Breshanaj v. Silverstone Property Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trevi Breshanaj
Defendant: Silverstone Property Group, LLC and Madison Realty Capital, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2022cv09293
Filed: October 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 1/10/2023. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/10/2019) (rpr)
December 22, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Madison Realty Capital, L.P., Silverstone Property Group, LLC..(Morris, Daniel)
December 22, 2022 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Silverstone Property Group, LLC..(Morris, Daniel)
December 22, 2022 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Madison Realty Capital, L.P...(Morris, Daniel)
December 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel William Morris on behalf of Madison Realty Capital, L.P., Silverstone Property Group, LLC..(Morris, Daniel)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application GRANTED. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before December 22, 2022. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 7. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/21/2022) (ks)
November 21, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Madison Realty Capital, L.P. answer due 12/22/2022; Silverstone Property Group, LLC answer due 12/22/2022. (ks)
November 18, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File motion, answer, or other response addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Ian-Paul A. Poulos dated November 18, 2022. Document filed by Madison Realty Capital, L.P., Silverstone Property Group, LLC..(Poulos, Ian-Paul)
November 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ian-Paul Apostole Poulos on behalf of Madison Realty Capital, L.P., Silverstone Property Group, LLC..(Poulos, Ian-Paul)
November 1, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Madison Realty Capital, L.P. served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022; Silverstone Property Group, LLC served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022. Service was accepted by New York Secretary of State. Document filed by Trevi Breshanaj..(Hassan, Abdul)
October 31, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Madison Realty Capital, L.P., Silverstone Property Group, LLC..(pc)
October 31, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 31, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 31, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 31, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Abdul Karim Hassan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 29:020;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:216 (b);. (pc)
October 30, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hassan, Abdul)
October 30, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Silverstone Property Group, LLC, and Madison Realty Capital, L.P., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Trevi Breshanaj..(Hassan, Abdul)
October 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Madison Realty Capital, L.P., Silverstone Property Group, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26891809)Document filed by Trevi Breshanaj..(Hassan, Abdul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breshanaj v. Silverstone Property Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevi Breshanaj
Represented By: Abdul Karim Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverstone Property Group, LLC
Represented By: Ian-Paul Apostole Poulos
Represented By: Daniel William Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Realty Capital, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel William Morris
Represented By: Ian-Paul Apostole Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?