Pitcher et al v. Union Carbide Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn Pitcher
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation, Barretts Minerals Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC, Colgate-Palmolive Company, Crane Co., Dap Products, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Edelbrock Corporation, Elliott Company, Estee Lauder, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GG of Florida, Inc., GOULDS PUMPS LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Pfizer Inc, R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp., Zurn Industries, LLC., Elliott Company formerly known as Elliot Turbomachinery Company doing business as Elliot Turbomachinery Company, Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc., Dana Companies LLC, Eaton Hydraulics, Inc., Elliot Turbomachinery Company, Higbee, Inc., Higbee Gaskets and Sealing Products, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Allied-Signal, Inc.,, Borgwarner Morse Tec LL,, ViacomCBS Inc.,, CBS Corporation, Viacom, Inc. Successor-by-Merger to CBS Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corporation, The Dial Corporation, Atwood & Morrill, Beacon CMP Corporation, Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Emerson Electric Co, Pentair Valves and Controls, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. doing business as Spirax Sarco Engineering and Colgate Palmolive Company
Cross Defendant: John Pitcher, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., DCo LLC, Flowserve US Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Paramount Global, Redco Corporation, Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation, Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., John Crane, Zurn Industries, LLC. Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Zurn Industries, Inc., successor to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc., Specialty Minerals Inc. and Robertshaw Controls Company d/b/a FULTON SYLPHON VALVES
Cross Claimant: Alfa Laval, Inc., Block Drug Company, FMC Corporation, Chattem, Inc. and Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv09813
Filed: November 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Rochon
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 as Notice of Removal - Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #289 Letter filed by John Pitcher, Carolyn Pitcher ENDORSEMENT The requested extension of time to complete discovery is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 6/21/2024., Discovery due by 6/21/2024., Expert Discovery due by 6/21/2024., Fact Discovery due by 4/1/2024., Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon.) (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 11/20/2023) (jca)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 289 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Robert Ellis, Esq. dated November 17, 2023 re: Case Management Plan. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 288 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Armstrong International, Inc...(Cook, Kerryann)
November 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 287 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. for Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. Document filed by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc...(Cook, Kerryann)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Andrew Wells. RE-FILE Document No. #286 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected; the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed (ink signatures) by all parties who have appeared;. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct individual party the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (nd)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 286 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Plaintiffs and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Holley Performance Products, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Wells, Andrew) Modified on 11/3/2023 (nd).
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 285 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS AGAINST DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC. PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(1) (A)(ii) IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the plaintiff and defendant named below in the above entitled action, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above entitled action, including all claims and cross-claims asserted therein, be and the same hereby is dismissed, as against GARDNER DENVER, INC. without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). SO ORDERED. Gardner Denver, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 10/31/2023) (jca)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 284 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Gardner Denver, Inc...(Irwin, William)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 283 3rd STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for Plaintiffs and Defendant R.T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC., sued individually and as successor-in-interest to R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC. ("RTV"), in the above-entitled action, that the time within which RTV may answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint is hereby extended an additional twenty (20) days, up to and including November 13, 2023. SO ORDERED: (R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc. answer due 11/13/2023.) (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 10/24/23) (yv)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 282 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc...(DiMarco, Erik)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc. answer due 10/24/2023. (jca)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 281 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for Plaintiffs and Defendant R.T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC., sued individually and as successor-in-interest to R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC. ("RTV"), in the above-entitled action, that the time within which RTV may answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is hereby extended an additional twenty (20) days, up to and including October 24, 2023. The parties to this Stipulation have agreed to this second extension in order to further discuss the potential need for a correction to the case caption. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 10/4/2023) (jca) Modified on 10/23/2023 (jca).
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 280 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc...(DiMarco, Erik)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC..(Kueny, Bernard)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney David James Goodearl to RE-FILE Document No. #275 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): not all corporate parents/other affiliates were added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Chattem, Inc...(Brown, Robert)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 277 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Aventis Inc. for Chattem, Inc.. Document filed by Chattem, Inc...(Brown, Robert)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ANSWER to #217 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Beacon CMP Corporation, Block Drug Company, Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Colgate Palmolive Company, Crane Co., DCo LLC, Dap Products, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Elliott Company, Emerson Electric Co, Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Ford Motor Company, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International Inc., John Crane, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Paramount Global, R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Redco Corporation, Robertshaw Controls Company, Specialty Minerals Inc., Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC.. Document filed by Spirax Sarco, Inc...(Goodearl, David)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 275 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Spirax-Sarco Engineering, PLC for Spirax Sarco, Inc.. Document filed by Spirax Sarco, Inc...(Goodearl, David) Modified on 9/28/2023 (lb).
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 274 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David James Goodearl on behalf of Spirax Sarco, Inc...(Goodearl, David)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc...(LaSala, Joseph)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 272 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Almax LLC for Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc.. Document filed by Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc...(LaSala, Joseph)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 271 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph P. LaSala on behalf of Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc...(LaSala, Joseph)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Honeywell International Inc...(Pugliese, Donald)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company..(De Lucia, Matthew)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by FMC Corporation..(Carlucci, Maria)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Alfa Laval, Inc...(Carlucci, Maria)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company..(De Lucia, Matthew)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), Alfa Laval, Inc.(sued individually and as successor-interest to The DeLaval Separator Company), Armstrong International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Beacon CMP Corporation, Block Drug Company(sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc., and as Successor-in-Interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC(sued individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC, sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation and The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company aka The Gold Bond Company), Colgate Palmolive Company, DCo LLC(sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Victor Gasket Manufacturing Company; ), Dap Products, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics LLC(sued as Successor to Vickers Inc.), Elliott Company, Emerson Electric Co( sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Pentair Valves and Controls, Inc., successor-in-interest to Keystone Valves & Controls, Inc. ), Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC(as successor-in-interest to Keystone Valves & Controls, Inc. ), FMC Corporation(sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Chicago Pump Company ), Flowserve US Inc.(sued as Successor to Edward Valve, Inc.), Ford Motor Company, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International Inc.(sued as Ssuccessor-in-Interest to Bendix Corporation), IMO Industries, Inc.(sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to DeLaval Turbine, Inc.), John Crane, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC(sued as Successor-by-Merger to Borg Warner Corporation), Paramount Global, R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), Robertshaw Controls Company(d/b/a FULTON SYLPHON VALVES), Specialty Minerals Inc.(sued Individually and as a Subsidiary of Minerals Technologies Inc.), Spirax Sarco, Inc., Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation(sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to M.T. Davidson Company), Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp.(sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Griscom-Russell Company), Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC.(Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Zurn Industries, Inc., successor to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc. ). Document filed by Redco Corporation..(Pehush, Tara)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Beacon CMP Corporation, Block Drug Company, Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Crane Co., DCo LLC, Dap Products, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Elliott Company, Emerson Electric Co, Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Ford Motor Company, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Paramount Global, Redco Corporation, Robertshaw Controls Company, Specialty Minerals Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Viad Corp., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC.. Document filed by Velan Valve Corporation..