Santiago v. United Odd Fellow and Rebekah Home
Plaintiff: Carmen Santiago
Defendant: United Odd Fellow and Rebekah Home d/b/a Rebekah Rehab and Extended Care Center
Case Number: 1:2022cv10151
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re: #6 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Move in Response to Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Taylor C. Eagan dated December 5, 2022.FIRST LETTER MOTION to Stay Proceedings addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Taylor C. Eagan dated December 5, 2022. Response 12/2/22 letter and request to remand. Document filed by Carmen Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Shapnik v. Hebrew Riverdale, 535 F.Supp.3d 301 (S.D.N.Y. April 26, 2021), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Dupervil v. Alliance Health Operations, LCC, 516 F.Supp.3d 238 (E.D.N.Y. February 2, 2021, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Leroy v. Hume, 2021 WL 3560876 (E.D.N.Y. August 12, 2021), #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Judge Browns Remand Order, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E- Memorandum & Order Rivera v. Eastehester, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F- Memorandum and Order - Zavulunova v. Forest View Center, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - E.D.N.Y Remand Orders).(Smith, Damien)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Move in Response to Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Taylor C. Eagan dated December 5, 2022.FIRST LETTER MOTION to Stay Proceedings addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Taylor C. Eagan dated December 5, 2022.. ; granting #6 Letter Motion to Stay re: #6 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Move in Response to Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Taylor C. Eagan dated December 5, 2022.FIRST LETTER MOTION to Stay Proceedings addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Taylor C. Eagan dated December 5, 2022. The parties shall file a join status letter within one week of the Second Circuit's decision on either of the appeals, or by January 31, 2023, whichever date is earlier. GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to stay the case. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/7/2022) (jca)
December 5, 2022 Filing 6 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Move in Response to Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Taylor C. Eagan dated December 5, 2022., FIRST LETTER MOTION to Stay Proceedings addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Taylor C. Eagan dated December 5, 2022. Document filed by United Odd Fellow and Rebekah Home d/b/a Rebekah Rehab and Extended Care Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Orders from District Courts Granting Stays).(Eagan, Taylor)
December 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Damien Smith on behalf of Carmen Santiago..(Smith, Damien)
December 1, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Eagan, Taylor)
December 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Taylor Catherine Eagan to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): If jurisdiction is Federal Question, do not fill out citizenship of principal parties. (pc)
December 1, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 1, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 1, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 30, 2022 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by United Odd Fellow and Rebekah Home d/b/a Rebekah Rehab and Extended Care Center..(Eagan, Taylor)
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Eagan, Taylor) Modified on 12/1/2022 (pc).
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 805880/2022E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27020233).Document filed by United Odd Fellow and Rebekah Home d/b/a Rebekah Rehab and Extended Care Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supreme Court Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Defendant/Appellant Brief Doc No. 63 - Part 1, #3 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Defendant/Appellant Brief Doc No. 63 - Part 2, #4 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Defendant/Appellant Brief Doc No. 63 - Part 3, #5 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Defendant/Appellant Brief Doc No. 63 - Part 4, #6 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Motion for Leave to File Doc No. 75 - Part 1, #7 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Motion for Leave to File Doc No. 75 - Part 2, #8 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Motion for Leave to File Doc No. 80, #9 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Defendant/Appellant Brief Doc No. 104 - Part 1, #10 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Defendant/Appellant Brief Doc No. 104 - Part 2, #11 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Defendant/Appellant Brief Doc No. 104 - Part 3, #12 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Opposition to Motion Doc No. 115, #13 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Opposition to Motion Doc No. 114, #14 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Motion for Leave to File Doc No. 82, #15 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Opposition to Motion Doc No. 113, #16 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Plaintiff/Appellee Brief Doc No. 124 - Part 1, #17 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Plaintiff/Appellee Brief Doc No. 124 - Part 2, #18 Exhibit Leroy v. Hume Defendant/Appellant Reply Brief Doc No. 136, #19 Exhibit Statement of Interest of The United States).(Eagan, Taylor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago v. United Odd Fellow and Rebekah Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Santiago
Represented By: Damien Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Odd Fellow and Rebekah Home d/b/a Rebekah Rehab and Extended Care Center
Represented By: Taylor Catherine Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?