McVay v. Walker
Petitioner: Jeffrey McVay
Respondent: Warden S. Walker
Case Number: 1:2022cv06572
Filed: July 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Jeffrey McVay NYSID:06215200R R.N.D.C. 11-11 Hazen St. East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (dsh)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 9/6/2022. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 9/6/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/4/2022) (Attachments: #1 Supplement IFP) (aan)
August 3, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The Court severs from this action, under Rule 21 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the habeas corpus claims of Petitioners Harris, Maxwell, McVay, Walters, Reid, Washington, Halley, Stevens, Scales, and Williams. Petitioner Mayo will proceed as the sole petitioner in this action, and he is directed, within 30 days, to either pay the $5.00 filing fee to bring this action or complete, sign, and submit the attached IFP application under this action's docket number, 1:22-CV-5810 (LTS). No answer shall be required as this time. If Petitioner Mayo complies with this order, this action shall be processed in accordance with the procedures of the Clerks Office. If Petitioner Mayo fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, the Court will dismiss this action. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to open 10 new separate habeas corpus actions with 10 new civil docket numbers for the claims of Petitioners Harris, Maxwell, McVay, Walters, Reid, Washington, Halley, Stevens, Scales, and Williams, respectively, and docket in each of those habeas corpus actions a copy of the petition and this order. Once each new action is opened, the Court will issue orders directing Petitioners Harris, Maxwell, McVay, Walters, Reid, Washington, Halley, Stevens, Scales, and Williams to each either pay the $5.00 filing fee to bring a separate habeas corpus action or complete, sign, and submit an IFP application. Because the petition makes no substantial showing of a denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue. See 28 U.S.C. 2253. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/29/22) (rdz)
July 29, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254.Document filed by Jeffrey McVay..(rdz)
July 29, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McVay v. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey McVay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?