Doe 1 v. JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Not Classified By Court: Jordana H. Feldman, Epstein Victims Compensation Program and Bradley J. Edwards
3Rd Party Defendant: James Edward Staley
Case Number: 1:2022cv10019
Filed: November 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 ra Fed. Question: Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/12/2023, without transcription or recording, during which counsel for all parties was present. The Court agrees to permit the depositions of the two witnesses to take place after the July 18, 2023, fact discovery deadline.. (Kotowski, Linda)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/26/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 187 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/26/2023 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/27/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/7/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MOTION for Joseph Bayerl to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27962751. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by James Edward Staley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF JOSEPH BAYERL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE).(Bayerl, Joseph)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MOTION for Kees D. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27961863. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by James Edward Staley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF KEES D. THOMPSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE).(Thompson, Kees)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #185 MOTION for Kees D. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27961863. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (dsh)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #186 MOTION for Joseph Bayerl to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27962751. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (dsh)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/6/2023, without recording or transcription,in which counsel for all parties, including Mark Weinstein of Hughes Hubbard & Reed for the Epstein estate were present. The Epstein estate is ordered to continue its production of documents per the terms of the parties previous agreement relating to the ballet company and four associated individuals as to whom the estate previously agreed to produce documents.. (Kotowski, Linda)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 23-0939. Petitioner JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. ("JPMorgan") seeks permission to file its petition for leave to appeal under seal and to file a redacted version on the public docket. JPMorgan also requests that the Court hold the petition for leave to appeal in abeyance until the district court has issued a final ruling on the parties' proposed settlement. Respondent Jane Doe 1 asks that the Court adjourn the deadline to answer the petition for leave to appeal. These motions are unopposed.It is hereby ORDERED that the request to file sealed and redacted versions of the petition is GRANTED. The request to hold the petition in abeyance is granted to the extent the petition is held in abeyance for 45 days from the date of this order. Respondents request to adjourn the due date for the answer is GRANTED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 6/30/2023..(nd) (Main Document 184 replaced on 7/5/2023) (nd).
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 183 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 23(e)(l) AND PERMITTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS re: #182 Order on Motion for Settlement. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Court has reviewed the Stipulation and does hereby preliminarily approve the Stipulation and the Settlement set forth therein as fair, reasonable, and adequate, subject to further consideration at the Settlement Hearing (as defined in paragraph 3 below). 2. The Court preliminarily finds that the proposed Settlement should be approved as it: (i) is the result of good faith, extensive arm's-length and non-collusive negotiations; (ii) falls within a range of reasonableness warranting final approval; (iii) has no obvious deficiencies; and (iv) warrants notice of the proposed Settlement to Class Members and further consideration of the Settlement at the Settlement Hearing described below. 3. A hearing shall be held before this Court on November 9, 2023, at 4:00 pm. (the "Settlement Hearing"), at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007, to: (a) determine whether the proposed Settlement of the Litigation on the terms and conditions provided for in the Stipulation is fair, reasonable, and adequate to the Class and should be approved by the Court; (b) determine whether a Judgment as provided in paragraph 1.14 of the Stipulation should be entered; ( c) determine whether the proposed Plan of Allocation as described in the Stipulation and Notice (as defined below) should be approved; (d) determine the amount of attorneys' fees, costs, charges, and expenses that should be awarded to Class Counsel; (e) hear any objections by Class Members to the Settlement or Plan of Allocation, the award of attorneys' fees and expenses to Class Counsel; and (f) consider such other matters the Court deems appropriate. The Court may adjourn or change the date and time of the Settlement Hearing without further notice to the Class. The Court approves the form, substance, and requirements of the Notice of Proposed Settlement of Class Action ("Notice"), substantially in the form annexed hereto as Exhibit A-1. The Court approves the form of the Summary Notice of Proposed Settlement of Class Action ("Summary Notice"), substantially in the form annexed hereto as Exhibit A-2. Simone Lelchuk (the "Claims Administrator") is hereby appointed to supervise and administer the notice procedure as well as the processing of Claims as more fully set forth below. No later than ten (10) calendar days after entry of this Order, or July 7, 2023 (the "Notice Date"), the Claims Administrator shall cause a copy of the Notice and the Questionnaire to be mailed by First-Class Mail or electronic mail to all Class Members who can be identified with reasonable effort and to be posted on the case-designated website. For all Notices returned as undeliverable, the Claims Administrator shall use her best efforts to locate updated addresses. No later than twenty-five (25) calendar days after entry of this Order, or July 22, 2023, the Claims Administrator shall cause the Summary Notice to be published once in USA Today. At least forty-five (45) calendar days prior to the Settlement Hearing, or September 25, 2023, Class Counsel shall serve on Defendant's Counsel and file with the Court proof, by affidavit or declaration, of such mailing and publishing. All papers in support of the Settlement, Plan of Allocation, and any application by Class Counsel for attorneys' fees, costs, charges, and expenses shall be filed and served no later than thirty-five (35) calendar days before the Settlement Hearing, or October 5, 2023, any opposition papers thereto shall be filed and served no later than twenty-one (21) calendar days before the Settlement Hearing, or October 19, 2023, and any reply papers shall be filed and served no later than seven (7) calendar days before the Settlement Hearing, or November 2, 2023. (as further set forth herein). The Parties shall, no later than ten (10) calendar days following the filing of the Stipulation with the Court, serve upon the appropriate state and federal officials a notice of the proposed Settlement in compliance with the requirements of the Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 ("CAFA"), 28 U.S.C. 1715. The Parties are equally responsible for the costs of the CAFA notice and administering the CAF A notice. At least fourteen (14) calendar days before the Settlement Hearing, the Parties shall file with the Court proof, by affidavit or declaration, regarding compliance with CAFA 1715(b). IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/29/2023) (kv)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 23(e)(l) AND PERMITTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS granting #179 Motion for Settlement. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Court has reviewed the Stipulation and does hereby preliminarily approve the Stipulation and the Settlement set forth therein as fair, reasonable, and adequate, subject to further consideration at the Settlement Hearing (as defined in paragraph 3 below). 2. The Court preliminarily finds that the proposed Settlement should be approved as it: (i) is the result of good faith, extensive arm's-length and non-collusive negotiations; (ii) falls within a range ofreasonableness warranting final approval; (iii) has no obvious deficiencies; and (iv) warrants notice of the proposed Settlement to Class Members and further consideration of the Settlement at the Settlement Hearing described below. 3. A hearing shall be held before this Court on November 9, 2023, at 4:00 p.m. (the "Settlement Hearing"), at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007, to: ( a) determine whether the proposed Settlement of the Litigation on the terms and conditions provided for in the Stipulation is fair, reasonable, and adequate to the Class and should be approved by the Court; (b) determine whether a Judgment as provided in paragraph 1.14 of the Stipulation should be entered; ( c) determine whether the proposed Plan of Allocation as described in the Stipulation and Notice (as defined below) should be approved; (d) determine the amount of attorneys' fees, costs, charges, and expenses that should be awarded to Class Counsel; (e) hear any objections by Class Members to the Settlement or Plan of Allocation, the award of attorneys' fees and expenses to Class Counsel; and (f) consider such other matters the Court deems appropriate. The Court may adjourn or change the date and time of the Settlement Hearing without further notice to the Class. 4. The Court approves the form, substance, and requirements of the Notice of Proposed Settlement of Class Action ("Notice"), substantially in the form annexed hereto as Exhibit A-1. 5. The Court approves the form of the Summary Notice of Proposed Settlement of Class Action ("Summary Notice"), substantially in the form annexed hereto as Exhibit A-2. Simone Lelchuk (the "Claims Administrator") is hereby appointed to supervise and administer the notice procedure as well as the processing of Claims as more fully set forth below. 7. No later than ten (10) calendar days after entry of this Order, or July 7, 2023 (the ''Notice Date"), the Claims Administrator shall cause a copy of the Notice and the Questionnaire to be mailed by First-Class Mail or electronic mail to all Class Members who can be identified with reasonable effort and to be posted on the case-designated website. For all Notices returned as undeliverable, the Claims Administrator shall use her best efforts to locate updated addresses. 8. No later than twenty-five (25) calendar days after entry of this Order, or July 22, 2023, the Claims Administrator shall cause the Summary Notice to be published once in USA Today. 