Secure Source Claims Company, LLC v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Secure Source Claims Company, LLC
Defendant: Mike Roe
Cross Defendant: Edward F Miller, Fine Craftsman Group, LLC, USDG, LLC, Michael Piumelli, Giovanna Battaglia and Margaret Miller
Cross Claimant: Roe Site Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv09764
Filed: November 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ona T Wang
Referring Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Civil Remedies: Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. The Court held an Initial Case Management Conference on January 11, 2023. Plaintiff's deadline to file an amended complaint is February 10, 2023. The Court will hold a Status Conference on March 14, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The parties are to file a revised proposed Case Management Plan by March 10, 2023. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (jhw)
January 9, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Howard Steven Koh on behalf of Secure Source Claims Company, LLC. New Address: Meister Seelig & Fein PLLC, 125 Park Avenue, 7th Floor, New York, New York, 10017, (212) 655-3500..(Koh, Howard)
January 6, 2023 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against Giovanna Battaglia, Fine Craftsman Group, LLC, Edward F Miller, Margaret Miller, Michael Piumelli, USDG, LLC. Document filed by Roe Site Management, LLC..(Chabrowe, Jeffrey)
January 6, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Chabrowe on behalf of Roe Site Management, LLC..(Chabrowe, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2023 Filing 38 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Koh, Howard)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying #34 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Defendant Fine Craftsman Group's motion to adjourn the conference on January 11, 2023, is DENIED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang)(Text Only Order) (jhw)
December 30, 2022 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mike Roe..(Feigenbaum, Jeremy)
December 28, 2022 Filing 35 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Howard S. Koh dated 12/28/2022 re: #34 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Joseph P. Dineen dated December 28, 2022. . Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Koh, Howard)
December 28, 2022 Filing 34 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Joseph P. Dineen dated December 28, 2022. Document filed by Fine Craftsman Group, LLC..(Dineen, Joseph)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Initial Case Management Conference set for January 11, 2023 will also address Defendant FCG's proposed motion to dismiss (see ECF 32). Parties are also reminded to FILE letters on ECF in accordance with my Individual Practices, I.a. Unsolicited correspondence sent by email only will be disregarded. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (Wang, Ona)
December 15, 2022 Filing 32 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Joseph P. Dineen dated December 15, 2022 re: Pre-Motion Conference Request. Document filed by Fine Craftsman Group, LLC..(Dineen, Joseph)
December 12, 2022 Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Howard S. Koh dated December 12, 2022 Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Koh, Howard)
December 2, 2022 Filing 30 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME OF DEFENDANT FINE CRAFTSMAN GROUP, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned, counsel of record for the Plaintiff and defendant Fine Craftsman Group, LLC (hereinafter "FCG"), that the time of FCG to serve and file an answer to, or move with respect to, the complaint of the Plaintiff is hereby extended on consent to and including January 6, 2023. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close ECF 29. Fine Craftsman Group, LLC answer due 1/6/2023., Motions terminated: #29 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, . filed by Fine Craftsman Group, LLC. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/2/2022) (rro)
December 1, 2022 Filing 29 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, . Document filed by Fine Craftsman Group, LLC..(Dineen, Joseph)
December 1, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph P. Dineen, Jr on behalf of Fine Craftsman Group, LLC..(Dineen, Joseph)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/11/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 11/29/2022) (rro)
November 29, 2022 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Roe Site Management, LLC served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. Service was accepted by Gabriella Fogas, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Rehns, Kenneth)
November 29, 2022 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Mike Roe served on 11/18/2022, answer due 12/9/2022. Service was accepted by Grace Melvin, Mother-In-Law. Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Rehns, Kenneth)
November 29, 2022 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Margaret Miller served on 11/18/2022, answer due 12/9/2022. Service was accepted by Edward Miller, Sr., Spouse. Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Rehns, Kenneth)
November 29, 2022 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Giovanna Battaglia served on 11/19/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Rehns, Kenneth)
November 29, 2022 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Fine Craftsman Group, LLC served on 11/18/2022, answer due 12/9/2022. Service was accepted by Robert Guyette, Secretary of State. Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Rehns, Kenneth)
November 29, 2022 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Edward F Miller served on 11/19/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Rehns, Kenneth)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/18/22) (yv)
November 18, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard Steven Koh on behalf of Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Koh, Howard)
November 17, 2022 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Piumelli..(pc)
November 17, 2022 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mike Roe..(pc)
November 17, 2022 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edward F Miller..(pc)
November 17, 2022 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Margaret Miller..(pc)
November 17, 2022 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roe Site Management, LLC..(pc)
November 17, 2022 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Giovanna Battaglia..(pc)
November 17, 2022 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to USDG, LLC..(pc)
November 17, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fine Craftsman Group, LLC..(pc)
November 17, 2022 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rehns, Kenneth)
November 17, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 17, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 17, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 17, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kenneth Mark Rehns. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Fine Craftsman Group, LLC, Roe Site Management, LLC, Secure Source Claims Company, LLC, USDG, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
November 17, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kenneth Mark Rehns. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
November 17, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kenneth Mark Rehns to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
November 16, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Margaret Miller, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Rehns, Kenneth)
November 16, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Giovanna Battaglia, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Rehns, Kenneth)
November 16, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Piumelli, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Rehns, Kenneth)
November 16, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roe Site Management, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Rehns, Kenneth)
November 16, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mike Roe, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Rehns, Kenneth)
November 16, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to USDG, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Rehns, Kenneth)
November 16, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fine Craftsman Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Rehns, Kenneth)
November 16, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Edward F. Miller, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC..(Rehns, Kenneth)
November 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Giovanna Battaglia, Fine Craftsman Group, LLC, Edward F Miller, Margaret Miller, Michael Piumelli, Mike Roe, Roe Site Management, LLC, USDG, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26968907)Document filed by Secure Source Claims Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Rehns, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Secure Source Claims Company, LLC v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secure Source Claims Company, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Mark Rehns
Represented By: Howard Steven Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Edward F Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Fine Craftsman Group, LLC
Represented By: Joseph P. Dineen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: USDG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Michael Piumelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Giovanna Battaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Margaret Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Roe
Represented By: Jeremy Graham Feigenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Roe Site Management, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Chabrowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?