Terrell v. Revlon Consumer Products Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Rhonda Terrell
Defendant: Revlon Consumer Products Corp., Revlon Inc, L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA Inc., Soft Sheen/Carson Inc., Soft Sheen Carson (W.I.), INC., Strength of Nature Global, LLC and Strength of Nature, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv09008
Filed: October 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pl Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Strength of Nature, LLC served on 12/13/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. Service was accepted by Leon Lilly. Document filed by Rhonda Terrell..(Levitt, Adam)
December 13, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Soft Sheen/Carson Inc. served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Legal Representative. Document filed by Rhonda Terrell..(Levitt, Adam)
December 13, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. L'Oreal USA Products, Inc. served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. Service was accepted by Leroy Pelicci, Legal Counsel. Document filed by Rhonda Terrell..(Levitt, Adam)
December 13, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. L'Oreal USA Inc. served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. Service was accepted by Leroy Pelicci, Legal Counsel. Document filed by Rhonda Terrell..(Levitt, Adam)
December 2, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to L'Oreal USA Inc., L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., Soft Sheen/Carson Inc., Strength of Nature, LLC. (sj)
December 1, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to L'Oreal USA, Inc, LOreal USA Products, Inc., Strength of Nature, LLC, Soft Sheen/Carson Inc., re: #4 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Rhonda Terrell. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Parties to Serve Summons).(Levitt, Adam)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This Court encourages plaintiffs to serve defendants promptly. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/3/2022) (tg)
October 31, 2022 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against L'Oreal USA Inc., L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., Soft Sheen/Carson Inc., Strength of Nature, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Rhonda Terrell. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Levitt, Adam)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by no later than Monday, October 31, 2022, Plaintiff must file an amended complaint that cures the deficiencies described herein or the complaint will be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2022.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/25/2022) (tg)
October 24, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Adam J Levitt to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; multiple Citizenship Defendant codes was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
October 24, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Adam J Levitt to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
October 24, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Adam J Levitt. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State);. (jgo)
October 24, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 24, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 24, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 21, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levitt, Adam) Modified on 10/24/2022 (jgo).
October 21, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26854622)Document filed by Rhonda Terrell..(Levitt, Adam) Modified on 10/24/2022 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrell v. Revlon Consumer Products Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Terrell
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revlon Consumer Products Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revlon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soft Sheen/Carson Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soft Sheen Carson (W.I.), INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strength of Nature Global, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strength of Nature, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?