9. At least forty-five (45) calendar days prior to the Settlement Hearing, or September 25, 2023, Class Counsel shall serve on Defendant's Counsel and file with the Court proof, by affidavit or declaration, of such mailing and publishing. In order to receive funds from the Settlement, Class Members (or Class Counsel, on their behalf) must submit a Questionnaire and Release. Unless the Court orders otherwise, all Questionnaires and Releases must be postmarked or submitted electronically no later than forty-five (45) calendar days from the Notice Date, or August 21, 2023. To be valid, the Opt-Out Form must be postmarked or submitted electronically no later than thirty (30) calendar days from the Notice Date, or August 6, 2023. All papers in support of the Settlement, Plan of Allocation, and any application by Class Counsel for attorneys' fees, costs, charges, and expenses shall be filed and served no later than thirty-five (35) calendar days before the Settlement Hearing, or October 5, 2023, any opposition papers thereto shall be filed and served no later than twenty-one (21) calendar days before the Settlement Hearing, or October 19, 2023, and any reply papers shall be filed and served no later than seven (7) calendar days before the Settlement Hearing, or November 2, 2023. In the event this Stipulation or the Settlement is terminated or the Effective Date otherwise fails to occur for any reason, the Settling Parties shall be restored to their respective positions in the Litigation as of 6/26/2023 and shall meet and confer regarding a new case schedule for the Litigation. In such event, the terms and provisions of the Stipulation shall have no further force and effect with respect to the Settling Parties and shall not be used in this Litigation or in any other proceeding for any purpose, and any judgment or order entered by the Court in accordance with the terms of this Stipulation shall be treated as vacated, nunc pro tune. (as further set forth herein). IT IS SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/26/2023) (kv)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings:( Settlement Conference set for 11/9/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.), Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Motions due by 10/5/2023., Responses due by 10/19/2023, Replies due by 11/2/2023.) (kv)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Fairness Hearing held on 6/26/2023. (Kotowski, Linda)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: A teleconference was held on 6/21 without transcription or recording. Counsel for all parties were present. The preliminary fairness hearing previously set for 4:00 PM on 6/26 will now take place at 5:30 PM. USVIs USVIs request for a one-week extension to the deadline for completing expert depositions is granted; expert depositions must be complete by July 7, 2023. ( Fairness Hearing set for 6/26/2023 at 05:30 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda) Modified on 6/23/2023 (Kotowski, Linda).
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 181 DECLARATION of David Boies and Bradley Edwards in Support re: #179 MOTION for Settlement Class Representative's Notice of Unopposed Motion for (I) Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; and (II) Approval of Notice to the Class.. Document filed by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation of Settlement, #2 Exhibit A1 to Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A2 to Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Layn Phillips).(Edwards, Bradley)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #179 MOTION for Settlement Class Representative's Notice of Unopposed Motion for (I) Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; and (II) Approval of Notice to the Class. . Document filed by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Preliminary Approval, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order and Final Judgment).(Edwards, Bradley)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION for Settlement Class Representative's Notice of Unopposed Motion for (I) Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; and (II) Approval of Notice to the Class. Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Edwards, Bradley)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER: JPMC (and other persons specified under paragraph five of the Protective Order in the above-captioned actions to whom the Epstein Victims Compensation Program ("EVCP") has consented to the disclosure In the event that JPMC believes it is entitled to further use of any of the EVCP Documents not provided for herein at any point - for example, if the settlement with Doe is not finalized, or the Second Circuit grants any 23(f) petition - JPMC may apply to the Court for it to determine whether further use of any of the EVCP Documents by JPMC is appropriate. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/22/2023) (ama) (Main Document 178 replaced on 6/22/2023) (rro).
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Sigrid S. McCawley to RE-FILE Document #169 AMENDED MOTION (Corrected) Seeking Leave to Reopen Depositions (Letter) ., #168 AMENDED MOTION (Corrected) Seeking Leave to Reopen Depositions (Letter) . Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Sigrid S. McCawley to RE-FILE Document #165 MOTION Seeking Leave to Reopen Depositions (Letter) . Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Minute Entry dated 6/20/2023. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (Daniels, Anthony)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 6/20/2023 without transcription or recording. Counsel for JP Morgan, the U.S. Virgin Islands, and Jes Staley were present. As discussed telephonically, JP Morgan should submit a letter brief of no more than 5 pages by 6/22 concerning its requests for relief regarding USVIs 30b6 deposition, and USVI any response no later than Tuesday, June 27. Mr. Staley should also submit a letter brief of no more than 5 pages concerning his request regarding JP Morgans ESI protocols by 6/22, and JP Morgan any response by 6/27. USVIs application for the production of written guidance provided to Mr. Dimon by JP Morgans communications team regarding how to answer questions concerning Epstein and his relationship with the bank is granted with respect to any guidance actually provided Mr. Dimon, but denied with respect to USVIs application for drafts or communications concerning such guidance. JP Morgan should make this production by no later than 7/7/23. As to Mr. Staleys request for JP Morgan to search custodians accounts past 2019, JP Morgan is directed to run the agreed-upon narrowed search terms through March 8, 2021. Finally, JP Morgan is directed to identify as a custodian a current or former JP Morgan employee who worked in compliance at Bear Stearns prior to its acquisition by JP Morgan whom counsel believes following reasonable inquiries to have been most involved in compliance issues concerning Mr. Epstein at Bear Stearns and to run agreed-upon searches for this custodian over the period following JP Morgans acquisition of Bear Stearns. JP Morgan should produce any responsive documents from this search by no later than 7/7/23. With respect to all other applications, the parties should meet and confer as discussed telephonically and contact chambers should any disputes remain.. (Kotowski, Linda)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/1/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, 1:22-cv-10019-JSR, 1:22-cv-10904-JSR.(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 176 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 6/1/2023 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sharonda Jones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/11/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/21/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2023.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, 1:22-cv-10019-JSR, 1:22-cv-10904-JSR.(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #170 Proposed Order for Withdrawal of Attorney filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Hillary Chutter-Ames terminated. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/16/2023) (kv)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/26/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 173 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 5/26/2023 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amy Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #168 AMENDED MOTION (Corrected) Seeking Leave to Reopen Depositions (Letter) . . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jane Doe 1, James Edward Staley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 7 - Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 8 - Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 9 - Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 10 - Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 11 - Filed Under Seal, #12 Exhibit 12 - Filed Under Seal, #13 Exhibit 13 - Filed Under Seal)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Butts, John)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 171 OPINION AND ORDER re: #95 MOTION to Certify Class . filed by Jane Doe 1, #130 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert . filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that the proposed class satisfies Rules 23(a) and Rule 23(b)(3). Accordingly, Jane Doe's motion for class certification is hereby granted. The Court hereby certifies the proposed class, appoints Jane Doe as class. representative, and appoints Boies Schiller Flexner, LLP and Edwards Pottinger, LLC as class counsel. Additionally, the Court hereby denies JP Morgan's motion to exclude the expert reports of Jane Khodarkovsky as moot. The Clerk is respectfully directed to close entries numbered 95 and 130 on the docket of this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/12/23) (yv)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 170 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Chutter-Ames, Hillary)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 169 AMENDED MOTION (Corrected) Seeking Leave to Reopen Depositions (Letter) . Document filed by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D (fmr. Ex. E)).(McCawley, Sigrid)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ***SELECTED PARTIES***AMENDED MOTION (Corrected) Seeking Leave to Reopen Depositions (Letter) . Document filed by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D (fmr. Ex. E))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(McCawley, Sigrid)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Upon review of the parties' submissions, the Court, without reaching the issue of whether the redaction was incomplete in violation of the BSA or the Court's Confidentiality Order in this case, is satisfied that plaintiff's counsel acted in good faith in the making of the redactions. Accordingly, the Court declines to impose sanctions. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/8/2023) (jca)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ANSWER to #59 Third Party Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by James Edward Staley..