Picha et al v. Gemini Trust Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brendan Picha and Max J. Hastings
Defendant: Gemini Trust Company, LLC, Tyler Winklevoss and Cameron Winklevoss
Case Number: 1:2022cv10922
Filed: December 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 sv Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Claudio Simpkins on behalf of Max J. Hastings, Brendan Picha..(Simpkins, Charles)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #15 Motion for Justin Stone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/02/2023) (ama)
February 1, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Justin Stone to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27274936. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sac)
January 31, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Justin Stone to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27274936. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Max J. Hastings, Brendan Picha. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Justin Stone, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Stone, Justin)
January 13, 2023 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from James R. Serritella dated January 13, 2023 re: Response to Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Max J. Hastings, Brendan Picha. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Opt Out Email, #2 Exhibit 2 - New Sign-in, #3 Exhibit 3 - Gemini Customer Service Page, #4 Exhibit 4 - Comparison of Gemini Agreements, #5 Exhibit 5 - Authorization Agreement 7-18-22, #6 Exhibit 6 - User Agreement 9-28-22, #7 Exhibit 7 - Master Loan Agreement 12-23-22).(Serritella, James)
January 10, 2023 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from John F. Baughman dated January 10, 2023 re: Pre-Motion Letter on Proposed Motion to Compel Arbitration. Document filed by Gemini Trust Company, LLC, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (User Agreement), #2 Exhibit B (Authorization Agreement), #3 Exhibit C (MDALA)).(Baughman, John)
January 10, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gemini Trust Company, LLC, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (User Agreement), #2 Exhibit B (MDALA), #3 Exhibit C (Authorization Agreement), #4 Exhibit D (Org Chart), #5 Exhibit E (Arbitration Demand)).(Baughman, John)
January 10, 2023 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent WINKLEVOSS CAPITAL FUND, LLC, Corporate Parent Gemini Space Station, LLC for Gemini Trust Company, LLC. Document filed by Gemini Trust Company, LLC, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss..(Baughman, John)
January 10, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Frederick Baughman on behalf of Gemini Trust Company, LLC, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss..(Baughman, John)
January 10, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maryia Yrjeuna Jones on behalf of Gemini Trust Company, LLC, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss..(Jones, Maryia)
December 28, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cameron Winklevoss. (vf)
December 28, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tyler Winklevoss. (vf)
December 28, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gemini Trust Company, LLC. (vf)
December 28, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cameron Winklevoss, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Max J. Hastings, Brendan Picha..(Serritella, James)
December 28, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tyler Winklevoss, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Max J. Hastings, Brendan Picha..(Serritella, James)
December 28, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gemini Trust Company, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Max J. Hastings, Brendan Picha..(Serritella, James)
December 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James Rocco Serritella. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Brendan Picha, Max J. Hastings. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
December 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney James Rocco Serritella. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331sv Fed. Question: Securities Violation; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
December 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
December 28, 2022 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
December 28, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
December 27, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Serritella, James)
December 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gemini Trust Company, LLC, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27137223)Document filed by Brendan Picha, Max J. Hastings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Picha Certification, #2 Exhibit Hastings Certification).(Serritella, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Picha et al v. Gemini Trust Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan Picha
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Justin Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max J. Hastings
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Justin Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemini Trust Company, LLC
Represented By: John Frederick Baughman
Represented By: Maryia Yrjeuna Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Winklevoss
Represented By: John Frederick Baughman
Represented By: Maryia Yrjeuna Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Winklevoss
Represented By: John Frederick Baughman
Represented By: Maryia Yrjeuna Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?