Albright v. Terraform Labs, Pte. Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Albright
Defendant: Terraform Labs, Pte. Ltd., Jump Crypto, Jump Trading, LLC, Republic Capital, Republic Maximal, LLC, Tribe Capital, Definance Capital/Definance Technologies OY, GSR/GSR Markets Ltd., Three Arrows Capital Pte. Ltd., Pantera Capital, Nicholas Platias, Do Kwan, GSR/GSR Markets Limited and Do Kwon
Case Number: 1:2022cv07281
Filed: August 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OPINION AND ORDER re: #27 MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendants Jump Trading, LLC, Terraform Labs, Pte. Ltd., Republic Maximal LLC, and Pantera Capital Management LP. filed by Jump Trading, LLC. Accordingly, for the foregoing reasons, the Court reaffirms its bench order on October 31, 2022 denying defendants' motion to transfer. The Clerk is directed to close the motion (item 27) on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/15/2022) (kv)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Luna Foundation Guard, Ltd. served on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022. Service was accepted by Receptionist at Registered Address. Document filed by Matthew Albright..(Berger, Daniel)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: ( Oral Argument set for 1/4/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Delphi Digital Consulting, LLC served on 11/15/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. Service was accepted by Allison Rathmanner Corporate Specialist. Document filed by Matthew Albright..(Berger, Daniel)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nell Peyser on behalf of Kanav Kariya..(Peyser, Nell)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aitan D. Goelman on behalf of Kanav Kariya..(Goelman, Aitan)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kanav Kariya waiver sent on 11/14/2022, answer due 1/13/2023. Document filed by Matthew Albright..(Berger, Daniel)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Delphi Digital Consulting, LLC, Jose Macedo, Kanav Kariya, Luna Foundation Guard, Ltd.. (vf)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #41 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Jed S. Rakoff for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #39 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Jed S. Rakoff for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #40 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Jed S. Rakoff for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety (tp)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Delphi Digital Consulting, Inc., Luna Foundation Guard, Ltd., Kanav Kariya and Jose Macedo, re: #42 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Matthew Albright..(Berger, Daniel)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Do Kwon, Jump Trading, LLC, Nicholas Platias, Terraform Labs, Pte. Ltd., Delphi Digital Consulting, LLC, Luna Foundation Guard, Ltd., Jose Macedo, Kanav Kariya, Remi Tetot with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Matthew Albright. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Berger, Daniel)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Pantera Capital. Document filed by Matthew Albright. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Berger, Daniel)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) GSR/GSR Markets Limited. Document filed by Matthew Albright. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Berger, Daniel)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Tribe Capital. Document filed by Matthew Albright. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Berger, Daniel)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(l)(A)(i): PURSUANT TO Rule 41(a)(l)(A)(i) of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Matthew Albright, hereby dismisses all claims asserted against Defendants Republic Capital, Republic Maximal, LLC, and DeFinance Capital/DeFinance Technologies Oy in the above-captioned action, without prejudice, and with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. SO ORDERED. Republic Maximal, LLC, Definance Capital/Definance Technologies OY and Republic Capital terminated. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/3/2022) (kv)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Do Kwon waiver sent on 11/1/2022, answer due 1/1/2023. Document filed by Matthew Albright..(Berger, Daniel)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #35 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,, was reviewed and referred to Judge Jed S. Rakoff for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety;. (nd)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 5/26/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (kv)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/31/2022, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff., Oral Arguments set for 12/14/2022 at 04:30 PM and 5/26/2023 at 4:00pm before Judge Jed S. Rakoff in courtroom 14B of 500 Pearl Street). (Kotowski, Linda)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: This case is to be tried to a jury. Motion to dismiss must be served by 11/14/2022 and Plaintiff's response must be served by 11/30/2022, Replies by 12/7/2022. Oral arg. 12/14/2022 at 4:30pm. Bottom line ruling by 12/30/2022. The motion for class ce1tification shall be filed by 04/28/2023; any opposition papers shall be filed by 5/12/2023; and reply papers shall be filed by 5/19/23. Oral arg. on 5/28 at 4pm. Amended Pleadings due by 11/11/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 11/11/2022. Motions due by 8/31/2023. Responses due by 9/14/2023 Replies due by 9/21/2023. Deposition due by 8/17/2023. Discovery due by 8/17/2023. Oral Argument set for 12/14/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 9/28/2023. Oral Argument set for 5/28/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/31/2022) (kv)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Definance Capital/Definance Technologies OY, Republic Capital, Republic Maximal, LLC. Document filed by Matthew Albright. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Berger, Daniel)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Hauge Service Convention Notice, Hague Service Convention Summary, Summons and Complaint served on GSR Markets Limited on 10/23/2022. Service was accepted by Receptionist at Registered Address. Document filed by Matthew Albright., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. GSR/GSR Markets Limited served on 10/23/2022, answer due 11/14/2022. Service was accepted by Receptionist at Registered Address. Document filed by Matthew Albright..(Berger, Daniel)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan David Cogan on behalf of Jump Trading, LLC..(Cogan, Jonathan)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #27 MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendants Jump Trading, LLC, Terraform Labs, Pte. Ltd., Republic Maximal LLC, and Pantera Capital Management LP. . Document filed by Jump Trading, LLC..(Tuminelli, Amanda)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Tribe Capital served on 10/20/2022, answer due 11/10/2022. Service was accepted by Teresa Grandison. Document filed by Matthew Albright..(Berger, Daniel)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan Westhoff on behalf of Republic Capital, Republic Maximal, LLC..(Westhoff, Bryan)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #27 MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendants Jump Trading, LLC, Terraform Labs, Pte. Ltd., Republic Maximal LLC, and Pantera Capital Management LP. . Document filed by Matthew Albright..