(Sullivan, Brendan)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION Seeking Leave to Reopen Depositions (Letter) . Document filed by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(McCawley, Sigrid)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 164 SECOND REVISED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (JUDGE RAKOFF): This case is to be tried to a jury. Answer. Defendant JP Morgan's answer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint must be filed by April 10, 2023. Third-Party Defendant James Edward Staley's Answer to JP Morgan's Complaint must be filed by June 7, 2023. Post-discovery judgment motions (except as respecting third-party claims) due by 8/15/2023. Responses due by 8/31/2023 Replies due by 9/7/2023. Deposition due by 8/8/2023. Fact Discovery (including deposition of fact witnesses) due by 7/18/2023. Expert Discovery due by 8/8/2023. Final Pretrial Conference, as well as oral argument, set for 7/28/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 10/23/2023. Oral Argument set for 9/14/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/6/2023) (tro)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: James Edward Staley answer due 6/7/2023. (tro)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 6/2/2023, without transcription or recording. Counsel for Jane Doe, the U.S. Virgin Islands, JP Morgan Chase, and Mr. Staley were present. Mr. Staleys unopposed application for JP Morgan to disclose its correspondence with six third parties in connection with its subpoenas to those third parties is granted. JP Morgans application for Jane Doe to make corresponding disclosures of correspondence relating to third party subpoenas to the same parties is denied, without prejudice to JP Morgans renewing the request should it be able to show a particularized need taking into account the current status of discovery. Mr. Staleys request for a computation of the damages JP Morgan intends to assert against Mr. Staley in the form of its costs of defending the actions by Jane Doe and the U.S. Virgin Islands, as well as for JP Morgan to make available the documents on which any such computation is based, is granted, subject to appropriate withholdings for privilege. JP Morgan is directed to make such production by EOD on Friday, June 16. This production should be made to Mr. Staley only, and any confidentiality designation made in connection with this production shall suffice to prohibit disclosure to Jane Doe and the U.S. Virgin Islands.. (Kotowski, Linda)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MOTION for Caitlin Kovacs to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw).(Gail, Leonard)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 162 MOTION for Caitlin Kovacs to Withdraw as Attorney. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kj)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:. Oral Argument set for 9/14/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Kotowski, Linda)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Jean Bouchoux on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Bouchoux, Christopher)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #161 MOTION for Settlement Class Representative's Notice... The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kj)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ADDENDUM re: #159 Order. This is a further addendum to an order entered by the Court earlier today compelling third-party the New York County District Attorney's Office (the "District Attorney") to comply with a subpoena issued by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. ("JP Morgan"). See ECF No. 157 (the order); ECF No. 159 (an addendum). Although on further inspection it turns out that the District Attorney did submit one two-page document to the Court that did not concern the statements of Jane Doe, the Court finds that that two-page document is not properly subject to discovery in this case. Accordingly, the Court reaffirms that the only documents subject to the Court's order of earlier today are documents concerning the statements of Jane Doe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/26/2023) (kv)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ADDENDUM: This is an addendum to an order entered by the Court earlier today compelling third-party the New York County District Attorney's Office (the "District Attorney") to comply with a subpoena issued by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N. A. ("JP Morgan"). See ECF No. 157. For purposes of clarification, the only documents presented by the District Attorney to the Court for in camera review concerned the statements of plaintiff Jane Doe. Accordingly, the only documents subject to the Court's order of earlier today are documents concerning the statements of Jane Doe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/26/2023) (tg)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION for Dean M. Kaire to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27796947. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dean M. Kaire, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Kaire, Dean)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: After full review of the documents submitted by the District Attorney and JP Morgan, the Court finds that the privileges and statutes invoked by the District Attorney do not apply to the documents requested by JP Morgan's subpoena. Accordingly, the Court hereby orders the District Attorney to furnish responsive documents to JP Morgan on a confidential basis, pursuant to the protective order operative in this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/26/2023) (kv)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #158 MOTION for Dean M. Kaire to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27796947. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 156 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #130 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert . . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER: Because the parties have informed the Court that attorneys' eyes only information was inadvertently included in Exhibit 9 to docket entry 147, the Clerk of the Court is directed to permanently seal that exhibit with electronic access restricted to the Court and attorneys for the parties. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/25/2023) (tg)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Schoenfeld on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Schoenfeld, Alan)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Hearing set for 5/26/2023 at 02:00 PM on Class Certification before Judge Jed S. Rakoff in courtroom 14B of 500 Pearl Street, New York City, NY. (Kotowski, Linda)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #151 Motion for Jonathan Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/24/2023) (kv)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER denying #90 Motion to Dismiss. On April 24, 2023, third-party defendant James ("Jes") Staley moved to dismiss the third-party complaint filed by defendant/third-party plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. against him in each of the above-captioned cases. After full consideration of the parties' written submissions and oral arguments, the Court hereby denies Mr. Staley's motion in full. An opinion explaining the reasoning behind this ruling will follow in due course. The Clerk is respectfully directed to close entry number 90 on the docket of Jane Doe v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., 22-cv-10019, and entry number 125 on the docket of Government of the United States Virgin Islands v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., 22-cv-10904. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/24/2023) (jca)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MOTION for Jonathan Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27777257. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by James Edward Staley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF JONATHAN DUNN, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Dunn, Jonathan)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #151 MOTION for Jonathan Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27777257. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of David Boies in Opposition re: #130 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert .. Document filed by Jane Doe 1, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Boies, David)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #130 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert . . Document filed by Jane Doe 1, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Boies, David)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #130 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert . . Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Boies, David)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 147 DECLARATION of David Boies in Opposition re: #130 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert .. Document filed by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Slipsheet), #2 Exhibit 2 (Slipsheet), #3 Exhibit 3 (Slipsheet), #4 Exhibit 4 (Slipsheet), #5 Exhibit 5 (Slipsheet), #6 Exhibit 6 (Slipsheet), #7 Exhibit 7 (Slipsheet), #8 Exhibit 8 (Slipsheet), #9 Exhibit 9 (Redacted), #10 Exhibit 10 (Slipsheet), #11 Exhibit 11 (Slipsheet)).(Boies, David)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brittany Henderson on behalf of Jane Doe 1. New Address: Edwards Henderson Lehrman PLLC, 425 North Andrews Avenue, Suite 2, Fort Lauderdale, FL, USA 33301, 954-524-2820..(Henderson, Brittany)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Bradley J Edwards on behalf of Jane Doe 1. New Address: Edwards Henderson Lehrman PLLC, 425 North Andrews Avenue, Suite 2, Fort Lauderdale, FL, USA 33301, 954-524-2820..(Edwards, Bradley)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ***SELECTED PARTIES***REPLY AFFIRMATION of David Boies in Support re: #95 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Jane Doe 1, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., James Edward Staley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 46, #2 Exhibit 47)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Boies, David)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #95 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Jane Doe 1, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., James Edward Staley. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Boies, David)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 142 REPLY AFFIRMATION of David Boies in Support re: #95 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 46 (Slipsheet), #2 Exhibit 47 (Slipsheet)).(Boies, David)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 141 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #95 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Boies, David)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 5/16/2023 without transcription or recording. Counsel for Jane Doe, the USVI, JP Morgan, and James (Jes) Staley were present. Jane Does request for a more specific description of JP Morgans search for ESI prior to 2001 is denied.. (Kotowski, Linda)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 5/16/2023, without transcription or recording. Counsel for Jane Doe, the USVI, JP Morgan, James (Jes) Staley, and District Attorney Alvin Bragg were present. (1) The Manhattan District Attorney is instructed to provide a privilege log with respect to documents sought by JP Morgan by 5:00 PM on 5/19/2023. JP Morgans response to any assertions of privilege is due by 5:00 PM on 5/22/2023. (2) Brad Edwards is to submit written objections to JP Morgans application to compel production by 5:00 PM on 5/17/2023. JP Morgan is to respond to those objections by 5:00 PM on 5/18/2023. (3) Jane Does request (on behalf of an unnamed class member) to attend the deposition of Jamie Dimon is denied.. (Kotowski, Linda)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #129 Motion for Andres O'Laughlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/16/2023) (kv)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 139 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #90 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by James Edward Staley..