Bernier et al v. Gard Recycling, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marlon Bernier, Wilfredo Ramos, Carlos Sierra and Jose Francisco Laboriel
Defendant: Gard Recycling, Inc., DRC Group, Inc., Beverage Container Recycling Corporation, Guastavo Rodriguez and Alex Doljansky
Case Number: 1:2023cv00761
Filed: January 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 fl Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/14/2023) (vfr)
March 14, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 4/14/2023. (vfr)
March 13, 2023 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Default Judgment Motion addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Michael Taubenfeld dated March 13, 2023. Document filed by Marlon Bernier, Jose Francisco Laboriel, Wilfredo Ramos..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To date, Defendants have not appeared or responded to the complaint. Plaintiffs, however, have taken no action to prosecute this case. Accordingly, if Plaintiffs intend to seek a default judgment, they are directed to do so in accordance with Rule 4(H) of my Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases by no later than March 14, 2023. If Plaintiffs fail to do so or otherwise demonstrate that they intend to prosecute this litigation, I may dismiss this case for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 3/14/2023.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/28/2023) (ama)
February 7, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Beverage Container Recycling Corporation served on 2/6/2023, answer due 2/27/2023. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Marlon Bernier..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
February 7, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. DRC Group, Inc. served on 2/6/2023, answer due 2/27/2023. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Marlon Bernier..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
February 7, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Gard Recycling, Inc. served on 2/6/2023, answer due 2/27/2023. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Marlon Bernier..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
January 31, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Beverage Container Recycling Corporation, DRC Group, Inc., Alex Doljansky, Gard Recycling, Inc., Guastavo Rodriguez. (vf)
January 31, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
January 31, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
January 31, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Taubenfeld. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Carlos Sierra, Wilfredo Ramos, Marlon Bernier, Jose Francisco Laboriel. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
January 31, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michael Taubenfeld to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. Form is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
January 31, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Taubenfeld. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (vf)
January 31, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
January 31, 2023 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
January 30, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gard Recycling, Inc., DRC Group, Inc., Beverage Container Recycling Corporation, Guastavo Rodriguez, Alex Doljansky, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marlon Bernier, Jose Francisco Laboriel, Wilfredo Ramos, Carlos Sierra..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
January 30, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed.(Taubenfeld, Michael) Modified on 1/31/2023 (vf).
January 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beverage Container Recycling Corporation, DRC Group, Inc., Alex Doljansky, Gard Recycling, Inc., Guastavo Rodriguez. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27268128)Document filed by Carlos Sierra, Wilfredo Ramos, Marlon Bernier, Jose Francisco Laboriel..(Taubenfeld, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernier et al v. Gard Recycling, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Bernier
Represented By: Michael Taubenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Ramos
Represented By: Michael Taubenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Sierra
Represented By: Michael Taubenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Francisco Laboriel
Represented By: Michael Taubenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gard Recycling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRC Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverage Container Recycling Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guastavo Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Doljansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?