Bayron-Paz v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: German Bayron-Paz
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. and B&Z Auto Enterprises, LLC doing business as Eastchester Chrysler Jeep Dodge
Case Number: 1:2022cv06122
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., through its attorneys, hereby consents to Plaintiff's filing of the First Amended Complaint, previously filed at ECF No. 10. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. reserves all defenses it has, or may have, to the First Amended Complaint and the causes of action contained therein. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/21/2022) (mml)
October 21, 2022 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against B&Z Auto Enterprises, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by German Bayron-Paz. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Retail Installment Contract, #2 Exhibit Bill of Sale, #3 Exhibit Monroney Sticker).(Kidd, Novlette)
October 21, 2022 Filing 14 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by German Bayron-Paz..(Kidd, Novlette)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER striking document from record....that document #10 Amended Complaint, filed by German Bayron-Paz is stricken from the record. The plaintiff filed the complaint in this action on July 18, 2022. This case was reassigned to this Court on August 17. Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answered on August 23. On October 17, the plaintiff filed a document labeled first amended complaint ("FAC") without obtaining leave of this Court or indicating that he had obtained the written consent of the defendants pursuant to Rule 15(a)(2), Fed. R. Civ. P. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the proposed FAC is stricken. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/18/2022) (tro)
October 18, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. B&Z Auto Enterprises, LLC served on 10/17/2022, answer due 11/7/2022. Service was accepted by Christine S., authorized to accept service at registered agent. Document filed by German Bayron-Paz..(Kidd, Novlette)
October 18, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 10/17/2022, answer due 11/7/2022. Service was accepted by Diana Wallwork, Banker authorized to accept service. Document filed by German Bayron-Paz..(Kidd, Novlette)
October 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Novlette R. Kidd re: Document No. #10 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading is amended more than 21 days after service of a responsive pleading;.. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (jgo)
October 17, 2022 Filing 10 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Document number #10 from stricken from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #13 Order Striking Document from Record. (tro) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON-COMPLIANCE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against B&Z Auto Enterprises, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by German Bayron-Paz. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Retail Installment Contract, #2 Exhibit 2. Bill of Sale, #3 Exhibit 3. Monroney Sticker).(Kidd, Novlette) Modified on 10/18/2022 (jgo). Modified on 10/19/2022 (tro).
August 23, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, all individuals should practice social distancing at all times possible in the courthouse. Individuals also must wear a KN94, KN95, or N95 mask that covers their nose and mouth in the courthouses. Cloth masks, surgical masks, bandanas, gaiters, and masks with valves are prohibited. Initial Conference set for 11/18/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/23/2022) (kv)
August 23, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A...(Silverstein, Ira)
August 23, 2022 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company (NYSE:WFC) for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A...(Silverstein, Ira)
August 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ira Scot Silverstein on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A...(Silverstein, Ira)
August 17, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Vernon S. Broderick is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to B&Z Auto Enterprises, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (vf)
July 21, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and B&Z Auto Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Eastchester Chrysler Jeep Dodge, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by German Bayron-Paz..(Kidd, Novlette)
July 19, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
July 19, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Novlette Rosemarie Kidd. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., B&Z Auto Enterprises, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
July 19, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
July 19, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 19, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Novlette Rosemarie Kidd to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official SDNY A.O. Summons form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
July 18, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and B&Z Auto Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Eastchester Chrysler Jeep Dodge, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by German Bayron-Paz..(Kidd, Novlette) Modified on 7/19/2022 (sj).
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kidd, Novlette)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B&Z Auto Enterprises, LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26431370)Document filed by German Bayron-Paz..(Kidd, Novlette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayron-Paz v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: German Bayron-Paz
Represented By: Novlette Rosemarie Kidd
Represented By: Novlette R. Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Ira Scot Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&Z Auto Enterprises, LLC doing business as Eastchester Chrysler Jeep Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?