Collinsville Police Pension Board on behalf of the Collinsville Police Pension Fund v. Discovery, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Collinsville Police Pension Board on behalf of the Collinsville Police Pension Fund, Tome Todorovski and Violeta Todorovski
Defendant: Discovery, Inc., Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc., David Zaslav and Gunnar Wiedenfels
Case Number: 1:2022cv08171
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (15 in 1:22-cv-08171-VEC) Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Collinsville Police Pension Board on behalf of the Collinsville Police Pension Fund. ENDORSEMENT: Because 22-CV-8171 and 22-CV-9125 involve common questions of law and fact, and because the parties do not oppose consolidation, the Court consolidates the actions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to consolidate cases 22-CV-9125 and 22-CV-8171 and to designate 22-CV-8171 as the lead case. All further submissions in this now-consolidated case must be filed under docket number 22-CV-8171. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/4/2022) (tg)
November 3, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #14 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Discovery, Inc., Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc., Gunnar Wiedenfels, David Zaslav..(Polkes, Jonathan)
November 3, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #14 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Tome Todorovski, Violeta Todorovski..(Hood, Joseph)
November 3, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Tome Todorovski, Violeta Todorovski..(Hood, Joseph)
November 3, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #14 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Collinsville Police Pension Board on behalf of the Collinsville Police Pension Fund..(Finkel, Robert)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, by no later than Friday, November 4, 2022, the parties in both matters must show cause why these two cases should not be consolidated pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/27/2022) (tg)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to the Court's approval, by and among the undersigned counsel, that Defendants Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc., David Zaslav, and Gunnar Wiedenfels' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is stayed pending the Court's appointment of a lead plaintiff and lead counsel for lead plaintiff. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/12/2022) (tg)
October 12, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Jonathan D. Polkes dated October 11, 2022 re: stipulation and proposed order staying defendants Warner Bros. Discovery Inc., David Zaslav, and Gunnar Wiedenfels' time to answer or otherwise respond to the Collinsville complaint. Document filed by Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc., Gunnar Wiedenfels, David Zaslav. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation and Proposed Order).(Polkes, Jonathan)
October 12, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Elizabeth Prunetti on behalf of Discovery, Inc., Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc., Gunnar Wiedenfels, David Zaslav..(Prunetti, Nicole)
October 12, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2022, answer due 11/29/2022. Document filed by Collinsville Police Pension Board on behalf of the Collinsville Police Pension Fund..(Finkel, Robert)
October 12, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. David Zaslav waiver sent on 9/30/2022, answer due 11/29/2022. Document filed by Collinsville Police Pension Board on behalf of the Collinsville Police Pension Fund..(Finkel, Robert)
October 12, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gunnar Wiedenfels waiver sent on 9/30/2022, answer due 11/29/2022. Document filed by Collinsville Police Pension Board on behalf of the Collinsville Police Pension Fund..(Finkel, Robert)
September 27, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caroline Jane Hickey on behalf of Discovery, Inc., Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc., Gunnar Wiedenfels, David Zaslav..(Hickey, Caroline)
September 27, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc...(Polkes, Jonathan)
September 27, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan D Polkes on behalf of Discovery, Inc., Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc., Gunnar Wiedenfels, David Zaslav..(Polkes, Jonathan)
September 26, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Discovery, Inc., Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc., Gunnar Wiedenfels, David Zaslav. (vf)
September 26, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Craig Finkel. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
September 26, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Craig Finkel. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Collinsville Police Pension Board on behalf of the Collinsville Police Pension Fund. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
September 26, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
September 26, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
September 26, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 23, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Discovery, Inc., Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc., David Zaslav and Gunnar Wiedenfels, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Collinsville Police Pension Board on behalf of the Collinsville Police Pension Fund..(Finkel, Robert)
September 23, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Finkel, Robert)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Discovery, Inc., Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc., Gunnar Wiedenfels, David Zaslav. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26727393)Document filed by Collinsville Police Pension Board on behalf of the Collinsville Police Pension Fund..(Finkel, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collinsville Police Pension Board on behalf of the Collinsville Police Pension Fund v. Discovery, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collinsville Police Pension Board on behalf of the Collinsville Police Pension Fund
Represented By: Robert Craig Finkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tome Todorovski
Represented By: James Michael LoPiano
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violeta Todorovski
Represented By: James Michael LoPiano
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discovery, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Zalka
Represented By: Jonathan D Polkes
Represented By: Nicole Elizabeth Prunetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Zalka
Represented By: Jonathan D Polkes
Represented By: Nicole Elizabeth Prunetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Zaslav
Represented By: Caroline Zalka
Represented By: Jonathan D Polkes
Represented By: Nicole Elizabeth Prunetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunnar Wiedenfels
Represented By: Jonathan D Polkes
Represented By: Caroline Zalka
Represented By: Nicole Elizabeth Prunetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?