Reynoso v. J Vitali Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Reynoso
Defendant: J Vitali Transportation and Paul Milton Madore
Case Number: 1:2022cv07857
Filed: September 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Referring Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 10/31/2022) (rro)
October 31, 2022 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file opposition addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Michael Braverman dated October 31, 2022. Document filed by Bryan Reynoso..(Braverman, Michael)
October 31, 2022 Filing 13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file opposition addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michael Braverman dated October 31, 2022. Document filed by Bryan Reynoso..(Braverman, Michael)
October 24, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Dismiss served on Bryan Reynoso on 10/24/2022. Service was made by Fedex. Document filed by J Vitali Transportation, Paul Milton Madore..(DeMott, Renee)
October 21, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by J Vitali Transportation, Paul Milton Madore..(DeMott, Renee)
October 21, 2022 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Renee DeMott in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by J Vitali Transportation, Paul Milton Madore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Police Report).(DeMott, Renee)
October 21, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by J Vitali Transportation, Paul Milton Madore. Responses due by 11/9/2022.(DeMott, Renee)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Conference re: #6 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Renee DeMott dated September 21, 2022. Defendants may move without need for a pre-motion conference. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/30/2022) (rro)
September 23, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
September 23, 2022 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
September 21, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter Motion for Conference served on Bryan Reynoso on September 21, 2022. Document filed by J Vitali Transportation, Paul Milton Madore..(DeMott, Renee)
September 21, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Renee DeMott dated September 21, 2022. Document filed by J Vitali Transportation, Paul Milton Madore..(DeMott, Renee)
September 21, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance, Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of Removal served on Bryan Reynoso c/o Getz and Braverman, P.C. on 09/14/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by J Vitali Transportation, Paul Milton Madore..(DeMott, Renee)
September 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Renee Edythe DeMott. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: J VITALI TRANSPORTATION. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
September 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Renee Edythe DeMott. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State). (sj)
September 15, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
September 15, 2022 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
September 15, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 14, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by J VITALI TRANSPORTATION, Paul Milton Madore..(DeMott, Renee)
September 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Renee Edythe DeMott on behalf of J VITALI TRANSPORTATION, Paul Milton Madore..(DeMott, Renee)
September 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(DeMott, Renee)
September 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 810854/2022E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26677755).Document filed by Paul Milton Madore, J VITALI TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint from New York State Supreme Court, #2 Exhibit Police Report).(DeMott, Renee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynoso v. J Vitali Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Reynoso
Represented By: Michael Ira Braverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Vitali Transportation
Represented By: Renee Edythe DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Milton Madore
Represented By: Renee Edythe DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?