Charbern Management Group LLC, v. Borah, Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins & Goidel, P.C.
Plaintiff: Charbern Management Group LLC,
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: BORAH, GOLDSTEIN, ALTSCHULER, NAHINS & GOIDEL, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2022cv08137
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lm Diversity - Legal Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR MOVE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, that the time for Defendant Borah Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins & Goidel, P.C. to serve an answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiffs' Complaint herein is extended up to and including January 24, 2023. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that Defendant Borah Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins & Goidel, P.C. waives improper service as an affirmative defense. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time (STIPULATION). filed by Borah, Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins & Goidel, P.C.. Borah, Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins & Goidel, P.C. answer due 1/24/2023. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/14/2022) (tg)
November 11, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time (STIPULATION). Document filed by Borah, Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins & Goidel, P.C...(Anesh, Mark)
November 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Kenneth Anesh on behalf of Borah, Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins & Goidel, P.C...(Anesh, Mark)
November 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jamie Rebecca Wozman on behalf of Borah, Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins & Goidel, P.C...(Wozman, Jamie)
October 21, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Borah, Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins & Goidel, P.C.. (sj)
October 20, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Borah, Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins & Goidel, P.C., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charbern Management Group LLC,..(Soloveichik, Yitzchak)
September 28, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Soloveichik, Yitzchak)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") will be held on December 2, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. The IPTC will be held in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, located at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. The parties are directed to submit a joint letter of no more than five pages by November 23, 2022, addressing the following in separate paragraphs: (1) a brief description of the case, including the factual and legal bases for the claim(s) and defense(s); (2) any contemplated motions; (3) the basis for subject matter jurisdiction; (4) the prospect for settlement; and (5) whether the parties believe a Rule 16 conference would be helpful or whether they believe it is unnecessary and ask that their proposed Case Management Plan simply be so ordered. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 12/2/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/27/22) (yv)
September 26, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Yitzchak Eliezer Soloveichik. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: BORAH, GOLDSTEIN, ALTSCHULER, NAHINS & GOIDEL, P.C.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
September 26, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Yitzchak Eliezer Soloveichik to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): civil cover sheet was not signed. (pc)
September 26, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 26, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 26, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 23, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Soloveichik, Yitzchak) Modified on 9/26/2022 (pc).
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BORAH, GOLDSTEIN, ALTSCHULER, NAHINS & GOIDEL, P.C.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26723949)Document filed by Charbern Management Group LLC,..(Soloveichik, Yitzchak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charbern Management Group LLC, v. Borah, Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins & Goidel, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charbern Management Group LLC,
Represented By: Yitzchak Eliezer Soloveichik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: BORAH, GOLDSTEIN, ALTSCHULER, NAHINS & GOIDEL, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?