristian Asitimbay, Eduardo Yunga, Vladimir Yunga, Diego A. Estrada, Victor Gonzalez, Milton Quizhpilema, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Edison Macancela, Bryan Macancela, Segundo Calle, Jenaro Campoverde, Pellumb Katanolli, Cesar Supacela, Nicolas Zhagnay and Mario Asitimbay
Defendant: SP Realty Investments LLC, DIAMOND GLOBAL MANAGEMENT LLC and Besim Kukaj
Case Number: 1:2022cv05993
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. Motions due by 11/11/2022. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/3/2022) (ate)
November 3, 2022 Filing 26 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of deadline to file default judgment motion from 11/4 (ECF no. 18) to 11/11 addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Adam Pollock dated Nov. 3, 2022. Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay, Mario Asitimbay, Segundo Calle, Abraham Campos, Jenaro Campoverde, Paulino Carpintero, Yoni De Los Santos, Diego A. Estrada, Victor Gonzalez, Eder Gordillo, Samuel Herrera, Pellumb Katanolli, Bryan Macancela, Edison Macancela, Milton Quizhpilema, Cesar Supacela, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Eduardo Yunga, Vladimir Yunga, Nicolas Zhagnay..(Pollock, Adam)
November 1, 2022 Filing 25 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Besim Kukaj.(km)
November 1, 2022 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Adam Pollock re: #23 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,, . Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay, Mario Asitimbay, Segundo Calle, Abraham Campos, Jenaro Campoverde, Paulino Carpintero, Yoni De Los Santos, Diego A. Estrada, Victor Gonzalez, Eder Gordillo, Samuel Herrera, Pellumb Katanolli, Bryan Macancela, Edison Macancela, Milton Quizhpilema, Cesar Supacela, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Eduardo Yunga, Vladimir Yunga, Nicolas Zhagnay..(Pollock, Adam)
November 1, 2022 Filing 23 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay, Mario Asitimbay, Segundo Calle, Abraham Campos, Jenaro Campoverde, Paulino Carpintero, Yoni De Los Santos, Diego A. Estrada, Victor Gonzalez, Eder Gordillo, Samuel Herrera, Pellumb Katanolli, Bryan Macancela, Edison Macancela, Milton Quizhpilema, Cesar Supacela, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Eduardo Yunga, Vladimir Yunga, Nicolas Zhagnay..(Pollock, Adam) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 11/1/2022 (km).
October 13, 2022 Filing 22 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to SP Realty Investments LLC and Diamond Global Management LLC.(km)
October 13, 2022 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Adam Pollock re: #20 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,, . Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay, Mario Asitimbay, Segundo Calle, Abraham Campos, Jenaro Campoverde, Paulino Carpintero, Yoni De Los Santos, Diego A. Estrada, Victor Gonzalez, Eder Gordillo, Samuel Herrera, Pellumb Katanolli, Bryan Macancela, Edison Macancela, Milton Quizhpilema, Cesar Supacela, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Eduardo Yunga, Vladimir Yunga, Nicolas Zhagnay..(Pollock, Adam)
October 13, 2022 Filing 20 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay, Mario Asitimbay, Segundo Calle, Abraham Campos, Jenaro Campoverde, Paulino Carpintero, Yoni De Los Santos, Diego A. Estrada, Victor Gonzalez, Eder Gordillo, Samuel Herrera, Pellumb Katanolli, Bryan Macancela, Edison Macancela, Milton Quizhpilema, Cesar Supacela, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Eduardo Yunga, Vladimir Yunga, Nicolas Zhagnay..(Pollock, Adam) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 10/13/2022 (km).
October 13, 2022 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Besim Kukaj served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. Service was accepted by Michelle "Doe" Doorman. Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay; Jenaro Campoverde ; Felipe Vega-Loyola; Eder Gordillo; Abraham Campos; Edison Macancela; Vladimir Yunga; Milton Quizhpilema; Segundo Calle ; Paulino Carpintero; Cesar Supacela; Eduardo Yunga; Diego A. Estrada; Victor Gonzalez; Pellumb Katanolli; Samuel Herrera; Nicolas Zhagnay; Mario Asitimbay; Bryan Macancela; Yoni De Los Santos..(Pollock, Adam)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Having received the plaintiffs' letter on October 9, 2022, it is hereby ORDERED that the pretrial conference scheduled for October 27, 2022 is cancelled. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs must file an affidavit of service of the summons and complaint on defendant Besim Kukaj by October 18, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the defendants fail to appear in this action, the plaintiffs must move for default judgment by November 4, 2022.. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/12/2022) (kv)
October 12, 2022 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay, Mario Asitimbay, Segundo Calle, Abraham Campos, Jenaro Campoverde, Paulino Carpintero, Yoni De Los Santos, Diego A. Estrada, Victor Gonzalez, Eder Gordillo, Samuel Herrera, Pellumb Katanolli, Bryan Macancela, Edison Macancela, Milton Quizhpilema, Cesar Supacela, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Eduardo Yunga, Vladimir Yunga, Nicolas Zhagnay. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration ISO Request, #2 Text of Proposed Order (proposed) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT).(Pollock, Adam) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 10/12/2022 (km).
