The People of the State of New York v. Arm or Ally, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York and The People of The State of New York
Defendant: Arm or Ally, LLC, Blackhawk Manufacturing Group, Inc., A/K/A 80 Percent Arms, Inc. or 80 Percent Arms, Salvo Technologies, Inc., A/K/A 80P Builder or 80P Freedom Co., Brownells, Inc., A/K/A Brownells or Bob Brownells, GS Performance, LLC, A/K/A Glockstore or GSPC, Indie Guns, LLC, KM Tactical, Primary Arms, LLC, Rainier Arms, LLC, Rock Slide USA, LLC, Brownells, Inc., GS Performance, LLC, Blackhawk Manufacturing Group, Inc., Salvo Technologies, Inc., Brownells, Bob Brownells, Glockstore and GSPC
Case Number: 1:2022cv06124
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 nr Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #49 MOTION for Mary Alexis Norberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Co-Counsel for Indie Guns, LLC. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #42 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Brownells, Inc., Primary Arms, LLC, Rock Slide USA, LLC, Salvo Technologies, Inc...(Thompson, David)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: granting #50 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #50 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the State's Complaint. addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jason H. Cowley dated September 6, 2022. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 50. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/07/2022) (ama)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Fee Due: for #49 MOTION for Mary Alexis Norberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Co-Counsel for Indie Guns, LLC. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(sgz)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #49 MOTION for Mary Alexis Norberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Co-Counsel for Indie Guns, LLC. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26642764..(Norberg, Mary)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the State's Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jason H. Cowley dated September 6, 2022. Document filed by KM Tactical..(Cowley, Jason)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Mary Alexis Norberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Co-Counsel for Indie Guns, LLC. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Indie Guns, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mary Norberg, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Florida Supreme Court).(Norberg, Mary) Modified on 9/7/2022 (sgz). Modified on 9/8/2022 (sgz).
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Jean Paul Bradshaw II to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #47 MOTION for Jean Paul Bradshaw II to Appear Pro Hac Vice for KM Tactical. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Jean Paul Bradshaw II to Appear Pro Hac Vice for KM Tactical. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KM Tactical. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jean Paul Bradshaw II, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Bradshaw, Jean)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Rainier Arms, LLC..(Carroll, Jessica)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #45 MOTION for Jean Paul Bradshaw II to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26579210. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order; Missing Notarized Affidavit. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jean Paul Bradshaw II to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26579210. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KM Tactical. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jean Paul Bradshaw II, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order proposed order).(Bradshaw, Jean) Modified on 8/23/2022 (aea).
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DECLARATION of James M. Thompson in Support re: #42 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by The People of The State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit July 11, 2022 Primary Arms Letter).(Thompson, James)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #42 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by The People of The State of New York..(Thompson, James)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by The People of The State of New York..(Thompson, James)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Christopher D. Adams to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #40 MOTION for Christopher D. Adams, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rainier Arms, LLC. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26520162. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.>/FONT. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Christopher D. Adams, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rainier Arms, LLC. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26520162. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rainier Arms, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Counsel, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Adams, Christopher)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Christian W. Waugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #38 MOTION for Christian W. Waugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26515047. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
August 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Christian W. Waugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26515047. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Indie Guns, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christian W. Waugh, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed PHV Order, #3 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing from FL Sup Court).(Waugh, Christian)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Arm or Ally, LLC..(Harfenist, Steven)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order, dated July 28, 2022, ECF No. 33 served on All Defendants by Email to Counsel on 7/29/2022. Document filed by The People of The State of New York..(Hanna, Monica)