(DiMarco, Erik)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Beacon CMP Corporation, Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Colgate Palmolive Company, Crane Co., DCo LLC, Dap Products, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Elliott Company, Emerson Electric Co, Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Ford Motor Company, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Paramount Global, R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Redco Corporation, Robertshaw Controls Company, Specialty Minerals Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC.. Document filed by Block Drug Company..(Rizvi, Syed)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Zurn Industries, LLC...(McAuley-Parrish, Yashana)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 261 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for Plaintiffs and Defendant R.T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC., sued individually and as successor-in-interest to R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC. ("RTV"), in the above-entitled action, that the time within which RTV may answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is hereby extended up to and including October 4, 2023. SO ORDERED. R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc. answer due 10/4/2023. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 9/13/2023) (jca)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 260 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc...(DiMarco, Erik)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation..(Howarth, John)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Holley Performance Products, Inc...(Wells, Andrew)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Beacon CMP Corporation, Block Drug Company, Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Colgate Palmolive Company, Crane Co., DCo LLC, Dap Products, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Ford Motor Company, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Paramount Global, R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Redco Corporation, Robertshaw Controls Company, Specialty Minerals Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC.. Document filed by Elliott Company..(Elkins, Patrick)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Beacon CMP Corporation, Block Drug Company, Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Colgate Palmolive Company, Crane Co., DCo LLC, Dap Products, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Emerson Electric Co, Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Ford Motor Company, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Paramount Global, R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Redco Corporation, Robertshaw Controls Company, Specialty Minerals Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC.. Document filed by Goulds Pumps LLC..(Elkins, Patrick)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), Alfa Laval, Inc.(sued individually and as successor-interest to The DeLaval Separator Company), Armstrong International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Beacon CMP Corporation, Block Drug Company(sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc., and as Successor-in-Interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC(sued individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC, sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation and The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company aka The Gold Bond Company), Chattem, Inc., Colgate Palmolive Company, Crane Co.(Successor-in-Interest to Chapman Valve Company and The Swarwtout Company), DCo LLC(sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Victor Gasket Manufacturing Company; ), Dap Products, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics LLC(sued as Successor to Vickers Inc.), Elliott Company, Emerson Electric Co( sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Pentair Valves and Controls, Inc., successor-in-interest to Keystone Valves & Controls, Inc. ), Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC(as successor-in-interest to Keystone Valves & Controls, Inc. ), FMC Corporation(sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Chicago Pump Company ), Flowserve US Inc.(sued as Successor to Edward Valve, Inc.), Ford Motor Company, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International Inc.(sued as Ssuccessor-in-Interest to Bendix Corporation), IMO Industries, Inc.(sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to DeLaval Turbine, Inc.), MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC(sued as Successor-by-Merger to Borg Warner Corporation), Paramount Global, Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher, R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Redco Corporation, Robertshaw Controls Company, Specialty Minerals Inc.(sued Individually and as a Subsidiary of Minerals Technologies Inc.), Spirax Sarco, Inc., Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation(sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to M.T. Davidson Company), Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp.(sued Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Griscom-Russell Company), Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC.(Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Zurn Industries, Inc., successor to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc. ). Document filed by John Crane. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Electronic Service).(Halbardier, Suzanne)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Beacon CMP Corporation, Block Drug Company, Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Colgate Palmolive Company, Crane Co., DCo LLC, Dap Products, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Elliott Company, Emerson Electric Co, Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Ford Motor Company, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International Inc., John Crane, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Paramount Global, R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Redco Corporation, Robertshaw Controls Company, Specialty Minerals Inc., Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC.. Document filed by IMO Industries, Inc...(Goodearl, David)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Beacon CMP Corporation, Block Drug Company, Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Colgate Palmolive Company, Crane Co., DCo LLC, Dap Products, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Elliott Company, Emerson Electric Co, Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Ford Motor Company, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International Inc., John Crane, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Paramount Global, R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Redco Corporation, Robertshaw Controls Company, Specialty Minerals Inc., Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC.. Document filed by Warren Pumps, LLC..(Goodearl, David)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Viad Corp...(Margolis, Ellen)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 251 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc. served on 9/6/2023, answer due 9/27/2023. Service was accepted by Alexandra Prybyla, Agent. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher; John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Gardner Denver, Inc...(Prelvukaj, Arian)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 249 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Spirax Sarco, Inc. served on 9/6/2023, answer due 9/27/2023. Service was accepted by Kartik Pandya, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher; John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 248 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC served on 9/6/2023, answer due 9/27/2023. Service was accepted by Kaneisha Gross, Agent. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher; John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 247 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Emerson Electric Co served on 9/6/2023, answer due 9/27/2023. Service was accepted by Male legal representative of Corporation Service Company. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher; John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 246 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Chattem, Inc. served on 9/6/2023, answer due 9/27/2023. Service was accepted by Glenda Sheppard, Agent. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher; John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation..(Grady, Michelle)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint,,,,, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Beacon CMP Corporation, Block Drug Company, Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Colgate Palmolive Company, Crane Co., DCo LLC, Dap Products, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Elliott Company, Emerson Electric Co, Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Paramount Global, Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher, R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Redco Corporation, Robertshaw Controls Company, Specialty Minerals Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC.. Document filed by Ford Motor Company..(Pennie, Nancy)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Spirax Sarco, Inc...(jgo)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC..(jgo)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Emerson Electric Co..(jgo)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chattem, Inc...(jgo)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc...(jgo)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 238 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Spirax Sarco, Inc. also d/b/a Spirax Sarco Engineering, re: #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 237 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC f/k/a Pentair Valves and Controls, Inc. as successor-in-interest to Keystone Valves & Controls, Inc., re: #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 236 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Emerson Electric Co., sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Pentair Valves and Controls, Inc. successor-in-interest to Keystone Valves & Controls, Inc., re: #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 235 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chattem, Inc., a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation and The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company, re: #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 234 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., re: #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 233 EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: #232 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 232 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #230 Amended Complaint,,,,, against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Beacon CMP Corporation, Block Drug Company, Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Crane Co., DCo LLC, Dap Products, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Elliott Company, Emerson Electric Co, Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Ford Motor Company, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Paramount Global, R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Redco Corporation, Specialty Minerals Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC., Robertshaw Controls Company, Colgate Palmolive Company with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher. Related document: #230 Amended Complaint,,,,,..(Tully, Brendan)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brendan James Tully re: Document No. #230 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Colgate-Palmolive Company; Robertshaw Controls Company d/b/a Fulton Sylphon Valves. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (vf)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 231 EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: #230 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 230 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #217 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, #223 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Beacon CMP Corporation, Block Drug Company, Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Crane Co., DCo LLC, Dap Products, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Elliott Company, Emerson Electric Co, Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Ford Motor Company, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Paramount Global, R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Redco Corporation, Specialty Minerals Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher. Related document: #217 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, #223 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,..(Tully, Brendan) Modified on 8/25/2023 (jgo).