(Sullivan, Brendan)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Felicia H. Ellsworth (Unredacted Version - #136 ) in Support re: #137 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 13 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 14 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 15 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 16 - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 17 - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 18 - Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 19 - Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 20 - Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 21, Part 1 - Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 21, Part 2 - Filed Under Seal, #12 Exhibit 22 - Filed Under Seal, #13 Exhibit 23 - Filed Under Seal, #14 Exhibit 24 - Filed Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 25 - Filed Under Seal, #16 Exhibit 26, Part 1 - Filed Under Seal, #17 Exhibit 26, Part 2 - Filed Under Seal, #18 Exhibit 27 - Filed Under Seal, #19 Exhibit 28 - Filed Under Seal, #20 Exhibit 29 - Filed Under Seal, #21 Exhibit 30 - Filed Under Seal, #22 Exhibit 31 - Filed Under Seal, #23 Exhibit 32 - Filed Under Seal, #24 Exhibit 33 - Filed Under Seal, #25 Exhibit 34 - Filed Under Seal, #26 Exhibit 35 - Filed Under Seal)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #95 MOTION to Certify Class . (Unredacted Version - #135 ). Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jane Doe 1. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 136 DECLARATION of Felicia H. Ellsworth (Redacted Version) in Support re: #135 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Epstein Victims' Compensation Program, #2 Exhibit 2 - "Relentless Pursuit" Book Excerpt, #3 Exhibit 3 - Article Regarding Settlement Deal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Department of Justice Press Release, June 28, 2022, #5 Exhibit 5 - Department of Justice Press Release, July 8, 2019, #6 Exhibit 6 - Indictment, United States v. Epstein, #7 Exhibit 7 - Second Indictment, United States v. Epstein, #8 Exhibit 8 - Fifth Amended Complaint, Doe 1 v. Epstein, #9 Exhibit 9 - Sentencing Proceeding Transcript, United States v. Maxwell, #10 Exhibit 10 - First Amended Complaint, Katlyn Doe v. Indyke, #11 Exhibit 11 - List of Epstein Lawsuits, #12 Exhibit 12 - Filed Under Seal, #13 Exhibit 13 - Filed Under Seal, #14 Exhibit 14 - Filed Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 15 - Filed Under Seal, #16 Exhibit 16 - Filed Under Seal, #17 Exhibit 17 - Filed Under Seal, #18 Exhibit 18 - Filed Under Seal, #19 Exhibit 19 - Filed Under Seal, #20 Exhibit 20 - Filed Under Seal, #21 Exhibit 21 - Filed Under Seal, #22 Exhibit 22 - Filed Under Seal, #23 Exhibit 23 - Filed Under Seal, #24 Exhibit 24 - Filed Under Seal, #25 Exhibit 25 - Filed Under Seal, #26 Exhibit 26 - Filed Under Seal, #27 Exhibit 27 - Filed Under Seal, #28 Exhibit 28 - Filed Under Seal, #29 Exhibit 29 - Filed Under Seal, #30 Exhibit 30 - Filed Under Seal, #31 Exhibit 31 - Filed Under Seal, #32 Exhibit 32 - Filed Under Seal, #33 Exhibit 33 - Filed Under Seal, #34 Exhibit 34 - Filed Under Seal, #35 Exhibit 35 - Filed Under Seal).(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #95 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 134 DECLARATION of Felicia H. Ellsworth (Redacted Version - #132 ) in Support re: #130 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert .. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Filed Under Seal).(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #130 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert . (Redacted Version - #131 ). Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Felicia H. Ellsworth in Support re: #130 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert .. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Filed Under Seal)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #130 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert . . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jane Doe 1. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #129 MOTION for Andres O'Laughlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27730214. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MOTION for Andres O'Laughlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27730214. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Declaration of Andres O'Laughlin, #2 Exhibit - MA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(O'Laughlin, Andy)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #105 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. In short, the movants lack standing, and their motion lacks merit. The motion to disqualify WilmerHale is therefore denied. The Clerk is respectfully directed to close entry number 105 on the docket of this case. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/11/2023) (vfr)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER COMPELLING THE ESTATE OF JEFFREY EPSTEIN TO PRODUCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS TO JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.: The Estate of Jeffrey Epstein ("Estate") is hereby ordered to produce to counsel for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. ("JPMC") all settlement agreements in the Estate's possession, custody, or control, between Epstein or the Estate and any other individuals. The agreements shall be produced with personally identifying information redacted but with settlement amounts unredacted. The Estate shall make this production available to JPMC on an attorneys-eyes-only basis. The attorneys-eyes-only protection shall last for two weeks from the date of production to JPMC to allow any counterparties to the agreements to bring to the Court any objections that they may wish to raise as to further disclosure. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/11/2023) (vfr)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 5/10/2023 without transcription or recording. Counsel for Jane Doe, Deutsche Bank, and JP Morgan were present. Deutsche Bank and JP Morgan may file a joint motion to exclude the testimony of Jane Khodarkovsky by no later than 5:00 PM on 5/12/2023. Plaintiffs may file joint opposition papers by no later than 5:00 PM on 5/22/2023. Reply papers are due by no later than 5:00 PM on 5/25/2023. The Court may hold an evidentiary hearing on this motion before oral argument on plaintiffs motions for class certification on 5/26/2023.. (Kotowski, Linda)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Joinder re: #105 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel WilmerHale.. Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Villacastin, Andrew)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ***EX-PARTE*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #105 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel WilmerHale. . Document filed by Bradley J. Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Cassell, Paul)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #105 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel WilmerHale. . Document filed by Bradley J. Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Cassell, Paul)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 123 DECLARATION of David Boies in Support re: #95 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Slipsheet), #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 Part 1, #7 Exhibit 6 Part 2, #8 Exhibit 6 Part 3, #9 Exhibit 6 Part 4, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14 Part 1, #18 Exhibit 14 Part 2, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22 (Unsealed), #27 Exhibit 23 (Unsealed), #28 Exhibit 24 (Redacted), #29 Exhibit 25 (Redacted), #30 Exhibit 26 (Unsealed), #31 Exhibit 27 (Redacted), #32 Exhibit 28 (Unsealed), #33 Exhibit 29 (Unsealed), #34 Exhibit 30 (Unsealed), #35 Exhibit 31 (Redacted), #36 Exhibit 32 (Redacted), #37 Exhibit 33 (Unsealed), #38 Exhibit 34 (Redacted), #39 Exhibit 35 (Redacted), #40 Exhibit 36 (Slipsheet), #41 Exhibit 37, #42 Exhibit 38, #43 Exhibit 39, #44 Exhibit 40, #45 Exhibit 41, #46 Exhibit 42, #47 Exhibit 43 (Slipsheet), #48 Exhibit 44, #49 Exhibit 45 (Slipsheet)).(Boies, David)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #95 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Boies, David)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #90 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Gail, Leonard)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 DECLARATION of Felicia H. Ellsworth (Corrected - #116 ) in Support re: #112 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, #114 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 DECLARATION of Cynthia D. Vreeland (Redacted Version of Corrected Declaration - #118 ) in Support re: #112 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, #114 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Cynthia D. Vreeland (Corrected) in Support re: #112 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bradley J. Edwards. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 DECLARATION of Alla Lerner re: #112 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, #114 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 DECLARATION of Felicia H. Ellsworth in Support re: #112 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, #114 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 DECLARATION of Cynthia D. Vreeland (Redacted Version - #113 ) in Support re: #114 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #105 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel WilmerHale. (Redacted Version - #112 ). Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Cynthia D. Vreeland in Support re: #112 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bradley J. Edwards. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #105 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel WilmerHale. . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bradley J. Edwards. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Ellsworth, Felicia)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #110 Motion for Eden Schiffmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/8/2023) (kv)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION for Eden Schiffmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third-Party Defendant James Staley. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27703306. