Luna Aura LLC v. 3LAU Entertainment LLC et al
Plaintiff: Luna Aura LLC
Defendant: 3LAU Entertainment LLC, Blume LLC and Justin Blau
Case Number: 1:2022cv09598
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 294 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Ganoza on behalf of 3LAU Entertainment LLC, Justin Blau, Blume LLC..(Ganoza, Laura)
December 14, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Louis Lee on behalf of 3LAU Entertainment LLC, Justin Blau, Blume LLC..(Lee, Andrew)
December 1, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. 3LAU Entertainment LLC waiver sent on 11/28/2022, answer due 1/27/2023; Justin Blau waiver sent on 11/28/2022, answer due 1/27/2023; Blume LLC waiver sent on 11/28/2022, answer due 1/27/2023. Document filed by Luna Aura LLC..(Feinberg, Matthew)
November 30, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/30/2022) (tg)
November 23, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against 3LAU Entertainment LLC, Justin Blau, Blume LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Luna Aura LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Feinberg, Matthew)
November 22, 2022 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 3LAU Entertainment LLC..(gp)
November 22, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Blume LLC..(gp)
November 22, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Justin Blau..(gp)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by no later than Monday, November 28, 2022, Plaintiff must file an amended complaint that cures the deficiencies described herein or the complaint will be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED.( Amended Pleadings due by 11/28/2022.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/21/2022) (vfr)
November 15, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Justin Blau, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Luna Aura LLC..(Feinberg, Matthew)
November 15, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BLUME LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Luna Aura LLC..(Feinberg, Matthew)
November 15, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 3LAU ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Luna Aura LLC..(Feinberg, Matthew)
November 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew H. Feinberg on behalf of Luna Aura LLC..(Feinberg, Matthew)
November 11, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Peltz, Moish)
November 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Paul Michael O'Brien to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Form is blank. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
November 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Paul Michael O'Brien. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Luna Aura. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (vf)
November 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul Michael O'Brien. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
November 10, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 10, 2022 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 10, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Moish Eli Peltz on behalf of Luna Aura LLC..(Peltz, Moish)
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Brien, Paul) Modified on 11/10/2022 (vf).
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3LAU Entertainment LLC, Justin Blau, Blume LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26941439)Document filed by Luna Aura LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Contract).(O'Brien, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna Aura LLC v. 3LAU Entertainment LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luna Aura LLC
Represented By: Moish Eli Peltz
Represented By: Paul Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Matthew H. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3LAU Entertainment LLC
Represented By: Laura Ganoza
Represented By: Andrew Louis Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blume LLC
Represented By: Andrew Louis Lee
Represented By: Laura Ganoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Blau
Represented By: Laura Ganoza
Represented By: Andrew Louis Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?