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brendan James Tully to RE-FILE Document No. #227 Request for Issuance of Summons, #228 Request for Issuance of Summons, #226 Request for Issuance of Summons, #225 Request for Issuance of Summons, #229 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brendan James Tully to RE-FILE re: Document No. #223 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 229 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Spirax Sarco, Inc. also d/b/a Spirax Sarco Engineering, re: #223 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 228 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EMERSON FINAL CONTROL US HOLDING LLC f/k/a PENTAIR VALVES AND CONTROLS, INC. as successor-in-interest to KEYSTONE VALVES & CONTROLS, INC., re: #223 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 227 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EMERSON ELECTRIC CO., sued individually and as successor-in-interest to PENTAIR VALVES AND CONTROLS, INC. successor-in-interest to KEYSTONE VALVES & CONTROLS, INC., re: #223 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 226 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHATTEM, INC., a subsidiary of SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BLOCK DRUG CORPORATION and THE GOLD BOND STERILIZING POWDER COMPANY a/k/a THE GOLD BOND COMPANY, re: #223 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 225 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., re: #223 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 224 EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: #223 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 223 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #217 Amended Complaint, against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Beacon CMP Corporation, Block Drug Company, Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC, sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation and The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company aka The Gold Bond Company, Colgate-Palmolive Company, Crane Co., DCo LLC, Dap Products, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Edelbrock Corporation, Elliott Company, Emerson Electric Company, sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Pentair Valves and Controls, Inc., successor-in-interest to Keystone Valves & Controls, Inc., Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC f/k/a Pentair Valves and Controls, Inc. as successor-in-interest to Keystone Valves & Controls, Inc., Estee Lauder, Inc., FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Paramount Global, Pfizer Inc, R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Redco Corporation, Specialty Minerals Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. also d/b/a Spirax Sarco Engineering, Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher. Related document: #217 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,..(Tully, Brendan) Modified on 8/23/2023 (vf).
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brendan James Tully to RE-FILE re: Document No. #217 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF case caption contains parties that have been previously terminated. If including party name on the PDF case caption, party must be added as a new party; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; only select parties listed on the PDF case caption; Court's leave has not been granted. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (jgo)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brendan James Tully to RE-FILE Document No. #220 Request for Issuance of Summons, #219 Request for Issuance of Summons, #221 Request for Issuance of Summons, #218 Request for Issuance of Summons, #222 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; summons request was not processed due to deficient pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 222 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Spirax Sarco, Inc. also d/b/a Spirax Sarco Engineering, re: #217 Amended Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 221 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC f/k/a Pentair Valves and Controls, Inc. as successor-in-interest to Keystone Valves & Controls, Inc., re: #217 Amended Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 220 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Emerson Electric Co., sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Pentair Valves and Controls, Inc. successor-in-interest to Keystone Valves & Controls, Inc., re: #217 Amended Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 219 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chattem, Inc., a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation and The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company, re: #217 Amended Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 218 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., re: #217 Amended Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 217 FILING ERROR DEFICIENT PLEADING - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Beacon CMP Corporation, Block Drug Company, Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC, Colgate-Palmolive Company, Crane Co., DCo LLC, Dap Products, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Edelbrock Corporation, Elliott Company, Estee Lauder, Inc., FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Paramount Global, Pfizer Inc, R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Redco Corporation, Specialty Minerals Inc., Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC., Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC, sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation and The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company aka The Gold Bond Company, Emerson Electric Company, sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Pentair Valves and Controls, Inc., successor-in-interest to Keystone Valves & Controls, Inc., Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC f/k/a Pentair Valves and Controls, Inc. as successor-in-interest to Keystone Valves & Controls, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. also d/b/a Spirax Sarco Engineering with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan) Modified on 8/21/2023 (jgo).
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: #207 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . MOTION to Amend/Correct 205 Order, #206 Letter, . MOTION to Add Party(ies) John and Carolyn Pitcher . filed by John Pitcher, Carolyn Pitcher. Therefore, the Court GRANTS the motion to amend. Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint forthwith, and Defendants shall respond to the amended complaint no later than three (3) weeks from the date of filing. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 207. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 8/16/2023) (jca)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 215 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kate J. Skagerberg on behalf of John Crane. New Address: Nelson Mullins, 1222 Demonbreun Street, Suite 1700, Nashville, TN, USA 37203, 415-664-5300..(Skagerberg, Kate)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #213 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery The request is GRANTED. The parties shall adhere to the discovery deadlines set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 8/8/2023) (jca)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: (Deposition due by 2/23/2024., Discovery due by 2/23/2024., Expert Discovery due by 2/23/2024., Fact Discovery due by 12/1/2023.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Pretrial Conference set for 3/7/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon.) (jca)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 213 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion Letter addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Joseph DiGregorio and Robert Ellis dated 8/7/23. Document filed by John Crane..(DiGregorio, Joseph)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 212 DECLARATION of Robert I. Ellis in Support re: #207 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . MOTION to Amend/Correct 205 Order, #206 Letter, . MOTION to Add Party(ies) John and Carolyn Pitcher .. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5.30.23 Email to Chattem, #2 Exhibit 6.7.23 Pitcher Rough Dep. Trns., #3 Exhibit 6.14.23 Pitcher Rough Dep. Trns., #4 Exhibit 11.16.21 Lochstampfor Trns. (Woods)).(Tully, Brendan)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 211 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #207 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . MOTION to Amend/Correct 205 Order, #206 Letter, . MOTION to Add Party(ies) John and Carolyn Pitcher . . Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 210 DECLARATION of Robert D. Brown, Jr. in Opposition re: #207 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . MOTION to Amend/Correct 205 Order, #206 Letter, . MOTION to Add Party(ies) John and Carolyn Pitcher .. Document filed by Chattem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition Notice, #2 Exhibit B -Chattem's response to standard interrogatory, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' interrogatory responses, #4 Exhibit D - Rough transcript dated June 7, 2023 -, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Matthew Lochstampfor).(Brown, Robert)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #207 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . MOTION to Amend/Correct 205 Order, #206 Letter, . MOTION to Add Party(ies) John and Carolyn Pitcher . . Document filed by Chattem, Inc...(Brown, Robert)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #207 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . MOTION to Amend/Correct 205 Order, #206 Letter, . MOTION to Add Party(ies) John and Carolyn Pitcher . . Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint ., MOTION to Amend/Correct 205 Order, #206 Letter, ., MOTION to Add Party(ies) John and Carolyn Pitcher . Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed FAC, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Tully, Brendan)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Brendan Tully to RE-FILE Document #204 MOTION to Add DEFENDANTS. MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINT. MOTION for Leave to File AMENDED COMPLAINT .. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (Supporting Documents are found under the Event Type - Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents;. Select Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion found under the Event List. (kj)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 206 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Robert I. Ellis dated June 7, 2023 re: Differences in Plaintiffs' Proposed First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Proposed FAC).(Tully, Brendan)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's motion to amend the Complaint. ECF No. 204. Per the Court's Individual Rule 1(I), all motions to amend shall be filed with a redline showing the differences between the operative pleading and the proposed amended pleading. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file that redline forthwith, but no later than June 7, 2023. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon) (Text Only Order) (aba)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 204 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Add DEFENDANTS., MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINT., MOTION for Leave to File AMENDED COMPLAINT . Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher. (Attachments: #1 Supplement PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #3 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER).(Tully, Brendan) Modified on 6/8/2023 (kj).
