Ostenfeld v. The Laundress, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lori Ostenfeld
Defendant: The Laundress, LLC, Conopco, Inc., d/b/a Unilever Home & Personal Care USA and Conopco, Inc. doing business as Unilever Home & Personal Care USA
Case Number: 1:2022cv10667
Filed: December 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. It is hereby ordered that, pursuant to Rule 42(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the cases are consolidated under the case number 22-CV-10008. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, the existing deadlines remain in force, and the initial pre-trial conference scheduled for March 2, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. will proceed as scheduled. The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate 22-CV-10008, 22-CV-10667, and 22-CV-10760, under case number 22-CV-10008, and to close 22-CV-10667 and 22-CV-10760. All future filings should be in 22-CV-10008 alone. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/19/23) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-10008-JMF, 1:22-cv-10667-JMF, 1:22-cv-10760-JMF (yv)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:22-cv-10008-JMF. (yv)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Lori Ostenfeld served on 1/3/2023, answer due 1/24/2023. Service was accepted by Meghan Legaspi, Office Manager. Document filed by Lori Ostenfeld., SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Lori Ostenfeld served on 1/3/2023, answer due 1/24/2023. Service was accepted by Meghan Legaspi, Office Manager. Document filed by Lori Ostenfeld..(Fearon, Stephen)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER terminating #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint - Request to Transfer This Case to Judge Furman or Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Ronald Rothstein dated January 10. The Court intimates no views on the pending motions, but agrees with Defendants that discovery should be stayed until the Court has ruled on the motions given that the motions will have a significant effect on the contours of the case; the fact that personal jurisdiction is at issue; and the difficulties in segregating discovery as the claims not subject to a pending motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/11/23) (yv)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-10008-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Robert Lehrburger. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (vba)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint - Request to Transfer This Case to Judge Furman or Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Ronald Rothstein dated January 10, 2023. Document filed by Conopco, Inc., The Laundress, LLC..(Rothstein, Ronald)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald Y. Rothstein on behalf of Conopco, Inc., The Laundress, LLC..(Rothstein, Ronald)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Conopco, Inc. served on 12/22/2022, answer due 1/12/2023. Service was accepted by Ramon Romero, security guard. Document filed by Lori Ostenfeld., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Conopco, Inc. served on 12/22/2022, answer due 1/12/2023. Service was accepted by Ramon Romero, security guard. Document filed by Lori Ostenfeld..(Fearon, Stephen)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Conopco, Inc., The Laundress, LLC..(nm)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Laundress, LLC and Conopco, Inc., d/b/a Unilever Home & Personal Care USA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lori Ostenfeld..(Fearon, Stephen)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stephen John Fearon, Jr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stephen John Fearon, Jr. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lori Ostenfeld; Conopco, Inc., d/b/a Unilever Home & Personal Care USA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (vf)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Stephen John Fearon, Jr to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the request for issuance of summons (To: Defendant: section of form is not viewable; plaintiff or plaintiffs attorney information Section of Form is not provided; Filing Court Title is not provided. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Laundress, LLC AND Conopco, Inc. d/b/a Unilever Home & Personal Care USA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lori Ostenfeld..(Fearon, Stephen) Modified on 12/20/2022 (vf).
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fearon, Stephen)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Conopco, Inc., d/b/a Unilever Home & Personal Care USA, The Laundress, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27104029)Document filed by Lori Ostenfeld..(Fearon, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ostenfeld v. The Laundress, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Ostenfeld
Represented By: Stephen John Fearon, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Laundress, LLC
Represented By: Ronald Y. Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco, Inc., d/b/a Unilever Home & Personal Care USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco, Inc. doing business as Unilever Home & Personal Care USA
Represented By: Ronald Y. Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?