Ferreras v. Rice et al
Plaintiff: ARIDIO MENDEZ FERRERAS
Defendant: RICKY L RICE, CORETRANS LLC, Ricky L. Rice and Coretrans, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv07538
Filed: September 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 nr Diversity: Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Thursday, November 10, 2022 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Initial Conference set for 11/10/2022 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 10/28/2022) (rro)
October 28, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Aridio Mendez Ferreras, Coretrans, LLC, Ricky L. Rice. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/28/2022).(rro)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: In light of the Court's referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on October 28, 2022, the Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for November 3, 2022 (Dkt. #5), is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/28/2022) (rro)
October 27, 2022 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang dated October 27, 2022 re: Magistrate Scheduling Order. Document filed by Aridio Mendez Ferreras..(Friedman, Taylor)
October 27, 2022 Filing 10 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Aridio Mendez Ferreras..(Friedman, Taylor)
October 27, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Aridio Mendez Ferreras. Document filed by Aridio Mendez Ferreras..(Friedman, Taylor)
October 27, 2022 Filing 8 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Aridio Mendez Ferreras..(Friedman, Taylor)
October 27, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Thomas Scanlon on behalf of Coretrans, LLC, Ricky L. Rice..(Scanlon, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Taylor Friedman on behalf of Aridio Mendez Ferreras..(Friedman, Taylor)
October 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Initial Conference set for 11/3/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/05/2022) (tg)
September 8, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Coretrans, LLC, Ricky L. Rice..(Lory, Tyler)
September 8, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Coretrans, LLC, Ricky L. Rice..(Lory, Tyler)
September 6, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Travis Newman on behalf of Aridio Mendez Ferreras..(Newman, Mark)
September 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Yesy A. Sanchez to Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. The Civil Cover sheet is filed as a separate event; and Signature Error, the Form is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
September 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Yesy A. Sanchez. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ARIDIO MENDEZ FERRERAS, RICKY L. RICE, CORETRANS, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (vf)
September 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Yesy A. Sanchez. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code M 94 Other; Nature of Suit code 365 (Personal Inj. Prod. Liability); Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Citizenship Plaintiff code 7 (NONE); Citizenship Defendant code 7 (NONE); Jury Demand code n (None); Dollar Demand None; Jurisdiction code Federal Question. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332nr Diversity: Notice of Removal; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 350 (Motor Vehicle); the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); Jurisdiction Code has been modified to Diversity; the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 1 (Citizen of This State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000. (vf)
September 6, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
September 6, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
September 6, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 806064/2022E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26632112).Document filed by CORETRANS LLC, RICKY L RICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Sanchez, Yesy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferreras v. Rice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARIDIO MENDEZ FERRERAS
Represented By: Mark Travis Newman
Represented By: Taylor Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICKY L RICE
Represented By: Yesy A. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORETRANS LLC
Represented By: Yesy A. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky L. Rice
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Scanlon
Represented By: Tyler Jay Lory
Represented By: Yesy A. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coretrans, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Scanlon
Represented By: Tyler Jay Lory
Represented By: Yesy A. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?