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 203 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS AGAINST DEFENDANT COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the plaintiff and defendant named below in the above entitled action, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above entitled action, including all claims and cross-claims asserted therein, be and the same hereby is dismissed, as against COLGATE PALMOLIVE COMPANY with prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). SO ORDERED. Colgate-Palmolive Company terminated. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 5/25/2023) (ate)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting #200 Motion for Kathryn Skagerberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon)(Text Only Order) (aba)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 201 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company..(Squitieri, Virginia)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MOTION for Kathryn Skagerberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John Crane. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Suzanne M. Halbardier, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Kathryn Skagerberg, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Halbardier, Suzanne)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 199 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Kathryn Skagerberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27780361. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John Crane. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Suzanne M. Halbardier, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Kathryn Skagerberg, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Halbardier, Suzanne) Modified on 5/24/2023 (dsh).
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #199 MOTION for Kathryn Skagerberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27780361. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from The Supreme Court of Texas;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (dsh)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #200 MOTION for Kathryn Skagerberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting #159 Letter Motion to Continue; terminating #172 Letter Motion for Conference. For the reasons stated on the record at the May 17, 2023 teleconference, Defendants' request to enlarge the time to depose Plaintiff Mr. Pitcher is GRANTED. Defendants collectively are granted 11 more hours to depose Mr. Pitcher, and 6 more hours to cross-examine him. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon)(Text Only Order) (aba)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon: Discovery Hearing held via Microsoft Teams on 5/17/2023. (aba)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 197 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Kevin W. Turbert dated 5/16/23 re: Conference Call. Document filed by Honeywell International Inc...(Turbert, Kevin)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 196 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Andrew J. Wells dated May 16, 2023 re: Conference Call. Document filed by Holley Performance Products, Inc...(Wells, Andrew)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew John Wells on behalf of Holley Performance Products, Inc...(Wells, Andrew)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 194 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Yashana McAuley-Parrish, Esq. dated May 16, 2023 re: May 17, 2023 Conference Call. Document filed by Zurn Industries, LLC...(McAuley-Parrish, Yashana)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 193 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Andrew Sapon dated 05/16/2023 re: Designation of Counsel for Conference Call. Document filed by Eaton Hydraulics LLC..(Sapon, Andrew)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 192 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Michelle D. Grady, Esq. dated 05/16/2023 re: Letter to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon Identifying Counsel who will be Appearing at the May 17 Conference. Document filed by Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation..(Grady, Michelle)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 191 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Erik C. DiMarco, Esq. dated May 16, 2023 re: Conference Call. Document filed by Velan Valve Corporation..(DiMarco, Erik)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 190 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Erik C. DiMarco, Esq. dated May 16, 2023 re: Conference Call. Document filed by R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc...(DiMarco, Erik)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 189 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Virginia Squitieri, Esq. dated May 16, 2023 re: Conference Call. Document filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company..(Squitieri, Virginia)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 188 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from BRADLEY E. BISHOP dated 5/16/2023 re: Conference Call. Document filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation..(Bishop, Bradley)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bradley Edward Bishop on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation..(Bishop, Bradley)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bradley Edward Bishop on behalf of Dap Products, Inc...(Bishop, Bradley)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 185 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from David P. Schaffer dated 05/16/2023 re: Appearance Letter. Document filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company..(Schaffer, David)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 184 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Maria C. Carlucci dated 05/16/2023 re: Conference Call. Document filed by Alfa Laval, Inc., FMC Corporation..(Carlucci, Maria)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 183 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Suzanne M. Halbardier dated 05/16/2023 re: Conference Call. Document filed by John Crane..(Halbardier, Suzanne)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 182 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Nancy L. Pennie dated 05/15/23 re: Video Conference, May 17, 2023. Document filed by Ford Motor Company..(Pennie, Nancy)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 181 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 171 Order,, Re: May 17 2023 Video Conference Call addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Stephanie L. Gase dated May 15, 2023. Document filed by Warren Pumps, LLC..(Gase, Stephanie)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie Leeann Gase on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC..(Gase, Stephanie)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie Leeann Gase on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc...(Gase, Stephanie)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 178 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Tara L. Pehush dated May 15, 2023 re: requesting video conference call information for Wednesday 17, 2023. Document filed by Redco Corporation..(Pehush, Tara)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 177 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Syed K. (Zim) Rizvi dated May 15, 2023 re: May 17, 2023 Video Conference Call. Document filed by Block Drug Company..(Rizvi, Syed)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 176 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Robert I Ellis, Esq dated 5/15/2023 re: Plaintiff's Designation of Counsel for Conference Call. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 175 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Daniel DeCicco, Esq. dated 5/15/2023 re: DCo, LLC's Designation of Counsel for Conference Call. Document filed by DCo LLC..(Decicco, Daniel)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 174 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Dennis E. Vega dated May 15, 2023 re: Appearance on Video Conference Call Scheduled for May 17, 2023. Document filed by Paramount Global..(Vega, Dennis)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 173 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Raghu N. Bandlamudi dated May 15, 2023 re: Gardner Denver, Inc.'s Designation of Counsel for Conference Call. Document filed by Gardner Denver, Inc...(Bandlamudi, Raghu)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 172 LETTER MOTION for Conference Call scheduled by Your Honor for May 17, 2023 addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from ARTHUR BROMBERG dated 05/15/2023. Document filed by Morse TEC LLC..(DiLonardo, Anna)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a remote conference to discuss Defendants' motion with respect to Plaintiff's deposition. See ECF No. 159. The conference shall take place via video on Microsoft Teams, on Wednesday, May 17, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. No later than Tuesday, May 16, 2023 at 12:00 p.m., counsel shall file a letter on the docket identifying which counsel will be appearing at the conference, and providing an email address at which log-in credentials should be sent. The public listen-only line may be accessed by dialing Toll-Free Number: 877-336-1831 | Access Code: 5583342. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon) (Text Only Order) (aba)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #169 Motion for Troy D. Helling to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon)(Text Only Order) (aba)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MOTION for Troy D. Helling to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Velan Valve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Helling, Troy)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #166 MOTION for Troy D. Helling to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas; missing notarized affidavit or declaration pursuant to Local Rule 1.3. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (va)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #169 MOTION for Troy D. Helling to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 168 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Robert I. Ellis dated 5/11/2023 re: #159 LETTER MOTION to Continue Plaintiff's Deposition addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Dennis E. Vega dated May 9, 2023. . Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 167 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Troy D. Helling re: that this action be filed as related to 1:22-cv-09813. Document filed by Velan Valve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1).(Helling, Troy)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 166 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Troy D. Helling to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Velan Valve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Helling, Troy) Modified on 5/12/2023 (va).
