Ultra Records, LLC v. Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC
Plaintiff: Ultra Records, LLC
Defendant: Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv09667
Filed: November 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Ethan Horwitz dated December 22, 2022. The request for a second, 15-day, extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint (from January 5, 2023, to January 19, 2023) is granted. SO ORDERED. Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC answer due 1/19/2023. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/22/2022) (ama)
December 22, 2022 Filing 12 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Ethan Horwitz dated December 22, 2022. Document filed by Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC..(Horwitz, Ethan)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Ethan Horwitz dated December 6, 2022. Defendant Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC's request for an initial extension of time to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint (from December 6, 2022, to January 5, 2023) is granted. SO ORDERED. Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC answer due 1/5/2023. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/06/2022) (ama)
December 6, 2022 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Ethan Horwitz dated December 6, 2022. Document filed by Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC..(Horwitz, Ethan)
November 16, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC served on 11/15/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan. Document filed by Ultra Records, LLC..(Ewing, Bruce)
November 15, 2022 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj)
November 14, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kaleb McNeely on behalf of Ultra Records, LLC..(McNeely, Kaleb)
November 14, 2022 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Ewing, Bruce)
November 14, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC..(jgo)
November 14, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Bruce Roy Millar Ewing to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
November 14, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bruce Roy Millar Ewing. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:44; Dollar Demand $500,000,000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:1114; the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
November 14, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 14, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 14, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 11, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ultra Records, LLC..(Ewing, Bruce)
November 11, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT, a Delaware partnership, Corporate Parent Sony Group Corporation for Ultra Records, LLC. Document filed by Ultra Records, LLC..(Ewing, Bruce)
November 11, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ewing, Bruce)
November 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26950169)Document filed by Ultra Records, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Ewing, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ultra Records, LLC v. Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ultra Records, LLC
Represented By: Bruce Roy Millar Ewing
Represented By: Kaleb McNeely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC
Represented By: Ethan Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?