StandardAero Aviation Holdings, Inc. v. Signature Aviation Limited
Plaintiff: StandardAero Aviation Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Signature Aviation Limited f/k/a Signature Aviation plc, Signature Aviation Limited and Signature Aviation PLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv07515
Filed: September 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. By December 19, 2022, the parties shall inform the Court whether the parties consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge as provided in ECF No. 6. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/28/2022) (kv)
October 28, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Magistrate Judge Consent Order addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from C. Lee Wilson dated October 28, 2022. Document filed by Signature Aviation Limited..(Wilson, Christopher)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/25/2022) (jca)
October 24, 2022 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from C. Lee Wilson dated October 24, 2022. Document filed by Signature Aviation Limited..(Wilson, Christopher)
October 14, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Signature Aviation Limited waiver sent on 9/13/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. Document filed by StandardAero Aviation Holdings, Inc...(Morris, Elizabeth)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by November 1, 2022, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/12/2022) (kv)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/12/2022) (kv)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/12/2022) (kv)
September 6, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Signature Aviation Limited..(jgo)
September 6, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Elizabeth Anne Morris. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
September 6, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Elizabeth Anne Morris. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Signature Aviation Limited f/k/a Signature Aviation plc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was modified to add alias separately. (jgo)
September 6, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 2, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Dynasty Parent Holdings, L.P., a portfolio company of The Carlyle Group Inc., Corporate Parent Dynasty Parent Co., Inc., Corporate Parent Dynasty Intermediate Co., Inc., Corporate Parent Dynasty Acquisition Co., Inc., Corporate Parent StandardAero Holding Corp. for StandardAero Aviation Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by StandardAero Aviation Holdings, Inc...(Morris, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Signature Aviation Limited f/k/a Signature Aviation plc, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by StandardAero Aviation Holdings, Inc...(Morris, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Morris, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Signature Aviation Limited f/k/a Signature Aviation plc. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26629089)Document filed by StandardAero Aviation Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Indemnification Claim Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Reply to Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Response Letter).(Morris, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: StandardAero Aviation Holdings, Inc. v. Signature Aviation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: StandardAero Aviation Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Aviation Limited f/k/a Signature Aviation plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Aviation Limited
Represented By: Christopher Lee Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Aviation PLC
Represented By: Christopher Lee Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?