H.B. et al v. New York City Department of Education
Plaintiff: H.B. and H.B. on behalf of her child L.B., a minor,
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2022cv06228
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1415 IDEA: Challenge decision re education for handicapped
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marina Moraru on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Moraru, Marina)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
August 15, 2022 Filing 9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from PASQUALE VISCUSI dated AUGUST 15, 2022. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Viscusi, Pasquale)
August 9, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Department of Education served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. Service was accepted by serviceecf@law.nyc.gov. Service was made by email. Document filed by H.B.; H.B. on behalf of her child L.B., a minor,..(Roller, Irina)
August 9, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pasquale Viscusi on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Viscusi, Pasquale)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/29/2022) (ate)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/28/2022) (vfr)
July 25, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(pc)
July 25, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 25, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 25, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Roller, Irina)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by H.B., H.B. on behalf of her child L.B., a minor,..(Roller, Irina)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26450352)Document filed by H.B., H.B. on behalf of her child L.B., a minor,..(Roller, Irina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.B. et al v. New York City Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.B.
Represented By: Irina Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.B. on behalf of her child L.B., a minor,
Represented By: Irina Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Marina Moraru
Represented By: Pasquale Viscusi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?