Outlogic, LLC v. Advan Research Corporation, LLC
Plaintiff: Outlogic, LLC
Defendant: Advan Research Corporation, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv08038
Filed: September 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Conference held on 11/9/2022. (ade)
November 9, 2022 The dial-in for the conference at 3:00PM is 888-363-4749 and the access code is 2712517. (Reisig, Lauren)
October 19, 2022 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Brett A. Spain dated October 19, 2022 re: Response to request for pre-motion conference filed by Advan Research Corporation. Document filed by Outlogic, LLC..(Spain, Brett)
October 18, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett A. Spain on behalf of Outlogic, LLC..(Spain, Brett)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/13/2022) (mml)
October 12, 2022 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Letter Application for Pre-Trial Conference addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Sophia Ree dated October 12, 2022. Document filed by Outlogic, LLC..(Ree, Sophia)
October 11, 2022 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Anne C. Reddy dated October 11, 2022 re: Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Advan Research Corporation, LLC..(Reddy, Anne)
October 11, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Chapin Reddy on behalf of Advan Research Corporation, LLC..(Reddy, Anne)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: Outlogic, LLC ("Plaintiff") and Advan Research Corporation, LLC ("Defendant", together "Parties") hereby stipulate as follows: 1. The time for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint [Doc. 4] currently expires on October 17, 2022; 2. The Parties, having conferred through their respective counsel, have stipulated and agreed to extend Defendant's time to respond up to and including October 21, 2022; 3. This is Defendant's first request for an extension of time. SO ORDERED. Advan Research Corporation, LLC answer due 10/21/2022. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/6/2022) (mml) Modified on 10/6/2022 (mml).
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Brett A. Spain to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/6/2022) (kv)
October 6, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Brett A. Spain to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26778941. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
October 5, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Brett A. Spain to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26778941. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Outlogic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Brett A. Spain, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission).(Ree, Sophia)
October 4, 2022 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Outlogic, LLC..(Ree, Sophia)
September 21, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Advan Research Corporation, LLC..(gp)
September 21, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Advan Research Corporation, LLC, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Outlogic, LLC..(Ree, Sophia)
September 21, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ree, Sophia)
September 21, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Advan Research Corporation, LLC. Document filed by Outlogic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Data Monetization Agreement, #2 Exhibit Amendment to the Agreement).(Ree, Sophia)
September 21, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 21, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 21, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 21, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Sophia Ree to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
September 21, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Sophia Ree to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons is not linked to the corresponding pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
September 21, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Sophia Ree. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Outlogic, LLC, Advan Research Corporation, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
September 21, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Sophia Ree. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
September 21, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Sophia Ree to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple citizenships for the plaintiff and defendant were selected, jury demand was not selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
September 20, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Outlogic, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26708338)Document filed by Outlogic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Data Monetization Agreement, #2 Exhibit Amendment to the Agreement).(Ree, Sophia) Modified on 9/21/2022 (pc).
September 20, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Advan Research Corporation, LLC, re: Complaint. Document filed by Outlogic, LLC..(Ree, Sophia) Modified on 9/21/2022 (pc).
September 20, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ree, Sophia) Modified on 9/21/2022 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Outlogic, LLC v. Advan Research Corporation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Outlogic, LLC
Represented By: Sophia Ree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advan Research Corporation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?