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting #162 Motion for Laura Spadafora Rahman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon)(Text Only Order) (aba)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 164 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Troy D. Helling to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27727952. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Velan Valve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation of Troy Helling).(Helling, Troy) Modified on 5/11/2023 (vba).
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #164 MOTION for Troy D. Helling to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27727952. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (vba)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #161 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The application is GRANTED. After the schedule for Plaintiff's deposition is finalized, the parties shall submit an Amended Civil Case Management Plan setting forth the remaining discovery deadlines in this action. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 5/10/2023) (ks)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION for Laura Spadafora Rahman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFFIRMATION OF LAURA S. RAHMAN, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Sponsor, #4 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER).(Howarth, John)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 161 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for parties to serve initial interrogatories and requests for production of documents addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Virginia Squitieri, Esq. dated May 10, 2023. Document filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company..(Squitieri, Virginia)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs upcoming deposition, Plaintiff shall file his response to Defendants motion seeking additional time to depose Plaintiff (ECF No. 159) no later than May 11, 2023. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon) (Text Only Order) (aba)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #162 MOTION for Laura Spadafora Rahman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 159 LETTER MOTION to Continue Plaintiff's Deposition addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Dennis E. Vega dated May 9, 2023. Document filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, Paramount Global. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Pitcher Answers to Rogs, #2 Exhibit Ex B Frawley Order and Answers to Rogs, #3 Exhibit Ex C Osterhout Order and Answers to Rogs_Part1, #4 Exhibit Ex C Osterhout Order and Answers to Rogs_Part2, #5 Exhibit Ex C Osterhout Order and Answers to Rogs_Part3, #6 Exhibit Ex C Osterhout Order and Answers to Rogs_Part4, #7 Exhibit Ex C Osterhout Order and Answers to Rogs_Part5, #8 Exhibit Ex D Balcerzak Order and Answers to Rogs).(Vega, Dennis)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Re: ECF No. 156 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362(a), this action is automatically stayed only against the debtor, Defendant Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc., and not the other co-defendants in this action. See Tchrs. Ins. & Annuity Ass'n of Am. v. Butler, 803 F.2d 61, 65 (2d Cir. 1986) ("It is well-established that stays pursuant to 362(a) are limited to debtors and do not encompass non-bankrupt co-defendants."). Accordingly, Plaintiffs may proceed with discovery as to all other Defendants who are not subject to the automatic stay. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon) (Text Only Order) (mmo)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 157 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Laura Spadafora Rahman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27672837. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFFIRMATION OF LAURA S. RAHMAN, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Sponsor, #4 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER).(Howarth, John) Modified on 4/28/2023 (sgz).
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 156 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support).(Tully, Brendan) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 155 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST MOTION for Order to Show Cause to dismiss Whitaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. without prejudice., FIRST MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ., FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Whitaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. without prejudice., FIRST MOTION to Sever Whitaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.. Document filed by John Pitcher. Return Date set for 4/28/2023 at 04:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause).(Tully, Brendan) (Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing.) Modified on 4/28/2023 (nd).
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Raghu N Bandlamudi on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc...(Bandlamudi, Raghu)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 153 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Laura Spadafora Rahman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFFIRMATION OF LAURA S. RAHMAN, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Sponsor, #4 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER).(Howarth, John) Modified on 4/28/2023 (sgz).
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary Martin Sapir on behalf of Redco Corporation..(Sapir, Gary)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Brendan Tully to RE-FILE Document #155 FIRST MOTION for Order to Show Cause to dismiss Whitaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. without prejudice.FIRST MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Whitaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. without prejudice.FIRST MOTION to Sever Whitaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.. 1. Use the event type Order to show Cause found under Proposed Orders 2. Use the event type Declaration in support (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers. (nd)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #157 MOTION for Laura Spadafora Rahman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27672837. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of West Virginia; expired Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Louisiana and Supreme Court of Oklahoma. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE re: Document No. #153 MOTION for Laura Spadafora Rahman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Pennsylvania and West Virginia; expired Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Louisiana and Oklahoma; the filing fee was not paid. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (sgz)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #156 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of Notice of Suggestion of Bankruptcy for Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc., Brilliant National Services, Inc., L.A. Terminals, Inc., SOCO West, Inc., and Notice of Automatic Stay of Proceedings. Document filed by Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc...(Kozak, Christopher)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Stephen Kozak on behalf of Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc...(Kozak, Christopher)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #148 Motion for LAURA E. KUGLER to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon)(Text Only Order) (aba)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MOTION for LAURA E. KUGLER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Viad Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Laura E. Kugler, #2 Exhibit A- Certificates of Good Standing for the Supreme Court of Texas and Oklahoma Bar, #3 Affidavit of Ellen G. Margolis, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting PHV).(Margolis, Ellen)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #148 MOTION for LAURA E. KUGLER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #146 Motion for Michael John Ramirez to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon)(Text Only Order) (mmo)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION for Michael John Ramirez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certifcates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Michael John Ramirez, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Ramirez, Michael)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 145 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael John Ramirez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27601883. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certifcate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Michael Ramirez, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Ramirez, Michael) Modified on 4/13/2023 (va).
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #146 MOTION for Michael John Ramirez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #145 MOTION for Michael John Ramirez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27601883. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (va)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 144 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for LAURA E. KUGLER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27598668. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Viad Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Laura E. Kugler, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit Ellen G. Margolis, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting PHV).(Margolis, Ellen) Modified on 4/12/2023 (va).
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #144 MOTION for LAURA E. KUGLER to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27598668. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (va)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alfred D. Blue, III on behalf of Ford Motor Company..(Blue, Alfred)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #140 Motion for Alfred D. Blue, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon)(Text Only Order) (aba)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 141 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Ford Motor Company..(Pennie, Nancy)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #140 MOTION for Alfred D. Blue, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27560995. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff>/. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (dsh)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MOTION for Alfred D. Blue, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27560995. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit State Bar of Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit The Supreme Court of Texas Certificate of Good Standing).(Blue, Alfred)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 139 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Honeywell International Inc...(Pugliese, Donald)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald Richard Pugliese, Sr on behalf of Honeywell International Inc...(Pugliese, Donald)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #136 Motion for Robert I Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon)(Text Only Order) (aba)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #136 MOTION for Robert I Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION for Robert I Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Brendan J. Tully, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Robert I Ellis, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Tully, Brendan)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #135 MOTION for ROBERT I ELLIS to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27508730. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavits are not notarized; missing an original, wet signature on affidavit for Attorney Robert Ellis. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for ROBERT I ELLIS to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27508730. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF BRENDAN J. TULLY, #2 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF ROBERT I. ELLIS, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #4 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER).(Tully, Brendan) Modified on 3/24/2023 (aea).
