Marcano v. Schindler Elevator Corporation
Plaintiff: Katherine Marcano
Defendant: Schindler Elevator Corporation
Case Number: 1:2023cv00201
Filed: January 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2023 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Katherine Marcano.(Cotter, Brandon)
January 12, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brandon Robert Cotter on behalf of Katherine Marcano..(Cotter, Brandon)
January 12, 2023 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Catherine G. Bryan, Esq. dated January 12, 2023 re: Proof of Service on Plaintiff's Counsel re: Initial Pretrial Conference and Judge Furman Rules. Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation..(Bryan, Catherine)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 4/18/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/11/2023) (vfr)
January 11, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
January 11, 2023 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
January 11, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
January 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Michael Vogel on behalf of Schindler Elevator Corporation..(Vogel, Justin)
January 10, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Schindler Enterprises, Inc., Corporate Parent Schindler Holding, Ltd. for Schindler Elevator Corporation. Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation..(Bryan, Catherine)
January 10, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bryan, Catherine)
January 10, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 807958-2022E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27182048).Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, Defendant's Answer, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, Plaintiff's Response to Demand for Total Damages, #5 Supplement Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Supplement Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal).(Bryan, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcano v. Schindler Elevator Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Marcano
Represented By: Brandon Robert Cotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schindler Elevator Corporation
Represented By: Justin Michael Vogel
Represented By: Catherine G. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?