Citibank, N.A. v. Aralpa Holdings Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: CITIBANK, N.A.
Defendant: ARALPA HOLDINGS LP, RODRIGO LEBOIS MATEOS and Aralpa Holdings Limited Partnership
Case Number: 1:2022cv08842
Filed: October 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Rochon
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Aralpa Holdings Limited Partnership, Rodrigo Lebois Mateos..(Saval, Daniel)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Aralpa Holdings Limited Partnership, Rodrigo Lebois Mateos..(Saval, Daniel)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Defendants dated November 8, 2022. Defendants' request is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint no later than December 9, 2022. SO ORDERED. Aralpa Holdings Limited Partnership answer due 12/9/2022; Rodrigo Lebois Mateos answer due 12/9/2022. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 11/09/2022) (ama)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Defendants dated November 8, 2022. Document filed by Aralpa Holdings Limited Partnership, Rodrigo Lebois Mateos..(Saval, Daniel)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Gennaro Conte on behalf of Aralpa Holdings Limited Partnership, Rodrigo Lebois Mateos..(Conte, John)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Joseph Saval on behalf of Aralpa Holdings Limited Partnership, Rodrigo Lebois Mateos..(Saval, Daniel)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Judge Jennifer L. Rochon's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases served on Rodrigo Lebois Mateos on October 21, 2022. Service was accepted by Osmara Martinez, Process Specialist for the CT Corporation. Document filed by Citibank, N.A...(Fishman, Marshall)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Judge Jennifer L. Rochon's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases served on Aralpa Holdings Limited Partnership on October 21, 2022. Service was accepted by Osmara Martinez, Process Specialist for the CT Corporation. Document filed by Citibank, N.A...(Fishman, Marshall)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on January 3, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. Initial Conference set for 1/3/2023 at 02:30 PM before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 10/21/2022) (ate)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Rodrigo Lebois Mateos served on 10/19/2022, answer due 11/9/2022. Service was accepted by Kartik Pandya, Process Specialist for CT Corporation System. Document filed by Citibank, N.A...(Fishman, Marshall)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Aralpa Holdings Limited Partnership served on 10/19/2022, answer due 11/9/2022. Service was accepted by Kartik Pandya, Process Specialist for CT Corporation System. Document filed by Citibank, N.A...(Fishman, Marshall)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aralpa Holdings Limited Partnership, Rodrigo Lebois Mateos. (vf)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aralpa Holdings Limited Partnership and Rodrigo Lebois Mateos, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Citibank, N.A...(Fishman, Marshall)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fishman, Marshall)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Marshall Howard Fishman to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the docket entry text must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marshall Howard Fishman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CITIBANK, N.A.; ARALPA HOLDINGS LP; RODRIGO LEBOIS MATEOS. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marshall Howard Fishman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand none; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Marshall Howard Fishman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the PDF was not properly signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Eaton Hoyle on behalf of CITIBANK, N.A...(Hoyle, Lindsay)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Joseph Rubin on behalf of CITIBANK, N.A...(Rubin, Samuel)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marshall Howard Fishman on behalf of CITIBANK, N.A...(Fishman, Marshall)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CitiGroup Inc., Corporate Parent Citicorp LLC for CITIBANK, N.A.. Document filed by CITIBANK, N.A...(Fishman, Marshall)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ARALPA HOLDINGS LP; RODRIGO LEBOIS MATEOS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by CITIBANK, N.A...(Fishman, Marshall) Modified on 10/18/2022 (jgo).
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fishman, Marshall) Modified on 10/18/2022 (jgo).
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARALPA HOLDINGS LP, RODRIGO LEBOIS MATEOS. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26825092)Document filed by CITIBANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5).(Fishman, Marshall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citibank, N.A. v. Aralpa Holdings Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITIBANK, N.A.
Represented By: Lindsay Eaton Hoyle
Represented By: Samuel Joseph Rubin
Represented By: Marshall Howard Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARALPA HOLDINGS LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODRIGO LEBOIS MATEOS
Represented By: John Gennaro Conte
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Saval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aralpa Holdings Limited Partnership
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Saval
Represented By: John Gennaro Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?