The Pullman Group, LLC v. Bauknight et al
Plaintiff: The Pullman Group, LLC
Defendant: Russell Bauknight, James Brown Enterprises, Inc., James Brown, L.L.C., Primary Wave Music Publishing LLC and Shot Tower Capital LLC
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: John Doe Corporations 1-5
Case Number: 1:2022cv09713
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Filing 25 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Court thanks Mr. Battles for his work on this cases and wishes him the best in his future endeavors. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Mr. Battles from the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 24. Attorney Benjamin Daniel Battles terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/13/2022) (rro)
December 12, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for Bejamin D. Battles to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by The Pullman Group, LLC..(Battles, Benjamin)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #22 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Benjamin D. Battles dated December 7, 2022., #14 Complaint. Application GRANTED. All Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before January 17, 2023. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 22. SO ORDERED. John Doe Corporations 1-5 answer due 1/17/2023; Primary Wave Music Publishing LLC answer due 1/17/2023; Shot Tower Capital LLC answer due 1/17/2023. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/7/2022) (tg)
December 7, 2022 Filing 22 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Benjamin D. Battles dated December 7, 2022. Document filed by The Pullman Group, LLC..(Battles, Benjamin)
November 28, 2022 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Shot Tower Capital LLC served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Intake Specialist. Document filed by The Pullman Group, LLC..(Battles, Benjamin)
November 28, 2022 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Primary Wave Music Publishing LLC served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. Service was accepted by Sophia Popovits, Manager. Document filed by The Pullman Group, LLC..(Battles, Benjamin)
November 28, 2022 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. James Brown, L.L.C. waiver sent on 11/18/2022, answer due 1/17/2023. Document filed by The Pullman Group, LLC..(Battles, Benjamin)
November 28, 2022 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. James Brown Enterprises, Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2022, answer due 1/17/2023. Document filed by The Pullman Group, LLC..(Battles, Benjamin)
November 28, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Russell Bauknight waiver sent on 11/18/2022, answer due 1/17/2023. Document filed by The Pullman Group, LLC..(Battles, Benjamin)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/3/2023 at 04:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/21/2022) (ks)
November 16, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Lewis Pollock on behalf of The Pullman Group, LLC..(Pollock, Adam)
November 16, 2022 Filing 14 COMPLAINT against Russell Bauknight, James Brown Enterprises, Inc., James Brown, L.L.C., John Doe Corporations 1-5, Primary Wave Music Publishing LLC, Shot Tower Capital LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26967306)Document filed by The Pullman Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Engagement Letter, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - NYT Article, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - US Copyright Records, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Shot Tower Capital LinkedIn Page).(Battles, Benjamin)
November 16, 2022 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shot Tower Capital LLC. (vf)
November 16, 2022 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Primary Wave Music Publishing LLC. (vf)
November 16, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Brown, L.L.C.. (vf)
November 16, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Brown Enterprises, Inc.. (vf)
November 16, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Russell Bauknight. (vf)
November 16, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Benjamin Daniel Battles. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 125,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000. (vf)
November 16, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Benjamin Daniel Battles to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
November 16, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 16, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 16, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 16, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Benjamin Daniel Battles. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Russell Bauknight, James Brown Enterprises, Inc., John Doe Corporations 1-5. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
November 15, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shot Tower Capital LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Pullman Group, LLC..(Battles, Benjamin)
November 15, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Primary Wave Music Publishing LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Pullman Group, LLC..(Battles, Benjamin)
November 15, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Brown, L.L.C., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Pullman Group, LLC..(Battles, Benjamin)
November 15, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Brown Enterprises, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Pullman Group, LLC..(Battles, Benjamin)
November 15, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Russell Bauknight, Personal Representative of the Estate of James Brown, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Pullman Group, LLC..(Battles, Benjamin)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Pullman Group, LLC..(Battles, Benjamin)
November 15, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Battles, Benjamin)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26958730)Document filed by The Pullman Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Engagement Letter, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - NYT Article, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - US Copyright Records, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Shot Tower Capital LinkedIn page).(Battles, Benjamin) Modified on 11/16/2022 (vf).
November 15, 2022 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents John Doe Corporations 1-5 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by The Pullman Group, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Battles, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Pullman Group, LLC v. Bauknight et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Pullman Group, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Daniel Battles
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Bauknight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brown Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brown, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Wave Music Publishing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shot Tower Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: John Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?