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #133 Motion for Brian Sorensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon)(Text Only Order) (aba)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #133 MOTION for Brian Sorensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27497733. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION for Brian Sorensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27497733. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Flowserve US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation of Brian Sorensen, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Joe La Sala Sponsoring Attorney, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting PHV).(LaSala, Joseph)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 132 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Tara L. Pehush dated March 16, 2023 re: response to Plaintiff's March 13, 2023 letter. Document filed by Redco Corporation..(Pehush, Tara)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 131 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Daniel DeCicco, Esq. dated 3/14/2023 re: Plaintiff's March 13, 2023, Letter to the Court. Document filed by DCo LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Notice of Appearance, Corporate Disclosure Statement).(Decicco, Daniel)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 130 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Brendan J. Tully dated 3-13-2023 re: Courts Memo Endorsement dated February 21, 2023. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Enstar Holdings (US), Inc. for DCo LLC. Document filed by DCo LLC..(Decicco, Daniel)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Edwin Decicco, I on behalf of DCo LLC..(Decicco, Daniel)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO FOSTER WHEELER LLC IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the plaintiffs and FOSTER WHEELER LLC in the above-entitled action, that whereas no party to this Stipulation is an infant or incompetent person, it is hereby agreed that the plaintiffs claims as against FOSTER WHEELER LLC and all of its related entities, in the above entitled action be hereby discontinued with prejudice, without costs to either party hereto as against the other. This Stipulation may be filed without further notice with the Clerk of the Court. SO ORDERED. Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation terminated. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 2/27/2023) (jca)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #126 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon for approval for the following reason(s): the stipulation of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher and without costs. Document filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Vega, Dennis)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #124 Letter filed by John Pitcher, Carolyn Pitcher. ENDORSEMENT In light of the dates of service set forth herein, and in light of the fact that no Defendant has yet filed an answer on ECF, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Court with a list indicating which Defendants have already filed an answer in state court no later than March 7, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall indicate the answer deadline, according to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 81, for those Defendants who have not yet answered. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Court with an electronic PDF of the state court docket, including any relevant pleadings filed there (such as Defendants' answers) no later than March 7, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 2/21/2023) (jca)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Brendan J. Tully dated 2-21-23 re: Defendant list pursuant to the Court's text order (doc 85). Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 123 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by MW Custom Papers, LLC..(Dwyer, Patrick)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by MW Custom Papers, LLC..(Dwyer, Patrick)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Honeywell International Inc...(Turbert, Kevin)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Holley Performance Products, Inc...(Dunn, Courtney)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Honeywell International Inc...(Pugliese, Donald)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald Richard Pugliese, Sr on behalf of Honeywell International Inc...(Pugliese, Donald)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin William Turbert on behalf of Honeywell International Inc...(Turbert, Kevin)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - to Rule 26a1 Disclosure).(Dreisbach, Elizabeth)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc...(DiMarco, Erik)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Velan Valve Corporation..(DiMarco, Erik)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Eaton Hydraulics LLC..(Sapon, Andrew)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Morse TEC LLC..(DiLonardo, Anna)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Ford Motor Company..(Pennie, Nancy)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Redco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Pehush, Tara)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company..(Squitieri, Virginia)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Zurn Industries, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Zurn Expert Witness List, #2 Exhibit Zurn Fact Witness List, #3 Exhibit Zurn Exhibit List).(McAuley-Parrish, Yashana)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #96 Letter filed by John Pitcher, Carolyn Pitcher. ENDORSEMENT In light of the dates of service and notices of appearance articulated herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall submit an updated version of this chart including a column indicating the deadlines for each Defendant to respond to the Complaint, no later than February 21, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 2/7/2023) (jca)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Warren Pumps, LLC..(Goodearl, David)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by IMO Industries, Inc...(Goodearl, David)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by FMC Corporation..(Carlucci, Maria)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Alfa Laval, Inc...(Carlucci, Maria)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Gardner Denver, Inc...(Prelvukaj, Arian)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Alan Tanenbaum on behalf of General Electric Company..(Tanenbaum, Michael)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation..(Grady, Michelle)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Alan Tanenbaum on behalf of General Electric Company..(Tanenbaum, Michael)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dennis Enrique Vega on behalf of General Electric Company..(Vega, Dennis)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by General Electric Company..(Vega, Dennis)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney John Samuel Howarth to RE-FILE Document No. #90 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney John Samuel Howarth to RE-FILE Document No. #93 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Brendan Tully, Esq. dated February 6, 2023 re: Defendant Service and NOA. Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Viad Corp...(Margolis, Ellen)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dap Products, Inc...(Howarth, John) Modified on 2/7/2023 (lb).
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Dap Products, Inc...(Howarth, John)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation..(Howarth, John)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation..(Howarth, John) Modified on 2/7/2023 (lb).
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Olga Sekulic on behalf of Viad Corp...(Sekulic, Olga)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corp. for Eaton Hydraulics LLC. Document filed by Eaton Hydraulics LLC..(Sapon, Andrew)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Andrew Sapon to RE-FILE Document No. #83 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/23/2023. (aba)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan (the "Plan") is submitted by the parties in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f)(3). All patties do not consent to conducting all further proceedingsbefore a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Settlement discussions have not taken place. The patties have conferred pursuant to Federal Rule of CivilProcedure 26(f). Depositions shall be completed no later than June 23, 2023. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their best estimate of the length of trial is 2-4 weeks. Motions due by 2/23/2023. Deposition due by 10/23/2023. Fact Discovery due by 7/25/2023. Expert Discovery due by 10/23/2023. Discovery due by 10/23/2023. Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 1/23/2023) (jca)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brendan James Tully on behalf of Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Tully, Brendan)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: In light of the procedural posture and large number of Defendants in this case, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a brief letter, not to exceed three pages, no later than February 6, 2023, detailing when each Defendant was served with the Complaint, and if applicable, the date each Defendant filed its answer. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon) (Text Only Order) (aba)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Sapon on behalf of Eaton Hydraulics LLC..(Sapon, Andrew)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Eaton Hydraulics LLC..(Sapon, Andrew) Modified on 1/24/2023 (lb).