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by James Edward Staley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Eden Schiffmann, #2 Exhibit Exhibit - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Schiffmann, Eden)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 5/5/2023,conference without transcription or recording. Counsel for Jane Doe, the USVI, and JP Morgan were present. JP Morgan is ordered to furnish a report to Jane Doe describing what JP Morgan did to identify responsive ESI dating from 2001 and before by no later than 5/9/2023.. (Kotowski, Linda)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 5/5/2023, without transcription or recording. Counsel for Jane Doe, the USVI, JP Morgan, James (Jes) Staley, and Stephen Cutler were present. The USVIs deposition of Stephen Cutler is ordered to proceed on either May 24 or May 25. Counsel for Mr. Staley will be permitted to recall Mr. Cutler for an additional day of deposition, not to exceed five hours, on a later date. Counsel for Mr. Staley is also permitted to depose Mr. Cutler on the same day as the USVI; however, any time that that Mr. Staleys counsel spends deposing Mr. Cutler on that day will be deducted from his time to depose Mr. Cutler on the second day. If counsel for Mr. Staley does not participate in Mr. Cutlers deposition on the first day, the USVI may depose Mr. Cutler for seven hours on that day.. (Kotowski, Linda)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #110 MOTION for Eden Schiffmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third-Party Defendant James Staley. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27703306. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Offi. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (dsh)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ***EX-PARTE***DECLARATION of Paul Cassell in Support re: #105 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel WilmerHale.. Document filed by Bradley J. Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Cassell, Paul)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ***EX-PARTE*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #105 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel WilmerHale. . Document filed by Bradley J. Edwards. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Cassell, Paul)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 DECLARATION of Paul Cassell in Support re: #105 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel WilmerHale.. Document filed by Bradley J. Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (Slipsheet), #4 Exhibit 4 (Slipsheet), #5 Exhibit 5 (Slipsheet), #6 Exhibit 6 (Slipsheet), #7 Exhibit 7 (Slipsheet), #8 Exhibit 8 (Slipsheet), #9 Exhibit 9 (Slipsheet), #10 Exhibit 10 (Slipsheet), #11 Exhibit 11 (Slipsheet), #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15 (Slipsheet), #16 Exhibit 16 (Slipsheet), #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18 (Slipsheet), #19 Exhibit 19 (Slipsheet), #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29 (Slipsheet), #30 Exhibit 30 (Slipsheet), #31 Exhibit 31 (Slipsheet), #32 Exhibit 32 (Slipsheet), #33 Exhibit 33 (Slipsheet), #34 Exhibit 34 (Slipsheet)).(Cassell, Paul)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #105 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel WilmerHale. . Document filed by Bradley J. Edwards..(Cassell, Paul)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel WilmerHale. Document filed by Bradley J. Edwards..(Cassell, Paul)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference without transcription or recording, held on 5/3/2023.. Counsel for Jane Doe, the USVI, JP Morgan, and James (Jes) Staley were present. The USVI has leave to file for alternative service of Larry Page by no later than noon on 5/4/2023. Any party that wishes to object to the USVIs motion may do so by no later than noon on 5/5/2023. Additionally, JP Morgans motion to compel Brad Edwards to produce all documents that were produced by plaintiff Jane Doe in the related case, Doe v. Deutsche Bank, 22cv10018, is granted. JP Morgans motion to compel Mr. Edwards to produce all documents related to plaintiff Jane Doe in Doe v. Deutsche Bank, 22cv10018, is denied, subject to a more particularized showing of the relevance of such documents to Doe v. JP Morgan, 22cv10019, and USVI v. JP Morgan, 22cv10904. (Kotowski, Linda)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:22-cv-10018-JSR; granting (100) Motion for Paul G. Cassell to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:22-cv-10019-JSR.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/2/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, 1:22-cv-10019-JSR, 1:22-cv-10904-JSR (kv)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Law on behalf of Jane Doe 1..(Law, Alexander)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Third-party defendant James (Jes) Staleys motion to compel defendant JP Morgan to produce an estimate of its legal fees is denied, but without prejudice to renewal at a later stage of the litigation. (Kotowski, Linda)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court hereby reconfirms its rulings in its "bottom-line" order of March 20, 2023. Defendants' motions to dismiss are therefore granted in part and denied in part, as specified below: With respect to Jane Doe v. Deutsche Bank Aktiengesellschaft et al., 22-cv-10018, the Court grants defendants' motion to dismiss with respect to Counts II, III, IV, V, VII, VIII, IX, and X of the First Amended Complaint. The Court denies defendants motion with respect to Counts I, VI, XI, and XII of the First Amended Complaint. Thus, for clarity, the following claims asserted by plaintiff Jane Doe against defendants Deutsche Bank Aktiengesellschaft, Deutsche Bank AG New York Branch, and Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas remain as part of the case: (1) the claim that defendants knowingly benefited from participating in a sex-trafficking venture, in violation of 18 U.S.C. 1591(a)(2); (2) the claim that defendants obstructed enforcement of the Trafficking Victims Protection Act, in violation of 18 U.S.C. 1591(d); (3) the claim that defendants negligently failed to exercise reasonable care to prevent physical harm; and (4) the claim that defendants negligently failed to exercise reasonable care as a banking institution providing non-routine banking. All other claims are dismissed. With respect to Jane Doe v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., 22- cv-10019, the Court grants defendant's motion to dismiss with respect to Counts I, II, VI, VII, VIII, and IX of the First Amended Complaint. The Court denies defendant's motion with respect to Counts III, IV, V, and X of the First Amended Complaint. Thus, for clarity, the following claims asserted by plaintiff Jane Doe against defendant J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. remain as part of the case: (1) the claim that defendant negligently failed to exercise reasonable care to prevent physical harm; (2) the claim that defendant negligently failed to exercise reasonable care as a banking institution providing non-routine banking; (3) the claim that defendant knowingly benefited from participating in a sex-trafficking venture, in violation of 18 U.S.C. 1591(a)(2); and (4) the claim that defendant obstructed enforcement of the Trafficking Victims Protection Act, in violation of 18 U.S.C. 1591(d). All other claims are dismissed. With respect to Government of the United States Virgin Islands v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., 22-cv-10904, the Court grants defendant's motion to dismiss with respect to Counts II, III, and IV of the First Amended Complaint. The Court denies defendant's motion with respect to Count I of the First Amended Complaint. Thus, for clarity, the claim of plaintiff the Government of the United States Virgin Islands that defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. knowingly benefited from participating in a sex-trafficking venture, in violation of 18 U.S.C. 1591 (a) (2), remains as part of the case. All other claims are dismissed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/1/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, 1:22-cv-10019-JSR, 1:22-cv-10904-JSR (kv)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: The motion of Paul G. Cassell to appear Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules Governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/1/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, 1:22-cv-10019-JSR, 1:22-cv-10904-JSR (kv)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION for Paul G. Cassell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bradley J. Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Paul Cassell, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Cassell, Paul)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #100 MOTION for Paul G. Cassell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #94 MOTION for Paul G. Cassell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27674337. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Utah. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #95 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Jane Doe 1, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., James Edward Staley. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Boies, David)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #95 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Boies, David)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of David Boies in Support re: #95 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Jane Doe 1, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., James Edward Staley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 26, #7 Exhibit 27, #8 Exhibit 28, #9 Exhibit 29, #10 Exhibit 30, #11 Exhibit 31, #12 Exhibit 32, #13 Exhibit 33, #14 Exhibit 34, #15 Exhibit 35, #16 Exhibit 36, #17 Exhibit 43, #18 Exhibit 45)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Boies, David)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 DECLARATION of David Boies in Support re: #95 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Slipsheet), #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6.1, #7 Exhibit 6.2, #8 Exhibit 6.3, #9 Exhibit 6.4, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14.1, #18 Exhibit 14.2, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22 (Slipsheet), #27 Exhibit 23 (Slipsheet), #28 Exhibit 24 (Slipsheet), #29 Exhibit 25 (Slipsheet), #30 Exhibit 26 (Slipsheet), #31 Exhibit 27 (Slipsheet), #32 Exhibit 28 (Slipsheet), #33 Exhibit 29 (Slipsheet), #34 Exhibit 30 (Slipsheet), #35 Exhibit 31 (Slipsheet), #36 Exhibit 32 (Slipsheet), #37 Exhibit 33 (Slipsheet), #38 Exhibit 34 (Slipsheet), #39 Exhibit 35 (Slipsheet), #40 Exhibit 36 (Slipsheet), #41 Exhibit 37, #42 Exhibit 38, #43 Exhibit 39, #44 Exhibit 40, #45 Exhibit 41, #46 Exhibit 42, #47 Exhibit 43 (Slipsheet), #48 Exhibit 44, #49 Exhibit 45 (Slipsheet)).(Boies, David)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION to Certify Class . Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Boies, David)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Paul G. Cassell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27674337. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bradley J. Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Paul G. Cassell, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Cassell, Paul) Modified on 5/1/2023 (sgz).
