Haitian Bridge Alliance et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Haitian Bridge Alliance, African Communities Together and UndocuBlack Network
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 1:2022cv08344
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tomoko Onozawa on behalf of Federal Bureau of Prisons, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Onozawa, Tomoko)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: granting #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Dana Walsh Kumar dated 11/02/2022. Defendant's request for an extension of 30 days, until December 5, 2022, to file their response to the complaint is granted. SO ORDERED. Federal Bureau of Prisons answer due 12/5/2022; U.S. Customs and Border Protection answer due 12/5/2022; U.S. Department of Homeland Security answer due 12/5/2022; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement answer due 12/5/2022. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/03/2022) (ama)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Tess Hellgren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Allison Crennen-Dunlap to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Sara Fatima Dhanji to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Dana Walsh Kumar dated 11/02/2022. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kumar, Dana)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dana Walsh Kumar on behalf of Federal Bureau of Prisons, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kumar, Dana)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #21 MOTION for Stephen W Manning to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sac)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network. Related Document Number: #21 ..(Manning, Stephen) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 10/17/2022 (sac).
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY MOTION for Stephen W Manning to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Stephen W Manning, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing).(Manning, Stephen) Modified on 10/17/2022 (sac).
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Tess Hellgren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26796583. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sac)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). Federal Bureau of Prisons served on 10/7/2022, answer due 11/7/2022; U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 10/7/2022, answer due 11/7/2022; U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 10/7/2022, answer due 11/7/2022; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 10/7/2022, answer due 11/7/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Haitian Bridge Alliance; UndocuBlack Network; African Communities Together..(Dhanji, Sara)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Tess Hellgren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26796583. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit with Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Hellgren, Tess)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #18 MOTION for Stephen W Manning to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26779068. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (aea)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Stephen W Manning to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26779068. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Stephen W Manning in support of PHV).(Manning, Stephen) Modified on 10/6/2022 (aea).
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Wilfong on behalf of African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network..(Wilfong, Lauren)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Allison Crennen-Dunlap to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26766737. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Allison Crennen-Dunlap to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26766737. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit with Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Crennen-Dunlap, Allison)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (sj)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau of Prisons. (sj)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (sj)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (sj)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Sara Fatima Dhanji to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26756311. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Sara Fatima Dhanji to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26756311. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order ).(Dhanji, Sara)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Telo Gillman on behalf of African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network..(Gillman, Sarah)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Prisons, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network..(Fuzesi, Stephen)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network..(Fuzesi, Stephen)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network..(Fuzesi, Stephen)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network..(Fuzesi, Stephen)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by UndocuBlack Network..(Fuzesi, Stephen)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Haitian Bridge Alliance..(Fuzesi, Stephen)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by African Communities Together..(Fuzesi, Stephen)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fuzesi, Stephen)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Prisons, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-26754675)Document filed by Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network, African Communities Together. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Fuzesi, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haitian Bridge Alliance et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haitian Bridge Alliance
Represented By: Sara Fatima Dhanji
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Fuzesi
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Allison Crennen-Dunlap
Represented By: Lauren Wilfong
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: African Communities Together
Represented By: Sara Fatima Dhanji
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Fuzesi
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Represented By: Lauren Wilfong
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Allison Crennen-Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UndocuBlack Network
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Fuzesi
Represented By: Sara Fatima Dhanji
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Allison Crennen-Dunlap
Represented By: Lauren Wilfong
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Dana Walsh Kumar
Represented By: Tomoko Onozawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Dana Walsh Kumar
Represented By: Tomoko Onozawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Tomoko Onozawa
Represented By: Dana Walsh Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Dana Walsh Kumar
Represented By: Tomoko Onozawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?