Brown v. Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center
Plaintiff: Claudine Brown
Defendant: Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center
Case Number: 1:2022cv10144
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 021
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center served on 12/2/2022, answer due 12/23/2022. Service was accepted by New York Secretary of State. Document filed by Claudine Brown..(Hassan, Abdul)
December 1, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center. (sj)
December 1, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 1, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
December 1, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
December 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Abdul Karim Hassan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code (none). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:0216. (sj)
November 30, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Claudine Brown..(Hassan, Abdul)
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hassan, Abdul)
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27017736)Document filed by Claudine Brown..(Hassan, Abdul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudine Brown
Represented By: Abdul Karim Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?