July 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Jay Harfenist on behalf of Arm or Ally, LLC..(Harfenist, Steven)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Consent to Removal. Document filed by GS Performance, LLC..(Erdreich, Ryan)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (30 in 1:22-cv-06124-JMF) Letter filed by The People of The State of New York. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' proposed briefing schedule for the State's anticipated motion to remand is hereby adopted. Any such motion shall be filed no later than August 17, 2022. Any opposition shall be filed no later than September 7, 2022. Any reply shall be filed no later than September 21, 2022. The Court will defer the question of consolidation and/or coordination between the City and State cases until the motion for remand is resolved. Plaintiff shall, within one business day of the date of this Order, serve a copy of this Order electronically on any Defendant who has not yet entered a notice of appearance (or counsel for that Defendant) and, within two business days of this Order, file proof of such service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 8/17/2022., Responses due by 9/7/2022, Replies due by 9/21/2022.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/28/2022) (jca)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (31 in 1:22-cv-05525-JMF) Letter filed by City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is not available for a conference on August 10, 2022. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties appear for a telephone conference on August 16, 2022, at 2:45 p.m. The parties should follow the procedures for teleconferences described in the Courts Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/honjessem-furman. In accordance with that Rule, counsel shall, at least twenty-four hours before the conference, email to the Court the names and telephone numbers of those who will have speaking roles at the conference. The Court will thereafter provide call-in information to those counsel. All others counsel who will not have speaking roles and members of the public may listen to the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference call line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540 followed by the pound (#) key. The Court will defer the question of consolidation and/or coordination between the City and State cases until the motion for remand in the State case is resolved. Plaintiff shall, within one business day of the date of this Order, serve a copy of this Order electronically on any Defendant who has not yet entered a notice of appearance (or counsel for that Defendant) and, within two business days of this Order, file proof of such service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 8/16/2022 at 02:45 PM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/28/2022) (jca)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Consent to Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,,. Document filed by KM Tactical..(Cowley, Jason)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Monica Hanna dated July 27, 2022 re: Joint Status Submission in response to ECF No. 20. Document filed by The People of The State of New York..(Hanna, Monica)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #28 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jessica M. Carroll, dated July 26, 2022., #1 Notice of Removal,. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 28. So Ordered. (Rainier Arms, LLC answer due 9/9/2022.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/27/22) (yv)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jessica M. Carroll, dated July 26, 2022. Document filed by Rainier Arms, LLC..(Carroll, Jessica)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Maria Carroll on behalf of Rainier Arms, LLC..(Carroll, Jessica)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #23 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer move, or otherwise response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Scott C. Allan dated July 25, 2022., #24 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David H. Thompson dated July 26, 2022., #25 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Ryan L. Erdreich dated July 26, 2022., #1 Notice of Removal,. All Defendants ; terminating #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #23 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer move, or otherwise response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Scott C. Allan dated July 25, 2022., #24 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David H. Thompson dated July 26, 2022., #25 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Ryan L. Erdreich dated July 26, 2022., #1 Notice of Removal,, ; terminating #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. For the sake of efficiency, the Court is inclined to adjourn the answer deadlines for all Defendants to the same date. If any party objects, it shall advise the Court by August 1, 2022. Absent an objection, the answer deadline for all Defendants will automatically be extended to September 9, 2022. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF Nos. 23, 24, and 25. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/26/22) (yv)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Ryan L. Erdreich dated July 26, 2022. Document filed by GS Performance, LLC..(Erdreich, Ryan)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David H. Thompson dated July 26, 2022. Document filed by Brownells, Inc., Primary Arms, LLC, Rock Slide USA, LLC, Salvo Technologies, Inc...(Thompson, David)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer move, or otherwise response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Scott C. Allan dated July 25, 2022. Document filed by Blackhawk Manufacturing Group, Inc...(Allan, Scott)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by KM Tactical..(Cowley, Jason)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order of July 22, 2022 (Doc. 27) served on The People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York on 07/22/2022. Document filed by Brownells, Inc., Primary Arms, LLC, Rock Slide USA, LLC, Salvo Technologies, Inc...(Barnes, Brian)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. As discussed in the conference held on July 13, 2022, the parties in the City Case are required to submit a letter addressing the status of the case and proposed next steps by July 27, 2022. The parties in the State Case shall file a similar letter by the same date. (If the parties are able to do so and prefer to file a single joint letter addressing both cases, they may do so.) The parties' letters should include the parties' views, if any, on consolidation and/or coordination of the two cases. Defendants in the State Case shall, within one business day of the date of this Order, serve a copy of this Order electronically on Plaintiff (or counsel for Plaintiff) and, within two business days of this Order, file proof of such service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/22/22) (yv)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Eric Snyder dated July 22, 2022., #1 Notice of Removal,. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 13. SO ORDERED. (KM Tactical answer due 9/9/2022.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/22/22) (yv)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Brian Wesley Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #2 Motion for David Henry Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Cowley on behalf of KM Tactical..(Cowley, Jason)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew D. Fender on behalf of KM Tactical..(Fender, Matthew)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tobias Jacob Fischer on behalf of KM Tactical..