October 12, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Adam Pollock. RE-FILE Document No. #17 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The documents need to be filed separately. Please refer to ECF Rule 16.1. (km)
October 12, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 11/4/2022. Service due by 10/18/2022. (kv)
October 9, 2022 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Pre-Trial Conference on October 27 addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Adam Pollock dated Oct 9, 2022. Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay, Mario Asitimbay, Segundo Calle, Abraham Campos, Jenaro Campoverde, Paulino Carpintero, Yoni De Los Santos, Diego A. Estrada, Victor Gonzalez, Eder Gordillo, Samuel Herrera, Pellumb Katanolli, Bryan Macancela, Edison Macancela, Milton Quizhpilema, Cesar Supacela, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Eduardo Yunga, Vladimir Yunga, Nicolas Zhagnay..(Pollock, Adam)
October 9, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pre-Trial Conference (ECF no. 13) served on Kukaj; Diamond Global; SP Realty on Sept. 8; Sept. 25; Oct. 7. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay, Mario Asitimbay, Segundo Calle, Abraham Campos, Jenaro Campoverde, Paulino Carpintero, Yoni De Los Santos, Diego A. Estrada, Victor Gonzalez, Eder Gordillo, Samuel Herrera, Pellumb Katanolli, Bryan Macancela, Edison Macancela, Milton Quizhpilema, Cesar Supacela, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Eduardo Yunga, Vladimir Yunga, Nicolas Zhagnay..(Pollock, Adam)
September 25, 2022 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. SP Realty Investments LLC served on 9/19/2022, answer due 10/11/2022. Service was accepted by NJ State Treasurer (re-re-serve). Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay; Jenaro Campoverde ; Felipe Vega-Loyola; Eder Gordillo; Abraham Campos; Edison Macancela; Vladimir Yunga; Milton Quizhpilema; Segundo Calle ; Paulino Carpintero; Cesar Supacela; Eduardo Yunga; Diego A. Estrada; Victor Gonzalez; Pellumb Katanolli; Samuel Herrera; Nicolas Zhagnay; Mario Asitimbay; Bryan Macancela; Yoni De Los Santos..(Pollock, Adam)
September 2, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/2/2022) (jca)
August 28, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. SP Realty Investments LLC served on 8/23/2022, answer due 9/13/2022. Service was accepted by NJ Department of Treasury (re-serve). Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay; Jenaro Campoverde ; Felipe Vega-Loyola; Eder Gordillo; Abraham Campos; Edison Macancela; Vladimir Yunga; Milton Quizhpilema; Segundo Calle ; Paulino Carpintero; Cesar Supacela; Eduardo Yunga; Diego A. Estrada; Victor Gonzalez; Pellumb Katanolli; Samuel Herrera; Nicolas Zhagnay; Mario Asitimbay; Bryan Macancela; Yoni De Los Santos..(Pollock, Adam)
August 21, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Diamond Global Management LLC served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent in NYS Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay; Jenaro Campoverde ; Felipe Vega-Loyola; Eder Gordillo; Abraham Campos; Edison Macancela; Vladimir Yunga; Milton Quizhpilema; Segundo Calle ; Paulino Carpintero; Cesar Supacela; Eduardo Yunga; Diego A. Estrada; Victor Gonzalez; Pellumb Katanolli; Samuel Herrera; Nicolas Zhagnay; Mario Asitimbay; Bryan Macancela; Yoni De Los Santos..(Pollock, Adam)
August 21, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. SP Realty Investments LLC served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. Service was accepted by Clerk at NJ Department of Treasury. Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay; Jenaro Campoverde ; Felipe Vega-Loyola; Eder Gordillo; Abraham Campos; Edison Macancela; Vladimir Yunga; Milton Quizhpilema; Segundo Calle ; Paulino Carpintero; Cesar Supacela; Eduardo Yunga; Diego A. Estrada; Victor Gonzalez; Pellumb Katanolli; Samuel Herrera; Nicolas Zhagnay; Mario Asitimbay; Bryan Macancela; Yoni De Los Santos..(Pollock, Adam)
August 17, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Vernon S. Broderick is no longer assigned to the case..(aea)
July 15, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Diamond Global Management LLC. (sj)
July 15, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to SP Realty Investments LLC. (sj)
July 15, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Besim Kukaj. (sj)
July 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Adam Lewis Pollock. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code miscellaneous; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
July 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Adam Lewis Pollock re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Mario Asitimbay must be added. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (sj)
July 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Adam Lewis Pollock. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: DIAMOND GLOBAL MANAGEMENT LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
July 15, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
July 15, 2022 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