(Berger, Daniel)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #27 MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendants Jump Trading, LLC, Terraform Labs, Pte. Ltd., Republic Maximal LLC, and Pantera Capital Management LP. . Document filed by Jump Trading, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Patterson Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Patterson Docket).(Tuminelli, Amanda)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendants Jump Trading, LLC, Terraform Labs, Pte. Ltd., Republic Maximal LLC, and Pantera Capital Management LP. Document filed by Jump Trading, LLC..(Tuminelli, Amanda)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Terraform Labs, Pte. Ltd...(Henkin, Douglas)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion for Bryan M. Westhoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/19/2022) (ks)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary Stein on behalf of Pantera Capital..(Stein, Gary)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pantera Capital..(Swartz, Michael)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Everett Swartz on behalf of Pantera Capital..(Swartz, Michael)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caitlin M. Moyna on behalf of Matthew Albright..(Moyna, Caitlin)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF STEPHEN J. SENDEROWITZ granting #13 Motion for Stephen J. Senderowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/13/2022) (ks)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Jump Trading Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Jump Financial, LLC for Jump Trading, LLC. Document filed by Jump Trading, LLC..(Perlstein, Steven)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Nicole Tuminelli on behalf of Jump Trading, LLC..(Tuminelli, Amanda)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven William Perlstein on behalf of Jump Trading, LLC..(Perlstein, Steven)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Pantera Capital served on 9/21/2022, answer due 10/12/2022. Service was accepted by Bhagyashree Raorane. Document filed by Matthew Albright..(Berger, Daniel)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Three Arrows Capital Pte. Ltd. served on 9/29/2022, answer due 10/20/2022. Service was accepted by Registered Office. Document filed by Matthew Albright..(Berger, Daniel)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Terraform Labs, Pte. Ltd. served on 9/29/2022, answer due 10/20/2022. Service was accepted by Registered Address. Document filed by Matthew Albright..(Berger, Daniel)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Stephen J. Senderowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26771833. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Stephen J. Senderowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26771833. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Terraform Labs, Pte. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephen J. Senderowitz in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Senderowitz, Stephen)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas W Henkin on behalf of Terraform Labs, Pte. Ltd...(Henkin, Douglas)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Bryan M. Westhoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26755002. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Bryan M. Westhoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26755002. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Republic Capital, Republic Maximal, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Bryan M. Westhoff, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Zerykier, Aaron)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: ( Initial Conference set for 10/31/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron E. Zerykier on behalf of Republic Capital, Republic Maximal, LLC..(Zerykier, Aaron)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Republic Maximal, LLC waiver sent on 9/14/2022, answer due 11/14/2022. Document filed by Matthew Albright..(Berger, Daniel)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Republic Capital waiver sent on 9/14/2022, answer due 11/14/2022. Document filed by Matthew Albright..(Berger, Daniel)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jump Trading, LLC waiver sent on 9/9/2022, answer due 11/9/2022. Document filed by Matthew Albright..(Berger, Daniel)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 9-30-2022, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:30am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 9/30/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/12/2022) (kv)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Definance Capital/Definance Technologies OY, Do Kwon, GSR/GSR Markets Limited, Jump Crypto, Jump Trading, LLC, Nicholas Platias, Pantera Capital, Republic Capital, Republic Maximal, LLC, Terraform Labs, Pte. Ltd., Three Arrows Capital Pte. Ltd., Tribe Capital..(pc)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Lawrence Berger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Do Kwan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Terraform Labs Pte, Ltd., Jump Crypto, Jump Trading, LLC, Republic Capital, Republic Maximal LLC, Tribe Capital, DeFinance Capital/DeFinance Technologies Oy, GSR/GSR Markets Limited, Three Arrows Capital Pte., Ltd., Pantera Capital, Nicolas Platias, Do Kwon, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Matthew Albright..(Berger, Daniel)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berger, Daniel)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel Lawrence Berger to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Courthouse Assignment Section of Form is not provided. Signature Error, the form is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Lawrence Berger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Matthew Albright; GSR/GSR Markets Ltd. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Lawrence Berger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berger, Daniel) Modified on 8/26/2022 (vf).
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Definance Capital/Definance Technologies OY, Do Kwan, GSR/GSR Markets Ltd., Jump Crypto, Jump Trading, LLC, Nicholas Platias, Pantera Capital, Republic Capital, Republic Maximal, LLC, Terraform Labs, Pte. Ltd., Three Arrows Capital Pte. Ltd., Tribe Capital. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26597110)Document filed by Matthew Albright..(Berger, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albright v. Terraform Labs, Pte. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Albright
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Berger
Represented By: Caitlin M. Moyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terraform Labs, Pte. Ltd.
Represented By: Douglas W Henkin
Represented By: Stephen J. Senderowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jump Crypto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jump Trading, LLC
Represented By: Steven William Perlstein
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Tuminelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Capital
Represented By: Aaron E. Zerykier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Maximal, LLC
Represented By: Aaron E. Zerykier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tribe Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Definance Capital/Definance Technologies OY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSR/GSR Markets Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Arrows Capital Pte. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pantera Capital
Represented By: Gary Stein
Represented By: Michael Everett Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Platias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Do Kwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSR/GSR Markets Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Do Kwon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?