Brit Syndicates LTD. v. Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brit Syndicate LTD., Brit Syndicates LTD., Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. CNP 4444 65% / CNP 1861 35%, Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 2001 AML, Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 0382 HDU, Assicurazioni Generali S.P.A., Aviva Insurance Limited, ILU 4044019, Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1221 HIG, Zurich Insurance Plc UK Branch, Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1274 AUL and Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1225 AES AML
Defendant: Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Ocean Network Express, Pte. Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2022cv08371
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30701 Marine Cargo Loss or Damage - Liability of Water Carriers
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ocean Network Express, Pte. Ltd...(pc)
November 9, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Corey Russell Greenwald. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1225 AES AML, Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 0382 AML. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (pc)
November 7, 2022 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ocean Network Express, Pte., Ltd., re: #21 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint. Document filed by Expeditors International of Washington, Inc...(Block, Steven)
November 7, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint,,., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ocean Network Express, Pte. Ltd.. Document filed by Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Block, Steven)
November 7, 2022 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #9 Amended Complaint,, #1 Complaint against Expeditors International of Washington, Inc..Document filed by Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 0382 AML, Zurich Insurance Plc UK Branch, Brit Syndicates LTD., Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 2001 AML, Assicurazioni Generali S.P.A., Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1274 AUL, Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. CNP 4444 65% / CNP 1861 35%, Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1221 HIG, Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1225 AES AML, Aviva Insurance Limited, ILU 4044019. Related document: #9 Amended Complaint,, #1 Complaint..(Greenwald, Corey) Modified on 11/9/2022 (pc).
October 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Corey Russell Greenwald to RE-FILE re: Document No. #9 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
October 26, 2022 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AEGIS Electric & Gas International Services Limited, Corporate Parent AEGIS Electric & Gas International Services 5 Limited for Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1225 AES AML. Document filed by Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1225 AES AML..(Greenwald, Corey)
October 26, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Corey Russell Greenwald to RE-FILE Document No. #14 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
October 25, 2022 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd for Zurich Insurance Plc UK Branch. Document filed by Zurich Insurance Plc UK Branch..(Greenwald, Corey)
October 25, 2022 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Canopius Group Limited for Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. CNP 4444 65% / CNP 1861 35%. Document filed by Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. CNP 4444 65% / CNP 1861 35%..(Greenwald, Corey)
October 25, 2022 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 2001 AML..(Greenwald, Corey)
October 25, 2022 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Antares Global Holdings Limited for Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1274 AUL. Document filed by Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1274 AUL..(Greenwald, Corey)
October 25, 2022 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1225 AES AML..(Greenwald, Corey) Modified on 10/26/2022 (lb).
October 25, 2022 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Navigators Holdings (UK) Limited for Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1221 HIG. Document filed by Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1221 HIG..(Greenwald, Corey)
October 25, 2022 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hardy Underwriting Bermuda Limited for Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 0382 AML. Document filed by Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 0382 AML..(Greenwald, Corey)
October 25, 2022 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Aviva Insurance Limited, ILU 4044019..(Greenwald, Corey)
October 25, 2022 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Gruppo Mediobanca for Assicurazioni Generali S.P.A.. Document filed by Assicurazioni Generali S.P.A...(Greenwald, Corey)
October 25, 2022 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, #8 Amended Complaint against Expeditors International of Washington, Inc..Document filed by Brit Syndicates LTD., Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. CNP 4444 65% / CNP 1861 35%, Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 2001 AML, Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 0382 AML, Assicurazioni Generali S.P.A., Aviva Insurance Limited, ILU 4044019, Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1221 HIG, Zurich Insurance Plc UK Branch, Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1274 AUL, Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1225 AES AML. Related document: #1 Complaint, #8 Amended Complaint.(Greenwald, Corey) Modified on 10/27/2022 (sj).
October 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Corey Russell Greenwald to RE-FILE re: Document No. #8 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; not all of the filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
October 24, 2022 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Expeditors International of Washington, Inc..Document filed by Brit Syndicates LTD.. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Greenwald, Corey) Modified on 10/25/2022 (vf).
October 11, 2022 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
October 11, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
October 11, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
October 10, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven William Block on behalf of Expeditors International of Washington, Inc...(Block, Steven)
October 3, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.. (vf)
October 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Corey Russell Greenwald. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (vf)
October 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Corey Russell Greenwald. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Brit Syndicate LTD. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (vf)
October 3, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
October 3, 2022 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 1:22-md-3028. (vf)
October 3, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 30, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brit Syndicate LTD...(Greenwald, Corey)
September 30, 2022 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-md-3028 (PAE). Document filed by Brit Syndicate LTD...(Greenwald, Corey)
September 30, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Brit Syndicate LTD...(Greenwald, Corey)
September 30, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Greenwald, Corey)
September 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26758411)Document filed by Brit Syndicate LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1).(Greenwald, Corey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brit Syndicates LTD. v. Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brit Syndicate LTD.
Represented By: Corey Russell Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brit Syndicates LTD.
Represented By: Corey Russell Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. CNP 4444 65% / CNP 1861 35%
Represented By: Corey Russell Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 2001 AML
Represented By: Corey Russell Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 0382 HDU
Represented By: Corey Russell Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assicurazioni Generali S.P.A.
Represented By: Corey Russell Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aviva Insurance Limited, ILU 4044019
Represented By: Corey Russell Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1221 HIG
Represented By: Corey Russell Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich Insurance Plc UK Branch
Represented By: Corey Russell Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1274 AUL
Represented By: Corey Russell Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 1225 AES AML
Represented By: Corey Russell Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.
Represented By: Steven William Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ocean Network Express, Pte. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?