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 4/27/2023,without transcription or recording. Counsel for Jane Doe, the Government of the United States Virgin Islands, JP Morgan, and Jes Staley were present. The USVIs deposition of William Langford is ordered to proceed on 5/3/2023. Counsel for Mr. Staley will be permitted to recall Mr. Langford for an additional day of deposition, not to exceed five hours, on a later date. Counsel for Mr. Staley is also permitted to depose Mr. Langford on 5/3/2023; however, any time that that Mr. Staleys counsel spends deposing Mr. Langford on 5/3/2023 will be deducted from his time to depose Mr. Langford on the second day. If counsel for Mr. Staley does not participate in Mr. Langfords deposition on 5/3/2023, the USVI may depose Mr. Langford for seven hours on 5/3/2023.. (Kotowski, Linda)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: Upon due consideration of the parties' arguments, the Court, pursuant to Rule 35, adjourned the examination scheduled for April 24, 2023, and directed the parties to confer and select an examiner to whom they could jointly consent. By email dated April 25, 2023, counsel for JP Morgan informed the Court that the parties had jointly selected Dr. Stuart B. Kleinman, M.D. and provided the Court with a copy of Dr. Kleinman's curriculum vitae. The Court has reviewed Dr. Kleinman's impressive credentials and finds him very well suited to the task at hand. Accordingly, Dr. Kleinman is hereby appointed to examine Jane Doe pursuant to Rule 35. All fees are to be borne jointly and severally by JP Morgan and Mr. Staley. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/27/2023) (kv)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION for Daniel Crispino to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27658362. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel Crispino, #2 Exhibit Florida Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Crispino, Daniel)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #92 MOTION for Daniel Crispino to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27658362. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #90 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by James Edward Staley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Sullivan, Brendan)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by James Edward Staley. Responses due by 5/8/2023 Return Date set for 5/19/2023 at 03:00 PM..(Sullivan, Brendan)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 4/21/2023, without transcription or recording. Counsel for Jane Doe, JP Morgan, and Jes Staley were present. The Rule 35 examination currently scheduled for 4/24 is adjourned. Judge Rakoff will appoint a new examiner to conduct a Rule 35 examination of plaintiff Jane Doe. The parties are directed to meet and confer to select an examiner to which they jointly consent, and they must submit the name of that examiner to the Court by no later than 5:00 PM on 4/25. (Kotowski, Linda)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 4/20/2023, without transcription or recording. Counsel for Jane Doe, the USVI, JP Morgan, Jes Staley, Stephen Cutler, and William Langord were present. With respect to the depositions of Mr. Cutler and Mr. Langford, there will be at least one day of deposition. On that day, plaintiffs may depose the witness for a combined five hours and Mr. Staley may depose the witness for two hours. If, at the end of the first day of deposition, either or both parties think that they need more time, they must convene a joint call to Chambers and explain why another two hours of deposition is warranted. This procedure will also apply to all other witnesses that Mr. Staley might seek to re-depose pursuant to the Court's prior orders.. (Kotowski, Linda)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER in case 1:22-cv-10018-JSR; granting (85) Motion for Discovery; granting (86) Motion re: (85 in 1:22-cv-10019-JSR) MOTION for Discovery re Jane Doe's Identity., (86 in 1:22-cv-10019-JSR) MOTION (letter) re. Disclosure Under Protective Order Of Class Representative In Parallel Suit . in case 1:22-cv-10019-JSR. Plaintiffs in two of the above-captioned cases are anonymous. For clarity, the Court will refer to plaintiff in Jane Doe v. Deutsche Bank Aktiengesellschaft et al., 22-cv-10018, as "DB Jane Doe." On April 14, 2023, defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. ("JP Morgan") and third-party defendant James ("Jes") Staley moved to compel disclosure of DB Jane Doe's identity to them. While DB Jane Doe has a significant privacy interest that weighs against such disclosure, movants have provided the Court with strong reason to believe that she has information that is relevant to their defenses. See Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 2 6 (b) (1) (setting forth the scope of discovery). Thus, the Court hereby grants their motion. Counsel for DB Jane Doe is hereby ordered to disclose DB Jane Doe's identity to JP Morgan and to Jes Staley on a confidential basis, pursuant to the operative protective order in Jane Doe v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., 22-cv-10019. See ECF No. 35 (the protective order). The Clerk is respectfully directed to close entries numbered 85 and 86 on the docket of this case. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/19/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, 1:22-cv-10019-JSR, 1:22-cv-10904-JSR (kv)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 4/18/2023,without transcription or recording. Counsel for Jane Doe, the Government of the United States Virgin Islands, JP Morgan, and Jes Staley were present. (1) JP Morgan is ordered to produce the privilege log for all files associated with Philip DeLucas deposition in advance of that deposition. Going forward, all privilege logs concerning documents in a particular deponents file must be produced at least 24 hours before that witnesss deposition. (2) The Government of the United States Virgin Islands application to compel production of Mr. DeLucas entire personnel file is denied. JP Morgan must, however, produce those portions of Mr. DeLucas personnel file that discuss the Epstein account. Telephone conference without transcription or recording. Counsel for Jane Doe, the Government of the United States Virgin Islands, JP Morgan, and Jes Staley were present. A briefing schedule is set for Jes Staleys motion to dismiss JP Morgans third-party complaint. Moving papers are due by no later than 4/24/2023, responsive papers by 5/8/2023, and reply by 5/15/2023. Oral argument will be held at 3:00 PM on 5/19/2023 in Courtroom 14B, the Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY.( Oral Argument set for 5/19/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 4/18/2023, without transcription or recording. Counsel for Jane Doe, the Government of the United States Virgin Islands, JP Morgan, and Jes Staley were present. Jamie Dimon should be set aside two days for his deposition. On the first day, plaintiffs will have the opportunity to depose Mr. Dimon for a combined total of five hours. Mr. Staley will have the opportunity to depose Mr. Dimon for two hours. If, at the end of the first day, any party believes that it needs more time to depose Mr. Dimon, it must convene a joint call to Chambers by no later than 5:00 PM to explain why. The Court will then rule as to whether Mr. Dimons deposition should continue for a second day and, if so, for how long. (Kotowski, Linda)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #85 MOTION for Discovery re Jane Doe's Identity., #86 MOTION (letter) re. Disclosure Under Protective Order Of Class Representative In Parallel Suit . . Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Edwards, Bradley)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATED AMENDMENT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING "CSI-PROTECTED INFORMATION" BELONGING TO THE OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/17/2023) (kv)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION (letter) re. Disclosure Under Protective Order Of Class Representative In Parallel Suit . Document filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Email re. DB Jane Doe Identity).(Ellsworth, Felicia)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for Discovery re Jane Doe's Identity. Document filed by James Edward Staley. Return Date set for 4/17/2023 at 05:00 PM..(Sullivan, Brendan)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Villacastin, Andrew)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ANSWER to #36 Amended Complaint. