Adams v. New York State - Unified Court System et al
Plaintiff: Trina Adams
Defendant: New York State - Unified Court System, Unified Court System Office of Court Administration and Office of Court Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv09739
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2003 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Counsel are reminded that, under the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, any requests forextensions of time are to be made at least 48 hour prior to the deadline. Nevertheless, application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 14. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/13/2022) (ama)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Michael Siudzinski dated Dec. 13, 2022. Document filed by New York State - Unified Court System, Office of Court Administration..(Siudzinski, Michael)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael John Siudzinski on behalf of New York State - Unified Court System, Office of Court Administration..(Siudzinski, Michael)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: New York State - Unified Court System answer due 1/18/2023; Office of Court Administration answer due 1/18/2023. (ama)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet served on New York State Unified Court System on 11/22/22. Service was accepted by Mr. Michael Siudziuski, as Assistant Deputy Counsel. Document filed by Trina Adams., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York State - Unified Court System served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. Service was accepted by Mr. Michael Siudziuski, as Assistant Deputy Counsel. Document filed by Trina Adams..(Bonomo, Joseph)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet served on Office of Court Administration on 11/22/22. Service was accepted by Mr. Siudziuski, Assistant Deputy Counsel. Document filed by Trina Adams..(Bonomo, Joseph)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on March 2, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. Additionally, in accordance with Paragraph 3.D of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 3/2/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/16/22) (yv)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of Court Administration. (vf)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York State - Unified Court System. (vf)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Trina Adams..(Bonomo, Joseph)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEW YORK STATE - UNIFIED COURT SYSTEM, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Trina Adams..(Bonomo, Joseph)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bonomo, Joseph)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen McQuade on behalf of Trina Adams..(McQuade, Stephen)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joseph Michael Bonomo to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joseph Michael Bonomo to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Caption title and party name does not match complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph Michael Bonomo. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings;. (pc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Michael Bonomo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Unified Court System Office of Court Administration. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNIFIED COURT SYSTEM - OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Trina Adams..(Bonomo, Joseph) Modified on 11/16/2022 (pc).
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEW YORK STATE UNIFIED COURT SYSTEM, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Trina Adams..(Bonomo, Joseph) Modified on 11/16/2022 (pc).
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York State - Unified Court System, Unified Court System Office of Court Administration. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26964647)Document filed by Trina Adams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, #2 Exhibit Exh A (RTS Letter), #3 Exhibit Exh B (Vaccine Policy), #4 Exhibit Exh C (Application), #5 Exhibit Exh D (Supplemental)).(Bonomo, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. New York State - Unified Court System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina Adams
Represented By: Joseph Michael Bonomo
Represented By: Stephen McQuade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State - Unified Court System
Represented By: Michael John Siudzinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Court System Office of Court Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Court Administration
Represented By: Michael John Siudzinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?