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Samuel Howarth on behalf of Dap Products, Inc...(Howarth, John)
January 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation..(Grady, Michelle)
January 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle D. Grady on behalf of Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation..(Grady, Michelle)
January 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Daniel Schneider on behalf of FMC Corporation..(Schneider, Lee)
January 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Daniel Schneider on behalf of Alfa Laval, Inc...(Schneider, Lee)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean K Kerley on behalf of Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Kerley, Sean)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Zurn Industries, LLC...(McAuley-Parrish, Yashana)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yashana Fione McAuley-Parrish on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC...(McAuley-Parrish, Yashana)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hollingsworth & Vose Company..(Schaffer, David)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FMC Corporation..(Carlucci, Maria)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 LETTER APPLICATION to Change Attorney's Name on the rolls of attorneys of the Southern District of New York from Christopher Kozak to Elizabeth Dreisbach. The request is GRANTED. Mr. Kozak is excused from appearing at the Initial Pretrial Conference on January 23, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 1/19/2023) (jca)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 LETTER APPLICATION to Change Attorney's Name on the rolls of attorneys of the Southern District of New York from Christopher Kozak to Elizabeth Dreisbach addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Elizabeth D. Dreisbach dated 1/19/23. Document filed by Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.. Return Date set for 1/23/2023 at 10:30 AM..(Dreisbach, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Dennis E. Vega dated January 13, 2012 re: Joint Status Letter and Case Management Order. Document filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, Paramount Global..(Vega, Dennis)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Initial Conference previously scheduled for January 24, 2023, shall be rescheduled to January 23, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 20B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon) (Text Only Order) (aba)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Beacon CMP Corporation..(Saul, Jason)
December 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maria C. Carlucci on behalf of FMC Corporation..(Carlucci, Maria)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLC for R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.. Document filed by R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc...(DiMarco, Erik)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erik Christopher DiMarco on behalf of R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc...(DiMarco, Erik)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel R Griffin on behalf of John Crane..(Griffin, Daniel)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Daniel R. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon)(Text Only Order) (aba)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent High Performance Industries, Inc. for Holley Performance Products, Inc.. Document filed by Holley Performance Products, Inc...(Dunn, Courtney)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Courtney Dunn on behalf of Holley Performance Products, Inc...(Dunn, Courtney)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Daniel R. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John Crane. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Suzanne M. Halbardier, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Daniel Griffin, #3 Supplement Certificates of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Halbardier, Suzanne)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #59 FIRST MOTION for Daniel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Motion. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #60 MOTION for Daniel R. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Daniel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John Crane. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Suzanne M. Halbardier, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Daniel Griffin).(Halbardier, Suzanne) Modified on 12/20/2022 (sgz).
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #58 FIRST MOTION for Daniel R. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27071188. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Illinois; missing Proposed Order. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Daniel R. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27071188. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John Crane. Return Date set for 12/29/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Suzanne M. Halbardier, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Daniel Griffin).(Halbardier, Suzanne) Modified on 12/13/2022 (sgz).
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Michael Saul on behalf of Beacon CMP Corporation..(Saul, Jason)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth D Dreisbach on behalf of Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc...(Dreisbach, Elizabeth)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David P. Schaffer on behalf of Hollingsworth & Vose Company..(Schaffer, David)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph P. LaSala on behalf of Flowserve US Inc...(LaSala, Joseph)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent WestRock Company, Other Affiliate WestRock MWV, LLC for MW Custom Papers, LLC. Document filed by MW Custom Papers, LLC..(Dwyer, Patrick)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ford Motor Company..(Pennie, Nancy)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy Loraine Pennie on behalf of Ford Motor Company..(Pennie, Nancy)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Victory Capital Management, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc for Viad Corp.. Document filed by Viad Corp...(Margolis, Ellen)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerryann Marie Cook on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc...(Cook, Kerryann)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerryann Marie Cook on behalf of GG of Florida, Inc...(Cook, Kerryann)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerryann Marie Cook on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc...(Cook, Kerryann)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Samuel Howarth on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation..(Howarth, John)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 190159/2022..Document filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Responses to Interrogatories).(Howarth, John)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval AB for Alfa Laval, Inc.. Document filed by Alfa Laval, Inc...(Carlucci, Maria)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maria C. Carlucci on behalf of Alfa Laval, Inc...(Carlucci, Maria)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Syed Kazim Rizvi on behalf of Block Drug Company..(Rizvi, Syed)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and the Court's Individual Rules of Practice served on All Known Counsel on 11/30/2022. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Paramount Global..(Vega, Dennis)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ellen Gayle Margolis on behalf of Viad Corp...(Margolis, Ellen)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent WestRock Company for MW Custom Papers, LLC. Document filed by MW Custom Papers, LLC..(Dwyer, Patrick) Modified on 12/1/2022 (lb).
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Patrick Joseph Dwyer to RE-FILE Document No. #39 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): not all corporate parents/other affiliates were added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erik Christopher DiMarco on behalf of Colgate-Palmolive Company..(DiMarco, Erik)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erik Christopher DiMarco on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation..(DiMarco, Erik)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Velan Inc. for Velan Valve Corporation. Document filed by Velan Valve Corporation..(DiMarco, Erik)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ebara Corporation, Corporate Parent Elliot Group Holdings, Inc. for Elliott Company. Document filed by Elliott Company..(Elkins, Patrick)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Oxamendi on behalf of Colgate-Palmolive Company..(Oxamendi, David)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins on behalf of Elliott Company..(Elkins, Patrick)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Virginia Paula Squitieri on behalf of Colgate-Palmolive Company..(Squitieri, Virginia)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company..(Squitieri, Virginia)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ITT Corporation for Goulds Pumps LLC. Document filed by Goulds Pumps LLC..(Elkins, Patrick)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins on behalf of Goulds Pumps LLC..(Elkins, Patrick)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC for Redco Corporation. Document filed by Redco Corporation..(Pehush, Tara)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Melody Kozin on behalf of Crane Co., Redco Corporation..(Kozin, Nicole)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Lynne Pehush on behalf of Crane Co., Redco Corporation..(Pehush, Tara)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Morse TEC LLC..(DiLonardo, Anna)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Joseph Dwyer on behalf of MW Custom Papers, LLC..(Dwyer, Patrick)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anna Maria DiLonardo on behalf of Morse TEC LLC..(DiLonardo, Anna)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/24/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 11/29/2022) (jca)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 190159-2022..Document filed by Alfa Laval, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Summons (Ex A - part 1), #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint (Ex A - part 2), #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint (Ex A - part 3), #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Answers to Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Service).(Carlucci, Maria)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arian Prelvukaj on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc...(Prelvukaj, Arian)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Group, Inc. for Gardner Denver, Inc.. Document filed by Gardner Denver, Inc...(Prelvukaj, Arian)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John Samuel Howarth to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Notice (Other),. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; List each defendant involved in the case, do not use et al. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean K Kerley on behalf of Carolyn Pitcher, John Pitcher..(Kerley, Sean)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Maria C. Carlucci to RE-FILE Document No. #14 Notice of Removal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. List each defendant involved in the case, do not use et al.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation for IMO Industries, Inc.. Document filed by IMO Industries, Inc...(Goodearl, David)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David James Goodearl on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc...(Goodearl, David)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David James Goodearl on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc...(Goodearl, David)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 190159/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26989697).Document filed by Alfa Laval, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Summons, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint (part 1), #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint (part 2), #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Answers to Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Service).(Carlucci, Maria) Modified on 11/22/2022 (pc).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation for Warren Pumps, LLC. Document filed by Warren Pumps, LLC..(Goodearl, David)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David James Goodearl on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC..(Goodearl, David)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Removal from New York Supreme Court, County of New York Case #190159/2022. Document filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Responses to Interrogatories).(Howarth, John) Modified on 11/23/2022 (pc).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Smith Group PLC for John Crane. Document filed by John Crane..(DiGregorio, Joseph)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 190159/2022..Document filed by Paramount Global. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint_Part1, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint_Part2, #3 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint_Part3, #4 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint_Part4, #5 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint_Part5, #6 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint_Part6, #7 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint_Part7, #8 Exhibit Ex B Interrogatory Responses, #9 Affidavit Cert of Service, #10 Supplement Service Rider).(Vega, Dennis)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Suzanne M. Halbardier on behalf of John Crane..(Halbardier, Suzanne)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph DiGregorio on behalf of John Crane..(DiGregorio, Joseph)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by John Crane..(DiGregorio, Joseph) Modified on 11/18/2022 (lb).