July 15, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 15, 2022 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Cristian Asitimbay, Jenaro Campoverde, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Eder Gordillo, Abraham Campos, Edison Macancela, Vladimir Yunga, Milton Quizhpilema, Segundo Calle, Paulino Carpintero, Cesar Supacela, Eduardo Yunga, Diego A. Estrada, Victor Gonzalez, Pellumb Katanolli, Samuel Herrera, Nicolas Zhagnay, Bryan Macancela, Yoni De Los Santos added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay, Jenaro Campoverde, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Eder Gordillo, Abraham Campos, Edison Macancela, Vladimir Yunga, Milton Quizhpilema, Segundo Calle, Paulino Carpintero, Cesar Supacela, Eduardo Yunga, Diego A. Estrada, Victor Gonzalez, Pellumb Katanolli, Samuel Herrera, Nicolas Zhagnay, Bryan Macancela, Yoni De Los Santos. Related document: #1 Complaint,,..(Pollock, Adam)
July 14, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Diamond Global Management LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay, Segundo Calle, Abraham Campos, Jenaro Campoverde, Paulino Carpintero, Yoni De Los Santos, Diego A. Estrada, Victor Gonzalez, Eder Gordillo, Samuel Herrera, Pellumb Katanolli, Bryan Macancela, Edison Macancela, Milton Quizhpilema, Cesar Supacela, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Eduardo Yunga, Vladimir Yunga, Nicolas Zhagnay..(Pollock, Adam)
July 14, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SP Realty Investments LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay, Segundo Calle, Abraham Campos, Jenaro Campoverde, Paulino Carpintero, Yoni De Los Santos, Diego A. Estrada, Victor Gonzalez, Eder Gordillo, Samuel Herrera, Pellumb Katanolli, Bryan Macancela, Edison Macancela, Milton Quizhpilema, Cesar Supacela, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Eduardo Yunga, Vladimir Yunga, Nicolas Zhagnay..(Pollock, Adam)
July 14, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BESIM KUKAJ, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay, Segundo Calle, Abraham Campos, Jenaro Campoverde, Paulino Carpintero, Yoni De Los Santos, Diego A. Estrada, Victor Gonzalez, Eder Gordillo, Samuel Herrera, Pellumb Katanolli, Bryan Macancela, Edison Macancela, Milton Quizhpilema, Cesar Supacela, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Eduardo Yunga, Vladimir Yunga, Nicolas Zhagnay..(Pollock, Adam)
July 14, 2022 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-cv-04036; 1:18-cv-07507. Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay, Segundo Calle, Abraham Campos, Jenaro Campoverde, Paulino Carpintero, Yoni De Los Santos, Diego A. Estrada, Victor Gonzalez, Eder Gordillo, Samuel Herrera, Pellumb Katanolli, Bryan Macancela, Edison Macancela, Milton Quizhpilema, Cesar Supacela, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Eduardo Yunga, Vladimir Yunga, Nicolas Zhagnay..(Pollock, Adam)
July 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pollock, Adam)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DIAMOND GLOBAL MANAGEMENT LLC, Besim Kukaj, SP Realty Investments LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26411863)Document filed by Cristian Asitimbay, Jenaro Campoverde, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Eder Gordillo, Abraham Campos, Edison Macancela, Vladimir Yunga, Milton Quizhpilema, Segundo Calle, Paulino Carpintero, Cesar Supacela, Eduardo Yunga, Diego A. Estrada, Victor Gonzalez, Pellumb Katanolli, Samuel Herrera, Nicolas Zhagnay, Bryan Macancela, Yoni De Los Santos..(Pollock, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campos et al v. SP Realty Investments LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Campos
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eder Gordillo
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulino Carpintero
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Herrera
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yoni De Los Santos
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Segundo Calle
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Jenaro Campoverde
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Pellumb Katanolli
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Cesar Supacela
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Nicolas Zhagnay
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristian Asitimbay
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Yunga
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir Yunga
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego A. Estrada
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Gonzalez
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Quizhpilema
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Vega-Loyola
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edison Macancela
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Macancela
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Segundo Calle
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenaro Campoverde
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pellumb Katanolli
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Supacela
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Zhagnay
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Asitimbay
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SP Realty Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIAMOND GLOBAL MANAGEMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Besim Kukaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?