(Fischer, Tobias)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Eric Snyder dated July 22, 2022. Document filed by KM Tactical..(Snyder, Eric)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric James Snyder on behalf of KM Tactical..(Snyder, Eric)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tobias Jacob Fischer on behalf of KM Tactical..(Fischer, Tobias)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-05525-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Brian Wesley Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26431712. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #2 MOTION for David Henry Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26431419. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statements, Statement of Relatedness, and Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David H. Thompson and Brian W. Barnes served on The People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York on 07/19/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Brownells, Inc., Primary Arms, LLC, Rock Slide USA, LLC, Salvo Technologies, Inc...(Thompson, David)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Brian Wesley Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26431712. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brownells, Inc., A/K/A Brownells or Bob Brownells, Primary Arms, LLC, Rock Slide USA, LLC, Salvo Technologies, Inc., A/K/A 80P Builder or 80P Freedom Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian W. Barnes, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed PHV Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - CO, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - DC).(Barnes, Brian)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-05525 (JMF). Document filed by Brownells, Inc., A/K/A Brownells or Bob Brownells, Primary Arms, LLC, Rock Slide USA, LLC, Salvo Technologies, Inc., A/K/A 80P Builder or 80P Freedom Co...(Thompson, David)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sovereign Guns, Inc. for Rock Slide USA, LLC. Document filed by Rock Slide USA, LLC..(Thompson, David)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Primary Arms, LLC..(Thompson, David)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent 2nd Adventure Group, Inc. for Brownells, Inc., A/K/A Brownells or Bob Brownells. Document filed by Brownells, Inc., A/K/A Brownells or Bob Brownells..(Thompson, David)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate DBH Tides Salvo Holdco, LLC for Salvo Technologies, Inc., A/K/A 80P Builder or 80P Freedom Co.. Document filed by Salvo Technologies, Inc., A/K/A 80P Builder or 80P Freedom Co...(Thompson, David)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Thompson, David)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for David Henry Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26431419. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brownells, Inc., A/K/A Brownells or Bob Brownells, Primary Arms, LLC, Rock Slide USA, LLC, Salvo Technologies, Inc., A/K/A 80P Builder or 80P Freedom Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David H. Thompson, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed PHV Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - NY, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - DC).(Thompson, David)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 451972/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26431392).Document filed by Rock Slide USA, LLC, Primary Arms, LLC, Salvo Technologies, Inc., A/K/A 80P Builder or 80P Freedom Co., Brownells, Inc., A/K/A Brownells or Bob Brownells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Compl., #2 Exhibit B - Reassignment Order, #3 Exhibit C - Prelim. Inj. Mot. (Pt. 1), #4 Exhibit C - Prelim. Inj. Mot. (Pt. 2), #5 Exhibit D - Am. Compl., #6 Exhibit E - Blackhawk Consent, #7 Exhibit F - GS Performance Consent, #8 Exhibit G - Rainier Arms Consent, #9 Exhibit H - KM Tactical Consent, #10 Exhibit I - Arm or Ally Consent).(Thompson, David)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 1:22cv5525. (sj)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David H Thompson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Blackhawk Manufacturing Group, Inc., A/K/A 80 Percent Arms, Inc. or 80 Percent Arms, Salvo Technologies, Inc., A/K/A 80P Builder or 80P Freedom Co., Brownells, Inc., A/K/A Brownells or Bob Brownells, GS Performance, LLC, A/K/A Glockstore or GSPC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The People of the State of New York v. Arm or Ally, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of The State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arm or Ally, LLC
Represented By: Steven Jay Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackhawk Manufacturing Group, Inc., A/K/A 80 Percent Arms, Inc. or 80 Percent Arms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvo Technologies, Inc., A/K/A 80P Builder or 80P Freedom Co.
Represented By: David H Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownells, Inc., A/K/A Brownells or Bob Brownells
Represented By: David H Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Performance, LLC, A/K/A Glockstore or GSPC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indie Guns, LLC
Represented By: Christian Waugh, I
Represented By: Mary Alexis Norberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KM Tactical
Represented By: Matthew D. Fender
Represented By: Jason Cowley
Represented By: Eric James Snyder
Represented By: Jean Paul Bradshaw, II
Represented By: Tobias Jacob Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Arms, LLC
Represented By: David H Thompson
Represented By: Brian W Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainier Arms, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Adams
Represented By: Jessica Maria Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock Slide USA, LLC
Represented By: David H Thompson
Represented By: Brian W Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownells, Inc.
Represented By: Brian W Barnes
Represented By: David H Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Performance, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Lawrence Erdreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackhawk Manufacturing Group, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Charles Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvo Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Brian W Barnes
Represented By: David H Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownells
Represented By: Brian W Barnes
Represented By: David H Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Brownells
Represented By: Brian W Barnes
Represented By: David H Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glockstore
Represented By: Ryan Lawrence Erdreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSPC
Represented By: Ryan Lawrence Erdreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?