Villano et al v. Broadway Viva, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Martin Villano, Victor Morales, Marcos Diego Tapia, Jorge Luis Garcia, Juan Falcon Garcia and Chantel De Wee
Defendant: Broadway Viva, Inc., Viva Natural Pizza Inc., Anthony Iracani, Justin Iracani, Lenny Iracani, Broadway Viva, Inc. doing business as Cafe Viva Gourmet Pizza and Viva Natural Pizza Inc. doing business as Viva Cucina
Case Number: 1:2022cv09417
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties herein that Defendants acknowledge proper service of the summons and amended complaint in this action; and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that the time for Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the amended complaint is extended to and includes January 15, 2023. SO ORDERED., Broadway Viva, Inc. answer due 1/15/2023; Anthony Iracani answer due 1/15/2023; Justin Iracani answer due 1/15/2023; Lenny Iracani answer due 1/15/2023; Viva Natural Pizza Inc. answer due 1/15/2023. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 12/13/2022) (ama)
December 12, 2022 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Broadway Viva, Inc., Anthony Iracani, Justin Iracani, Lenny Iracani, Viva Natural Pizza Inc...(Weiss, Adam)
December 9, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Giustino Cilenti re: Document No. #14 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Martin Villano, Victor Morales, Marcos Diego Tapia, Jorge Luis Garcia, Juan Falcon Garcia and Chantel De Wee must be added to the docket again with party text 'on behalf of others similarly situated'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (sj)
December 8, 2022 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Broadway Viva, Inc., Anthony Iracani, Justin Iracani, Lenny Iracani, Viva Natural Pizza Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Marcos Diego Tapia, Victor Morales, Jorge Luis Garcia, Martin Villano, Chantel De Wee, Juan Falcon Garcia. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Cilenti, Giustino) Modified on 12/9/2022 (sj).
December 5, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Juan Falcon Garcia..(Cilenti, Giustino)
December 5, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Chantel De Wee..(Cilenti, Giustino)
November 29, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Casimir Weiss on behalf of Broadway Viva, Inc., Anthony Iracani, Justin Iracani, Lenny Iracani, Viva Natural Pizza Inc...(Weiss, Adam)
November 28, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Juan Falcon Garcia..(Cilenti, Giustino)
November 28, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Broadway Viva, Inc. served on 11/14/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Marcos Diego Tapia; Victor Morales; Jorge Luis Garcia; Martin Villano..(Cilenti, Giustino)
November 28, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Viva Natural Pizza Inc. served on 11/14/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Marcos Diego Tapia; Victor Morales; Jorge Luis Garcia; Martin Villano..(Cilenti, Giustino)
November 11, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Lenny Iracani served on 11/8/2022, answer due 11/29/2022. Service was accepted by Miguel R., General Agent. Document filed by Marcos Diego Tapia; Victor Morales; Jorge Luis Garcia; Martin Villano..(Cilenti, Giustino)
November 11, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Justin Iracani served on 11/8/2022, answer due 11/29/2022. Service was accepted by Miguel R., General Agent. Document filed by Marcos Diego Tapia; Victor Morales; Jorge Luis Garcia; Martin Villano..(Cilenti, Giustino)
November 11, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Anthony Iracani served on 11/8/2022, answer due 11/29/2022. Service was accepted by Miguel R., General Agent. Document filed by Marcos Diego Tapia; Victor Morales; Jorge Luis Garcia; Martin Villano..(Cilenti, Giustino)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Broadway Viva, Inc., Anthony Iracani, Justin Iracani, Lenny Iracani, Viva Natural Pizza Inc...(pc)
November 4, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 4, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Giustino Cilenti. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx;. (pc)
November 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Giustino Cilenti re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Marcos Diego Tapia, Victor Morales, Jorge Luis Garcia, Martin Villano to CM ECF with the party text "on behalf of others similarly situated". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
November 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Giustino Cilenti. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Marcos Diego Tapia, Victor Morales, Jorge Luis Garcia, Martin Villano, Broadway Viva, Inc., Viva Natural Pizza Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
November 3, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Broadway Viva, Inc., Viva Natural Pizza Inc., Anthony Iracani, Justin Iracani, and Lenny Iracani, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jorge Luis Garcia, Victor Morales, Marcos Diego Tapia, Martin Villano..(Cilenti, Giustino)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cilenti, Giustino)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Broadway Viva, Inc., Anthony Iracani, Justin Iracani, Lenny Iracani, Viva Natural Pizza Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26913490)Document filed by Marcos Diego Tapia, Victor Morales, Jorge Luis Garcia, Martin Villano..(Cilenti, Giustino)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villano et al v. Broadway Viva, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Villano
Represented By: Giustino Cilenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Morales
Represented By: Giustino Cilenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Diego Tapia
Represented By: Giustino Cilenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Luis Garcia
Represented By: Giustino Cilenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Falcon Garcia
Represented By: Giustino Cilenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantel De Wee
Represented By: Giustino Cilenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadway Viva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viva Natural Pizza Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Iracani
Represented By: Adam Casimir Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Iracani
Represented By: Adam Casimir Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenny Iracani
Represented By: Adam Casimir Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadway Viva, Inc. doing business as Cafe Viva Gourmet Pizza
Represented By: Adam Casimir Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viva Natural Pizza Inc. doing business as Viva Cucina
Represented By: Adam Casimir Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?