Graham v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tonya Graham
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv08134
Filed: September 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Rev. of Final Dec. of Sec. of HEW re: S.S. Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Victoria Treanor on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security..(Treanor, Victoria)
October 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heather Sertial on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security..(Sertial, Heather)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY PACKAGE MAILED to Tonya Graham 2120 Randall Avenue Apt. 8A Bronx, NY 10473, at, on 9/28/2022 Re: #6 Order of Service - Social Security. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, Order granting IFP application, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), in social security cases only, a flyer about pro bono attorneys available through the New York County Lawyers' Association. (aan)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff, appearing prose, brings this action under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), seeking court review of a decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. By order dated September 23, 2022, the Court granted Plaintiffs request to proceed without prepayment of fees, that is, in forrna pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall electronically notify the U.S. Attorney's Office for the SouthernDistrict of New York that this case has been filed.In accordance with the Standing Order "Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings in SocialSecurity Cases," 16-MC-0171 (Apr. 20, 2016):Within 90 days of the date of this order, the Commissioner must serve and file theElectronic Certified Administrative Record (e-CAR), which will constitute theCommissioner's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint.If the Commissioner wishes to file a motion for judgment on the pleadings, theCommissioner must do so within 60 days of the date on which the e-CAR was filed.The motion must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and a full description ofthe underlying administrative proceeding. The plaintiff must file an answering brief within 60 days of the filing of theCommissioner's motion. The Commissioner may file a reply within 21 daysthereafter. Memoranda in support of or in opposition to any dispositive motion may not exceed25 pages in length; reply memoranda may not exceed ten pages in length. A partyseeking to exceed these page limitations must apply to the Court for leave to do so, with copies to all counsel, no fewer than seven days before the date on which thememorandum is due. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 12/27/2022. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/27/2022) (rro) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
September 26, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Tonya Graham 2120 Randall Avenue Apt. 8A Bronx, NY 10473. (kh)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/23/2022) (sha)
September 23, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
September 23, 2022 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (sac)
September 22, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Tonya Graham. (sac)
September 22, 2022 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Tonya Graham. (sac)
September 22, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Heather Sertial
Represented By: Victoria Treanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?