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JOINDER to join . Document filed by John Crane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pitcher Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Redacted Plaintiff's Responses to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Military Specification, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Military Specification, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Navy Department Specification, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Military Qualified Products List).(Halbardier, Suzanne)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Paramount Global for Paramount Global. Document filed by Paramount Global..(Vega, Dennis)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Dennis Enrique Vega to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed; all of the parties listed on the pleading (Beacon CMP Corporation; Specialty Minerals Inc. with party text sued Individually and as a Subsidiary of Minerals Technologies Inc.) were not entered on CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Dennis Enrique Vega. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Block Drug Company, Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC, Crane Co., DCo LLC, Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Elliott Company, Estee Lauder, Inc., FMC Corporation, GG of Florida, Inc.,Goulds Pumps LLC, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Paramount Global, R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (vf)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Dennis Enrique Vega to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Dennis Enrique Vega. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 365 (Personal Inj. Prod. Liability); Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 368 (P.I. : Asbestos); the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Joseph DiGregorio to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Beacon CMP Corporation, Specialty Minerals Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,,,.Document filed by Paramount Global. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,,,..(Vega, Dennis)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Paramount Global..(Vega, Dennis) Modified on 11/18/2022 (lb).
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Vega, Dennis)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 190159/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26976520).Document filed by Paramount Global. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint_Part1, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint_Part2, #3 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint_Part3, #4 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint_Part4, #5 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint_Part5, #6 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint_Part6, #7 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint_Part7, #8 Exhibit Ex B Interrogatory Responses, #9 Supplement Notice of Notice to Supreme Court, #10 Supplement Pitcher_ Notice of Notice to Adversary, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Affidavit Pitcher_ Cert of Service, #13 Supplement Service Rider).(Vega, Dennis) Modified on 11/18/2022 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitcher et al v. Union Carbide Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: John Pitcher
Represented By: Sean K Kerley
Represented By: Brendan James Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: John Samuel Howarth
Represented By: Bradley Edward Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: DCo LLC
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Decicco, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. LaSala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Hollingsworth & Vose Company
Represented By: David P. Schaffer
Represented By: Matthew De Lucia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Kevin William Turbert
Represented By: Donald Richard Pugliese, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: David James Goodearl
Represented By: Stephanie Leeann Gase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: MW Custom Papers, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Morse TEC LLC
Represented By: Anna Maria DiLonardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Dennis Enrique Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: Tara Lynne Pehush
Represented By: Nicole Melody Kozin
Represented By: Gary Martin Sapir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Superior Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation
Represented By: Michelle D. Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: David James Goodearl
Represented By: Stephanie Leeann Gase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth D Dreisbach
Represented By: Christopher Stephen Kozak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: John Crane
Represented By: Joseph DiGregorio
Represented By: Suzanne M. Halbardier
Represented By: Daniel R Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC. Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Zurn Industries, Inc., successor to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.
Represented By: Yashana Fione McAuley-Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Specialty Minerals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Robertshaw Controls Company d/b/a FULTON SYLPHON VALVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Pitcher
Represented By: Sean K Kerley
Represented By: Brendan James Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barretts Minerals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By: David Oxamendi
Represented By: Erik Christopher DiMarco
Represented By: Virginia Paula Squitieri
Represented By: Michael John Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Tara Lynne Pehush
Represented By: Nicole Melody Kozin
Represented By: Gary Martin Sapir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dap Products, Inc.
Represented By: John Samuel Howarth
Represented By: Bradley Edward Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Hydraulics LLC
Represented By: Andrew Sapon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edelbrock Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estee Lauder, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Represented By: Alfred D. Blue, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Dennis Enrique Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Arian Prelvukaj
Represented By: Raghu N Bandlamudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: Michael Alan Tanenbaum
Represented By: Dennis Enrique Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GG of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS LLC
Represented By: Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holley Performance Products, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney Dunn
Represented By: Andrew John Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.
Represented By: Erik Christopher DiMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp.
Represented By: Ellen Gayle Margolis
Represented By: Olga Sekulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company formerly known as Elliot Turbomachinery Company doing business as Elliot Turbomachinery Company
Represented By: Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Decicco, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Hydraulics, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Sapon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Turbomachinery Company
Represented By: Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higbee, Inc.
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higbee Gaskets and Sealing Products, Inc.
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Represented By: Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Signal, Inc.,
Represented By: Kevin William Turbert
Represented By: Donald Richard Pugliese, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec LL,
Represented By: Anna Maria DiLonardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.,
Represented By: Dennis Enrique Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Dennis Enrique Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc. Successor-by-Merger to CBS Corporation
Represented By: Dennis Enrique Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Dennis Enrique Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Erik Christopher DiMarco
Represented By: Troy Helling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corporation
Represented By: Ellen Gayle Margolis
Represented By: Olga Sekulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dial Corporation
Represented By: Ellen Gayle Margolis
Represented By: Olga Sekulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon CMP Corporation
Represented By: Jason Michael Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson Final Control US Holding LLC
Represented By: Bernard E. Kueny, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. LaSala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson Electric Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentair Valves and Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Bernard E. Kueny, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc. doing business as Spirax Sarco Engineering
Represented By: David James Goodearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate Palmolive Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Alfa Laval, Inc.
Represented By: Maria C. Carlucci
Represented By: Lee Daniel Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Block Drug Company
Represented By: Syed Kazim Rizvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Maria C. Carlucci
Represented By: Lee Daniel Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Chattem, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Dorrance Brown, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Represented By: David James Goodearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?