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #79 Motion to Sever; granting #79 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; denying #80 Motion re: #79 MOTION to Sever . MOTION for Extension of Time ., #80 MOTION Sever . In short, while the instant motion for severance could be denied on the ground that it simply rehashes arguments that Staley previously made and Jane Doe could have made, the Court, after a de novo review of the motion, denies it once again. The trial of these closely related claims, previously set for October 23, 2023, will not be moved. In an excess of liberality, the Court has also chosen to construe Staley's motion as an additional motion for modification of the pretrial discovery schedule, and on that basis will permit fact discovery by Mr. Staley's counsel (now scheduled to be completed by May 30) to continue for an additional seven weeks, i.e., until July 18, 2023. Similarly, the date for filing by Mr. Staley's counsel of Requests to Admit will be moved an additional seven weeks, i.e., until May 26, 2023. Finally, with respect to any witness who was deposed by other parties before March 16, 2023, Mr. Staley's counsel may, if they wish, take the further deposition of any such witness for up to five hours in duration. The Clerk is respectfully directed to close entries 79 and 80 on the docket of Jane Doe v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., 22-cv-10019, and entry 113 on the docket of Government of the United States Virgin Islands v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., 22-cv-10904. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/10/2023) (kv)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 7/18/2023. (kv)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 RESPONSE to Motion re: #79 MOTION to Sever . MOTION for Extension of Time ., #80 MOTION Sever . . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Gail, Leonard)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION Sever . Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Edwards, Bradley)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Sever ., MOTION for Extension of Time .( Return Date set for 4/7/2023 at 05:00 PM.) Document filed by James Edward Staley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Sullivan, Brendan)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #73 Motion for Stephen Wohlgemuth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/30/2023) (vfr)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #72 Motion for Zachary K. Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/30/2023) (vfr)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #62 Motion for Bruce W. Doughty to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/30/2023) (vfr)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #75 MOTION for Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27531490. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27531490. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by James Edward Staley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order ).(Sullivan, Brendan)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REVISED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (JUDGE RAKOFF): This Court has set this case for trial on 10-23-2023. After consultation with counsel for the parties, the following Amended Case Management Plan is adopted. This plan is also a scheduling order pursuant to Rules 16 and 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The case is to be tried to a jury. Answer. Defendant JP Morgan's answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint must be filed by April 10, 2023. Third-Party Defendant James Edward Staley's response to JP Morgan's Complaint must be filed by April 24, 2023. All Fact Discovery due by 5/30/2023. Expert Deposition due by 6/21/2023. Motions due by 6/28/2023. Responses due by 7/14/2023 Replies due by 7/21/2023. Oral Argument set for 5/26/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. A Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Jury Trial set for 10/23/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/28/2023) (ama)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #72 MOTION for Zachary Kent Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27524918. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 4/10/2023; James Edward Staley answer due 4/24/2023. (ama)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #73 MOTION for Stephen Lewis Wohlgemuth to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-27525137. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION for Stephen Lewis Wohlgemuth to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-27525137. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by James Edward Staley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order ).(Wohlgemuth, Stephen)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION for Zachary Kent Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27524918. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by James Edward Staley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order ).(Warren, Zachary)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (50 in 1:22-cv-10018-JSR) Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Deutsche Bank Aktiengesellschaft, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank AG New York Branch. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/24/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, 1:22-cv-10019-JSR (ate)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #55 Letter Motion to Compel. For reasons stated from the bench on March 16, 2023, the Court hereby grants JP Morgan's motion in part and denies that motion in part, as further specified below. The Court hereby grants JP Morgan's motion with respect to its Requests for Production numbered 1, 9, 12, 13, 14, and 15. Additionally, the Court hereby grants in part JP Morgan's motion with respect to its Requests for Production numbered 7 and 8. More specifically, the EVCP is hereby ordered to produce documents sufficient to show the total number of applicants to the EVCP who were approved for compensation and the total number of such applicants who were denied such compensation. The EVCP is not hereby compelled to produce documents sufficient to show the reasons for its approval or denial of any application. Additionally, JP Morgan's motion to compel is denied with respect to Requests for Production numbered 13, 16, 17, 18, and 19, which the Court views as overly broad. All documents produced pursuant to this Order are to be produced on an attorneys-eyes-only basis, and are to be made available to counsel for JP Morgan as well as to counsel for defendants in Jane Doe v. Deutsche Bank Aktiengesellschaft et al., 22-cv-10018. All personally identifying information must be redacted from them, and they must be returned (with no records of them kept) once the Court has ruled on class certification in the above-captioned cases. The Clerk is respectfully directed to close entry number 55 on the docket of Jane Doe v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., 22-cv-10019 and entry number 63 on the docket of Government of the United States Virgin Islands v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., 22-cv-10904. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/24/2023) (ate)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew H. Schapiro on behalf of Jordana H. Feldman, Epstein Victims Compensation Program..(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ORAL ARGUMENT proceeding held on 3/13/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, 1:22-cv-10019-JSR, 1:22-cv-10904-JSR.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ORAL ARGUMENT held on 3/13/2023 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Moore, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/10/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2023.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, 1:22-cv-10019-JSR, 1:22-cv-10904-JSR.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (37) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (43) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:22-cv-10018-JSR; granting in part and denying in part (31) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (44) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:22-cv-10019-JSR; granting in part and denying in part (38) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:22-cv-10904-JSR. On February 1, 2023, and February 7, 2023, defendants filed motions to dismiss the operative complaints in the above-captioned cases. Upon consideration of all parties' written submissions and oral argument, the Court hereby grants those motions in part and denies those motions in part, as specified below. An opinion explaining the reasons for these rulings will follow in due course. The Clerk is respectfully directed to close entry numbers 37 and 43 on the docket of 22-cv-10018; numbers 31 and 44 on the docket of 22-cv-10019; and number 38 on the docket of 22-cv-10904. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/20/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, 1:22-cv-10019-JSR, 1:22-cv-10904-JSR (kv)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sabina Mariella on behalf of Jane Doe 1..(Mariella, Sabina)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. James Edward Staley waiver sent on 3/9/2023, answer due 5/8/2023. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 3/13/2023 without transcription or recording. Counsel for plaintiff and the JP Morgan defendants were present. Plaintiffs application to take Ms. Erdoes deposition as previously scheduled on 3/15/23 is granted; the deposition should go forward as scheduled. (Kotowski, Linda)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:. Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff in courtroom 14B of 500 Pearl Street. (Kotowski, Linda) Modified on 3/10/2023 (Kotowski, Linda).
