Cruz Guerrero et al v. Montefiore Health System Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Danny Ramirez Cruz Guerrero, Cristopher Ismael Ramirez Morel, Luis Valdez Garcia and Elsido Rodriguez
Defendant: Montefiore Health System Inc. and CSS Building Solutions Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv09194
Filed: October 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA, 29 U.S.C. 201 et seq.. Document filed by Elsido Rodriguez..(Mercado, Christian)
November 21, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Montefiore Health System Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2022, answer due 1/7/2023. Document filed by Danny Ramirez Cruz Guerrero; Luis Valdez Garcia; Cristopher Ismael Ramirez Morel..(Mercado, Christian)
November 16, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. CSS Building Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2022, answer due 1/7/2023. Document filed by Danny Ramirez Cruz Guerrero; Luis Valdez Garcia; Cristopher Ismael Ramirez Morel..(Mercado, Christian)
November 7, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA, 29 U.S.C. 201 et seq.. Document filed by Luis Valdez Garcia..(Mercado, Christian)
November 7, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA, 29 U.S.C. 201 et seq.. Document filed by Cristopher Ismael Ramirez Morel..(Mercado, Christian)
November 1, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA, 29 U.S.C. 201 et seq.. Document filed by Danny Ramirez Cruz Guerrero..(Mercado, Christian)
October 28, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Montefiore Health System Inc...(jgo)
October 28, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CSS Building Solutions Inc...(jgo)
October 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 28, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Louis Pechman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Danny Ramirez Cruz Guerrero; Cristopher Ismael Ramirez Morel. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
October 28, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 27, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian Mauricio Mercado on behalf of Danny Ramirez Cruz Guerrero, Cristopher Ismael Ramirez Morel..(Mercado, Christian)
October 27, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CSS Building Solutions Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Danny Ramirez Cruz Guerrero, Cristopher Ismael Ramirez Morel..(Pechman, Louis)
October 27, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Montefiore Health System Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Danny Ramirez Cruz Guerrero, Cristopher Ismael Ramirez Morel..(Pechman, Louis)
October 27, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pechman, Louis)
October 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSS Building Solutions Inc., Montefiore Health System Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26878202)Document filed by Danny Ramirez Cruz Guerrero, Cristopher Ismael Ramirez Morel..(Pechman, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz Guerrero et al v. Montefiore Health System Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Ramirez Cruz Guerrero
Represented By: Christian Mauricio Mercado
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristopher Ismael Ramirez Morel
Represented By: Christian Mauricio Mercado
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Valdez Garcia
Represented By: Christian Mauricio Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsido Rodriguez
Represented By: Christian Mauricio Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montefiore Health System Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSS Building Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?