New York Times Company et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services,
Plaintiff: New York Times Company and Hannah Dreier
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services,
Case Number: 1:2022cv09070
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Barbara C Moses
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 Status Report filed by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The December 20, 2022 status conference is adjourned sine die. The parties shall submit a joint status update to the Court no later than January 20, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 12/14/2022) (rro)
December 13, 2022 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services,..(Bannon, Zachary)
November 28, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services,..(Bannon, Zachary)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The parties have consented to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). All motions and applications must be made in compliance with Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses's Individual Practices, available on the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-barbara-moses. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/20/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 11/17/2022) (jca)
November 16, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Hannah Dreier, New York Times Company, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services,. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/16/2022). (ate)
November 16, 2022 Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Status Report filed by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. ENDORSEMENT: In light of the fact that the parties have consented to proceed before Magistrate Judge Moses for all proceedings, all future applications shall be decided by Judge Moses. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/16/2022) (ate)
November 15, 2022 Filing 10 PROPOSED CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Hannah Dreier, New York Times Company. Document filed by Hannah Dreier, New York Times Company..(McCraw, David)
November 15, 2022 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services,..(Bannon, Zachary)
November 15, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Bannon on behalf of U.S. Department of Health and Human Services,..(Bannon, Zachary)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby:ORDERED that, by November 15, 2022, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5)pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: and further set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on November 22, 2022 at 4:00 p.m. If Defendant has not yet been properly served, has not filed a responsive pleading, and/or the parties otherwise seek to adjourn the conference, they shall notify the Court by no later than November 15, 2022. Unless the parties request otherwise, the Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. If Defendant has been properly served and the parties are available to proceed with an initial status conference prior to November 22, 2022, the parties shall notify the Court and propose an earlier date for the conference, as well as for submission of the status letter and proposed case management plan. Initial Conference set for 11/22/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/1/2022) (rro)
October 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Al-Amyn Shiraz Sumar on behalf of Hannah Dreier, New York Times Company..(Sumar, Al-Amyn)
October 25, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services,..(pc)
October 25, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 25, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 25, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 24, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hannah Dreier, New York Times Company..(McCraw, David)
October 24, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Health & Human Services, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hannah Dreier, New York Times Company..(McCraw, David)
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCraw, David)
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Health and Human Services,. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26857030)Document filed by New York Times Company, Hannah Dreier..(McCraw, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Times Company et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Times Company
Represented By: David Edward McCraw
Represented By: Al-Amyn Shiraz Sumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Dreier
Represented By: David Edward McCraw
Represented By: Al-Amyn Shiraz Sumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services,
Represented By: Zachary Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?