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #62 MOTION for Bruce W. Doughty to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27446005. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sac)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: The 11:00am PTC is adjourned to 4:00pm on the same day, Thursday March 16 and will occur right before the oral argument scheduled. ( Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff in courtroom 14B of 500 Pearl Street). (Kotowski, Linda)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Edward Staley..(jgo)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Bruce W. Doughty to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27446005. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Bruce W. Doughty in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois, #3 Exhibit Text of Proposed Order for admission pro hac vice).(Doughty, Bruce)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate Vanguard Group, Inc. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Edward Staley, re: #59 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against James Edward Staley.Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Doe Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - USVI Complaint).(Ellsworth, Felicia)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #55 MOTION to Compel (Letter). . Document filed by Jordana H. Feldman, Jane Doe 1, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Smith, Patrick)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Thomas Burns on behalf of Jordana H. Feldman..(Burns, Brian)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick J. Smith on behalf of Jordana H. Feldman..(Smith, Patrick)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION to Compel (Letter). Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Filed Under Seal)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Ellsworth, Felicia)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jane Doe 1. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Ellsworth, Felicia)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #50 MOTION to Compel Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Produce Documents in Class Period. . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - B. Conery email from 2/3/23 at 8:11p), #2 Exhibit 2- S. Aguiniga email on 2/6/23 at 5:44p, #3 Exhibit 3 - F. Ellsworth email on 2/8/23 at 1:03p, #4 Exhibit 4 - J. Butts emails on 2/21/23 at 5:55p and 2/22/23 at 3:29p).(Ellsworth, Felicia)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #50 MOTION to Compel Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Produce Documents in Class Period. . Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Boies, David)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Compel Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Produce Documents in Class Period. Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Boies, David)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Boies, David)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ***SELECTED PARTIES***NOTICE of Reservation of Rights Regarding Impleader with Respect to Putative Class Members. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jane Doe 1. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Johnson, Boyd)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #43 Motion for Caitlin A. Kovacs to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/10/2023) (kv)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jane Doe 1. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #35 .(Ellsworth, Felicia)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 2/21/2023.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #43 MOTION for Caitlin A. Kovacs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27302592. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sac)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Caitlin A. Kovacs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27302592. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Caitlin Kovacs in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois, #3 Exhibit Text of Proposed Order for admission pro hac vice).(Kovacs, Caitlin)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #40 Motion for Rachel S. Morse to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/6/2023) (kv)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #39 Motion for Leonard A. Gail to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/6/2023) (kv)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #40 MOTION for Rachel S. Morse to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27296316. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.; #39 MOTION for Leonard A. Gail to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27295956. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sac)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Rachel S. Morse to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27296316. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Rachel S. Morse in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois, #3 Exhibit Text of Proposed Order for admission pro hac vice).(Morse, Rachel)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Leonard A. Gail to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27295956. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Leonard A. Gail in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois, #3 Exhibit Text of Proposed Order for admission pro hac vice).(Gail, Leonard)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #37 Motion for John Butts to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/27/2023) (kv)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #37 MOTION for John Butts to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27249813. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for John Butts to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27249813. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John Butts in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Massachusetts, #3 Text of Proposed Order for admission pro hac vice).(Butts, John)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jane Doe 1. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1).(Edwards, Bradley)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/12/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, 1:22-cv-10019-JSR (kv)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 1/12/2023, without transcription or recording held on 1/11/2023. Counsel for plaintiff and defendants was present. Any amended complaint will become the operative complaint. Any motions to dismiss the amended complaint must be submitted by no later than 2/7/2023. Responsive papers must be submitted by no later than 2/21/2023, with reply by no later than 2/28/2023. Oral argument will be held at 4:00 PM on 3/13/2023.( Oral Argument set for 3/13/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER ON SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff, Jane Doe 1, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, and Defendant JP Morgan Chase & Co., by and through their undersigned attorneys, as follows: 1. The party JP Morgan Chase & Co. is hereby substituted with JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. 2. Counsel for JP Morgan Chase & Co. agrees to accept service on behalf of JPMorgan. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/11/2023) JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. added. JP Morgan Chase & Co. terminated. (ks)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Villacastin on behalf of Jane Doe 1..(Villacastin, Andrew)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co...(Ellsworth, Felicia)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Barring any objection from plaintiff Government of the United States Virgin Islands, which must be made by joint telephone call to Chambers no later than 5:00 PM on January 4, 2023, this case is hereby consolidated for all pretrial purposes with Doe v. Deutsche Bank, 22- cv-10018 and Doe v. JP Morgan Chase & Co., 22-cv-10019. Further, except for any motion to dismiss, this case will be governed by the case management plan dated December 5, 2022, previously entered in those cases. See Doe v. Deutsche Bank, 22-cv-10018, Dkt. 23; Doe v. JP Morgan Chase & Co., 22-cv-10019, Dkt. 16. Counsel for the Government of the United States Virgin Islands and counsel for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. should jointly call Chambers, again by no later than 5:00 PM on January 4, 2023, to set a schedule for any motion to dismiss in this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/29/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, 1:22-cv-10019-JSR, 1:22-cv-10904-JSR (kv)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Edwards, Bradley)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/5/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, 1:22-cv-10019-JSR.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/5/2022 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: George Malinowski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2023.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, 1:22-cv-10019-JSR.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (sj)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Hillary Chutter-Ames to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27074953. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Hillary Chutter-Ames in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois).(Chutter-Ames, Hillary)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Felicia H. Ellsworth to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27074290. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Felicia H. Ellsworth in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Massachusetts).(Ellsworth, Felicia)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JP Morgan Chase & Co., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Edwards, Bradley)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re: (4 in 1:22-cv-10019-JSR) MOTION For Leave to Proceed Anonymously re: (1) Complaint . filed by Jane Doe 1, (4 in 1:22-cv-10018-JSR) MOTION For Leave to Proceed Anonymously re: (1) Complaint . filed by Jane Doe 1. Accordingly, on those conditions, plaintiff's motions are hereby granted for all pretrial purposes. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/5/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, 1:22-cv-10019-JSR (kv)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/6/2022) (ate)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Vanguard Group, Inc. for JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co...(Boone, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Bradley J Edwards to RE-FILE Document No. 18. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Request for Issuance of Summons cannot be issued without permission being granted. (nm)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. On the consent of all parties, see transcript 12/5/2022, the above-captioned cases are hereby consolidated for all pre-trial purposes. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to consolidate the cases under the docket number 22-cv-10018-UA but bearing both captions. However, barring further order of the Court, trial of the cases will proceed separately, with 22-cv-10018-UA starting trial on August 7, 2023 and 22-cv-10019-UA starting trial on September 5, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/5/22) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, 1:22-cv-10019-JSR (yv)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:22-cv-10018-JSR. (yv)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/5/2022, CASE ASSOCIATED: Create association to 1:22-cv-10018-JSR, consolidated for all pretrial purposes. : Create association to 1:22-cv-10018-JSR Motion to Dismiss due 12/30/2022, Response due 1/13/2023, Replies due 1/20/2023, Class Certification Hearing 5/12/2023 at 4:00pm in courtroom 14B of 500 Pearl Street, New York City, NY. ( Jury Trial set for 9/5/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JP Morgan Chase & Co., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Edwards, Bradley) Modified on 12/6/2022 (nm).
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON ORAL MOTION. Upon the oral motion of Hillary Chutter-Ames for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. Counsel shall immediately forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of Court. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/5/22) (yv)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: The case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 1/23/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 12/16/2022. Motion to dismiss - Moving papers 12/30. Answering Papers 1/13. Reply papers - 1/20. Motions in support of class certification due by 3/31/2023. Responses due by 4/21/2023 Replies due by 5/5/2023. Deposition due by 4/24/2023. Discovery due by 4/24/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/5/22) (yv)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON ORAL MOTION. Upon the oral motion of Felicia Ellsworth for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. Counsel shall immediately forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of Court. (Attorney Felicia H. Ellsworth for JP Morgan Chase & Co. admitted Pro Hac Vice.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/5/22) (yv)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Robert Lee Boone to RE-FILE Document No. #14 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co...(Boone, Robert) Modified on 12/5/2022 (lb).
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Lee Boone on behalf of JP Morgan Chase & Co...(Boone, Robert)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boyd Milo Johnson, III on behalf of JP Morgan Chase & Co...(Johnson, Boyd)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Boies, II on behalf of Jane Doe 1..(Boies, David)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Edwards, Bradley)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27030727. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27030727. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Sigrid S. McCawley, #2 Exhibit Florida Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(McCawley, Sigrid)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brittany Henderson on behalf of Jane Doe 1..(Henderson, Brittany)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/5/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/29/2022) (kv)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-02854-JSR. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #6 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(gp)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (gp)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jed S. Rakoff as possibly related to 1:22-cv-10018 (possibly related to 1:22-cv-2854). (gp)
November 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Jane Doe 1. Related Document Number: #4 ..(Edwards, Bradley) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
November 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Anonymously re: #1 Complaint . . Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Edwards, Bradley)
November 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Anonymously re: #1 Complaint . Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Edwards, Bradley)
November 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:22-cv-10018. Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Edwards, Bradley)
November 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Edwards, Bradley)
November 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27003371)Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(Edwards, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 1 v. JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: Bradley J Edwards
Represented By: David Boies, II
Represented By: Andrew Villacastin
Represented By: Brittany Henderson
Represented By: Sigrid S. McCawley
Represented By: Sabina Mariella
Represented By: Daniel Crispino
Represented By: Alexander Law
Represented By: Dean Kaire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Felicia H. Ellsworth
Represented By: Boyd Milo Johnson, III
Represented By: Hillary Chutter-Ames
Represented By: Robert Lee Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Caitlin Kovacs
Represented By: Felicia H. Ellsworth
Represented By: John Butts
Represented By: Leonard A. Gail
Represented By: Rachel E. Morse
Represented By: Rachel S Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jordana H. Feldman
Represented By: Brian Thomas Burns
Represented By: Patrick J. Smith
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Epstein Victims Compensation Program
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Bradley J. Edwards
Represented By: Paul G Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: James Edward Staley
Represented By: Brendan V.. Sullivan, Jr..
Represented By: Stephen Lewis Wohlgemuth
Represented By: Zachary Kent Warren
Represented By: Eden Schiffmann
Represented By: Jonathan Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?