Quinones et al v. Abilene Motor Express, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Natalia Josefina Quinones, Josefina Metivier Willmore, Juan Arcadoio Victor Metivier, Jose Enrique Orellano, Jose L. Victoriano Metivier and Juan Arcadoio Victoriano Metivier
Defendant: Abilene Motor Express, LLC, Knight Transportation, Inc., Keith Thompson and Knight Transportation
Case Number: 1:2022cv07086
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Sarah L Cave
Referring Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 au Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2022 Filing 12 REPORT OF RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: The parties anticipate that the trial of this case will require 7 - 10 days. (At least 6 fact witnesses and at least 4 experts talking about the injuries claimed by 5 plaintiffs). The parties do not consent to a trial before a Magistrate Judge at this time. The parties request a jury trial. Pursuant to the initial conference held today, October 4, 2022, a status conference is scheduled for Tuesday, February 7, 2023 at 11:00 am on the Court's conference line. The parties are directed to call: (866) 390-1828; access code: 380-9799, at the scheduled time. Depositions shall be completed by February 14, 2023. Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2023. Deposition due by 5/16/2023. Fact Discovery due by 3/14/2023. Expert Discovery due by 5/16/2023. Telephone Conference set for 2/7/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. Ready for Trial by 8/17/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 10/4/2022) (kv)
October 4, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/4/2022. Attorney Michael Krigsfeld appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Attorney Jessica Klotz appeared on behalf of Defendants. (ne)
September 29, 2022 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Abilene Motor Express, LLC, Knight Transportation, Knight Transportation, Inc., Keith Thompson..(Klotz, Jessica)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: On September 8, 2022, the Court scheduled an initial conference for October 4, 2022, and directed the parties to file a Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Case Management Plan ("PCMP") no later than one week before the conference, i.e., by September 27, 2022. (ECF No. 8 (the "September 8 Order")). The parties failed to file a PCMP in accordance with the September 8 Order. As a one-time courtesy, the Court sua sponte extends this deadline, and directs the parties to file the PCMP by September 29, 2022. A template is available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-sarah-l-cave. To the extent the parties disagree about any portion of the PCMP, they may set forth their respective proposals for the disputed provision, without argument. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 9/28/2022) (vfr)
September 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Debra Klotz on behalf of Abilene Motor Express, LLC, Knight Transportation, Knight Transportation, Inc., Keith Thompson..(Klotz, Jessica)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that an initial conference in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 will be held on October 4, 2022 at 2:00 pm, on the Courts conference line. The parties are directed to call: (866) 390-1828; access code: 380-9799, at the scheduled time. At the conference, the parties must be prepared to discuss the subjects set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and (c). It is further ORDERED that counsel shall meet and confer in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) no later than 21 days before the Initial Case Management Conference. No later than one week (seven (7) calendar days) before the conference, the parties shall file a Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Case Management Plan, via ECF, signed by counsel for each party. A template is available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-sarah-l-cave. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 10/4/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 9/8/22) (yv)
September 7, 2022 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Jose L. Victoriano Metivier, Jose Enrique Orellano, Natalia Josefina Quinones, Juan Arcadoio Victoriano Metivier, Josefina Metivier Willmore.(Krigsfeld, Michael)
September 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Krigsfeld on behalf of Jose L. Victoriano Metivier, Jose Enrique Orellano, Natalia Josefina Quinones, Juan Arcadoio Victoriano Metivier, Josefina Metivier Willmore..(Krigsfeld, Michael)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 8/24/2022) (tg)
August 22, 2022 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents All Plaintiffs added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by Keith Thompson, Abilene Motor Express, LLC, Knight Transportation, Inc., Knight Transportation. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,..(Silverstone, Adam)
August 22, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 22, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Adam H. Silverstone. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
August 22, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Adam H. Silverstone. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Juan Arcadoio Victor Metivier. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
August 22, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Adam H. Silverstone re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add party Knight Transportation. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
August 22, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 22, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Dargan on behalf of Abilene Motor Express, LLC, Knight Transportation, Inc., Keith Thompson..(Dargan, Thomas)
August 19, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings Inc. for Abilene Motor Express, LLC, Knight Transportation, Inc.. Document filed by Abilene Motor Express, LLC, Knight Transportation, Inc...(Silverstone, Adam)
August 19, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Silverstone, Adam)
August 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 807792/2022E..Document filed by Keith Thompson, Abilene Motor Express, LLC, Knight Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavits of Service of Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit Amended Answer, #5 Exhibit Email correspondence dated 8.12.22, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's written response dated 8.18.22).(Silverstone, Adam)
August 19, 2022 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Notice of Removal,. Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26571670..(Silverstone, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinones et al v. Abilene Motor Express, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Josefina Quinones
Represented By: Michael Krigsfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefina Metivier Willmore
Represented By: Michael Krigsfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Arcadoio Victor Metivier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Enrique Orellano
Represented By: Michael Krigsfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L. Victoriano Metivier
Represented By: Michael Krigsfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Arcadoio Victoriano Metivier
Represented By: Michael Krigsfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abilene Motor Express, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. Dargan
Represented By: Adam H. Silverstone
Represented By: Jessica Debra Klotz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Adam H. Silverstone
Represented By: Thomas J. Dargan
Represented By: Jessica Debra Klotz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Thompson
Represented By: Thomas J. Dargan
Represented By: Jessica Debra Klotz
Represented By: Adam H. Silverstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Transportation
Represented By: Jessica Debra Klotz
Represented By: Adam H. Silverstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?