Edgewood Partners Insurance Center v. PPD Development, L.P.
Plaintiff: Edgewood Partners Insurance Center d/b/a Edgewood Partners Insurance Agency, as successor in interest to INTEGRO USA, Inc. and Edgewood Partners Insurance Center Inc. doing business as Edgewood Partners Insurance Agency, as successor in interest to INTEGRO USA, Inc
Defendant: PPD Development, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2022cv06957
Filed: August 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Peter Goldberg on behalf of PPD Development, L.P...(Goldberg, Daniel)
September 14, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint. Document filed by PPD Development, L.P...(Israeli, Avi)
September 14, 2022 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. for PPD Development, L.P.. Document filed by PPD Development, L.P...(Israeli, Avi)
August 29, 2022 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. PPD Development, L.P. served on 8/24/2022, answer due 9/14/2022. Service was accepted by Lisa Rhodes. Document filed by Edgewood Partners Insurance Center Inc...(Bellus, John)
August 24, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John E Bellus, Jr on behalf of Edgewood Partners Insurance Center Inc...(Bellus, John)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of eve1y action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, video conference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/23/2022) (tro)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by October 23, 2022, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below...and as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/23/2022) (tro)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by October 23, 2022, file a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, on the docket. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by October 23, 2022, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/23/2022) (tro) Modified on 8/23/2022 (tro).
August 23, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James A. Randazzo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Edgewood Partners Insurance Center. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for John E. Bellus, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (CP)
August 22, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against PPD Development, L.P. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Edgewood Partners Insurance Center. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Randazzo, James)
August 22, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for John E. Bellus, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26573511. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
August 19, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for John E. Bellus, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26573511. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Edgewood Partners Insurance Center. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion).(Bellus, John)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: #1 Complaint, filed by Edgewood Partners Insurance Center. Because Plaintiff's complaint does not allege the membership of all partners of Defendant, it does not contain "a short and plain statement of the grounds for the court's jurisdiction," Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(a)(1). Therefore, by August 25, 2022, Plaintiff shall amend its pleading to allege the citizenship of all of the parties. If Plaintiff fails to amend by the foregoing date to allege complete diversity, the complaint shall be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2022.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/18/2022) (kv)
August 17, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PPD Development, L.P...(pc)
August 17, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 17, 2022 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 17, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 17, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney James A. Randazzo. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Citizenship Plaintiff code 7 (NONE); Citizenship Defendant code 7 (NONE); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 4 (Diversity); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
August 17, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James A. Randazzo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Edgewood Partners Insurance Center d/b/a Edgewood Partners Insurance Agency, as successor in interest to INTEGRO USA, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
August 16, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Randazzo, James)
August 16, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PPD Development, L.P., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Edgewood Partners Insurance Center d/b/a Edgewood Partners Insurance Agency, as successor in interest to INTEGRO USA, Inc...(Randazzo, James)
August 16, 2022 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Galway Holdings, LP for Edgewood Partners Insurance Center d/b/a Edgewood Partners Insurance Agency, as successor in interest to INTEGRO USA, Inc.. Document filed by Edgewood Partners Insurance Center d/b/a Edgewood Partners Insurance Agency, as successor in interest to INTEGRO USA, Inc...(Randazzo, James)
August 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PPD Development, L.P.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26552368)Document filed by Edgewood Partners Insurance Center d/b/a Edgewood Partners Insurance Agency, as successor in interest to INTEGRO USA, Inc...(Randazzo, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgewood Partners Insurance Center v. PPD Development, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPD Development, L.P.
Represented By: Avi Brian Israeli
Represented By: Daniel Peter Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgewood Partners Insurance Center d/b/a Edgewood Partners Insurance Agency, as successor in interest to INTEGRO USA, Inc.
Represented By: James A. Randazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgewood Partners Insurance Center Inc. doing business as Edgewood Partners Insurance Agency, as successor in interest to INTEGRO USA, Inc
Represented By: John E Bellus, Jr
Represented By: James A. Randazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?