Maddy v. La-Z-Boy Incorporated
Plaintiff: Veronica Maddy
Defendant: La-Z-Boy Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2022cv07826
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to the Complaint and for the Parties to Submit a Joint Letter and Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Adam Hunt dated October, #1 Complaint. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. La-Z-Boy Incorporated answer due 11/30/2022. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/27/2022) (tg)
October 27, 2022 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to the Complaint and for the Parties to Submit a Joint Letter and Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Adam Hunt dated October 27, 2022. Document filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated..(Hunt, Adam)
October 11, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. La-Z-Boy Incorporated served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. Service was accepted by unknown. Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b) (5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/16/2022) (ks)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by November 14, 2022, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/16/2022) (ks)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by November 14, 2022, e-mail a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, to Orders_and_Judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by November 14, 2022, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/16/2022) (ks)
September 14, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to La-Z-Boy Incorporated. (vf)
September 14, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
September 14, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
September 14, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 13, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to La-Z-Boy Incorporated, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars)
September 13, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against La-Z-Boy Incorporated. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26672213)Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maddy v. La-Z-Boy Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Maddy
Represented By: Mars Khaimov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La-Z-Boy Incorporated
Represented By: Adam James Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?