Leon v. Zydus Pharmaceuticals Inc
Plaintiff: Thomas Lebron Leon
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 1:2022cv07636
Filed: September 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 nr Diversity: Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Zydus Lifesciences Limited for Zydus Pharmaceuticals Inc. Document filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Battisti, Nicole)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), after reviewing the parties' 26(f) report, the Court hereby orders that: As further set forth by this Order. 1. No additional parties may be joined or cause of action asserted after December 31, 2022. 2. No additional defenses may be asserted after January 20, 2023. Dispositive Motions: Dispositive motions, if any, are to be completed by November 30, 2023. The parties are advised to comply with the Court's Individual Practice 2(B) regarding motions, and to submit one fully briefed set of courtesy copies to the Court. Pretrial Order/Motions in Limine: A joint pretrial order, together with any motions in limine or motions to bifurcate, shall be submitted by February 29, 2024. This is a jury trial. SO ORDERED. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2022. Motions due by 2/29/2024. Discovery due by 11/10/2023. Pretrial Order due by 2/29/2024. Ready for Trial by 4/1/2024. Estimate length of trial 5 days. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/30/2022) (tg)
September 30, 2022 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT. Pursuant to Rule 26(f) Document filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Battisti, Nicole)
September 30, 2022 Filing 10 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Battisti, Nicole)
September 27, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Vincent Decolator on behalf of Thomas Lebron Leon..(Decolator, John)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are directed to submit a Rule 26(f) report by September 30, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/16/2022) (ks)
September 15, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Battisti, Nicole)
September 15, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Cadila Healthcare Limited for Zydus Pharmaceuticals Inc. Document filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Battisti, Nicole)
September 13, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Battisti, Nicole)
September 12, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur J. Liederman on behalf of Zydus Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Liederman, Arthur)
September 12, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Marie Battisti on behalf of Zydus Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Battisti, Nicole)
September 9, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nicole Marie Battisti. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1441; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
September 9, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Nicole Marie Battisti to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; multiple Citizenship Plaintiff and Defendant codes were selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
September 9, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nicole Marie Battisti. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Zydus Pharmaceuticals Inc; Thomas Lebron Leon. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
September 9, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 9, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 9, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 8, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Battisti, Nicole) Modified on 9/9/2022 (jgo).
September 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 156979/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26648067).Document filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Zydus Annual Report).(Battisti, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leon v. Zydus Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lebron Leon
Represented By: John Vincent Decolator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Nicole Marie Battisti
Represented By: Arthur J. Liederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?