Better Holdco, Inc. v. Pierce
Plaintiff: Better Holdco, Inc.
Defendant: Sarah J. Pierce and Sarah Pierce
Case Number: 1:2022cv09580
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 nr Diversity: Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Sarah Pierce..(Leonard, Ethan)
December 29, 2022 Filing 17 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #12 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Sarah Pierce..(Leonard, Ethan)
December 29, 2022 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Sarah Pierce in Opposition re: #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Sarah Pierce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stock Option Agreement and Note, #2 Exhibit Stock Option Agreement and Note, #3 Exhibit Premature Demand and Settlement Proffer, #4 Exhibit Initial Federal Complaint by Pierce, #5 Exhibit OSHA Complaint by Pierce, #6 Exhibit Correspondence, #7 Exhibit Email Correspondence, #8 Exhibit Proposed Amended Federal Complaint).(Leonard, Ethan)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER with respect to #11 Motion for Summary Judgment. On October 11, 2022, Plaintiff, Better Holdco, Inc. ("Better"), filed a motion for summary judgment in lieu of complaint in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. ECF No. 1-2. On November 9, 2022, Defendant, Sarah Pierce, removed the action to the Southern District of New York. ECF No. 1. On December 9, 2022, this action was assigned to the undersigned. Dkt. Entry 12/9/22. Accordingly, by December 30, 2022, Defendant shall file her opposition to Plaintiff's motion. By January 13, 2023, Plaintiff shall file its reply, if any. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/09/2022) (tg)
December 9, 2022 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-04748-AT. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
December 9, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
December 9, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
December 9, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/30/2022 Replies due by 1/13/2023. (tg)
November 30, 2022 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Brian Ro in Support re: #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Better Holdco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amendment to Stock Option Agreement to purchase 300,000 shares, #2 Exhibit B - Amendment to Stock Option Agreement to purchase 150,000 shares, #3 Exhibit C - March 30, 2022 email from Better to Pierce, #4 Exhibit D - Stock Repurchase and Cancellation of Indebtedness Agreement).(Kaplan, Roberta)
November 30, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Better Holdco, Inc...(Kaplan, Roberta)
November 30, 2022 Filing 12 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Better Holdco, Inc...(Kaplan, Roberta)
November 30, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Better Holdco, Inc...(Kaplan, Roberta)
November 30, 2022 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Better Holdco, Inc...(Kaplan, Roberta)
November 28, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Better Holdco, Inc...(Kaplan, Roberta)
November 28, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kate Linsley Doniger on behalf of Better Holdco, Inc...(Doniger, Kate)
November 28, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Sun Martin on behalf of Better Holdco, Inc...(Martin, Timothy)
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roberta Ann Kaplan on behalf of Better Holdco, Inc...(Kaplan, Roberta)
November 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ethan York Leonard. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sarah J. Pierce. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
November 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ethan York Leonard. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Dollar Demand (none); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $2,270,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
November 10, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
November 10, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 10, 2022 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Analisa Torres as possibly related to 1:22cv4748. (sj)
November 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Neal Brickman on behalf of Sarah J. Pierce..(Brickman, Neal)
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Neal Brickman re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-04748. Document filed by Sarah J. Pierce..(Leonard, Ethan)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sarah J. Pierce..(Leonard, Ethan)
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Leonard, Ethan)
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653744/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26940280).Document filed by Sarah J. Pierce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Notice of Motion from State Court, #2 Exhibit Memorandum of Law from State Court, #3 Exhibit Affidavit in Support from State Court, #4 Exhibit Ex A to Affidavit in Support from State Court, #5 Exhibit Ex B to Affidavit in Support from State Court, #6 Exhibit Ex C to Affidavit in Support from State Court, #7 Exhibit Rule 35 Disclosure from State Court, #8 Exhibit RJI from State Court, #9 Exhibit RJI Addendum from State Court, #10 Exhibit Affidavits of Service from State Court).(Leonard, Ethan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Better Holdco, Inc. v. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Better Holdco, Inc.
Represented By: Roberta Ann Kaplan
Represented By: Kate Linsley Doniger
Represented By: Timothy Sun Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah J. Pierce
Represented By: Neal Brickman
Represented By: Ethan York Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Pierce
Represented By: Neal Brickman
Represented By: Ethan York Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?