Einfeldt v. Business Information Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wonetah Einfeldt
Defendant: Business Information Group, Inc. and Sterling Infosystems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv10024
Filed: November 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Rule 41(a), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Wonetah Einfeldt ("Plaintiff") hereby voluntarily dismisses her claims in this matter against Defendant Business Information Group, Inc. without prejudice. SO ORDERED., Business Information Group, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/13/2023) (ama)
January 12, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Ronnie Abrams for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
January 11, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Business Information Group, Inc.. Document filed by Wonetah Einfeldt. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Eidelman, Levi)
January 10, 2023 Filing 21 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Sterling Infosystems, Inc...(Szyba, Robert)
January 10, 2023 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sterling Intermediate Corp., Other Affiliate Sterling Ultimate Parent Corp., Other Affiliate Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. (NYSE: GS) for Sterling Infosystems, Inc.. Document filed by Sterling Infosystems, Inc...(Szyba, Robert)
January 10, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Levi Eidelman. RE-FILE Document No. #19 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal needs to have handwritten signatures of the parties. The stipulation and the Order need to be filed separately. Re-file the stipulation using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. The order is filed separately under Proposed Orders. (km)
January 9, 2023 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Business Information Group, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Wonetah Einfeldt. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Eidelman, Levi) Modified on 1/10/2023 (km).
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #16 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, move or otherwise respond to #11 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from James F. Horton dated January 3, 2023. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. Business Information Group, Inc. answer due 1/26/2023. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/04/2023) (ama)
January 3, 2023 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Vertical Screen, Inc. for Business Information Group, Inc.. Document filed by Business Information Group, Inc...(Horton, James)
January 3, 2023 Filing 16 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move or otherwise respond to #11 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from James F. Horton dated January 3, 2023. Document filed by Business Information Group, Inc...(Horton, James)
January 3, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Fredrick Horton on behalf of Business Information Group, Inc...(Horton, James)
December 22, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Business Information Group, Inc. served on 12/15/2022, answer due 1/5/2023. Service was accepted by Kelly Jester - VP of Human Resources. Document filed by Wonetah Einfeldt..(Eidelman, Levi)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/19/2022) (jca)
December 20, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Sterling Infosystems, Inc. answer due 1/10/2023. (jca)
December 16, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Robert T. Szyba dated December 16, 2022. Document filed by Sterling Infosystems, Inc...(Szyba, Robert)
December 12, 2022 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Business Information Group, Inc., Sterling Infosystems, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Wonetah Einfeldt. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Eidelman, Levi)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 2/3/2023 at 1:45 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. Unless the parties request otherwise, the Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/7/2022) (vfr)
December 1, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Sterling Infosystems, Inc. served on 11/29/2022, answer due 12/20/2022. Service was accepted by Paul Hopeck, J.D., authorized person to receive service. Document filed by Wonetah Einfeldt..(Eidelman, Levi)
November 28, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Business Information Group, Inc.. (sj)
November 28, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sterling Infosystems, Inc...(sj)
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Eidelman, Levi)
November 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Levi Y. Eidelman to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; PDF should be 2 pages. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
November 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Levi Y. Eidelman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings. (sj)
November 28, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 28, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 25, 2022 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wonetah Einfeldt..(Eidelman, Levi)
November 25, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Eidelman, Levi) Modified on 11/28/2022 (sj).
November 25, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Business Information Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Wonetah Einfeldt..(Eidelman, Levi)
November 25, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sterling Infosystems, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Wonetah Einfeldt..(Eidelman, Levi)
November 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Business Information Group, Inc., Sterling Infosystems, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27003714)Document filed by Wonetah Einfeldt..(Eidelman, Levi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Einfeldt v. Business Information Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wonetah Einfeldt
Represented By: Levi Y. Eidelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Information Group, Inc.
Represented By: James Fredrick Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Infosystems, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Tadeusz Szyba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?