Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. MSL LLC et al
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Defendant: MSL LLC, Nabtesco Motion Control, Inc., Corrossion USA, Mahanaim Shipping Line LLC, Madagascar Foundation, Red Square Corp., Michael Kwadrat, Nomad Brands Inc., CML Exports and Moving Co., DeNa Co., Ltd., Titan Industries, Inc.,, MSL Group Americas, LLC and Alphateam, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00905
Filed: February 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2023 Filing 37 FIRST MOTION for Peter William Latimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice Simon Burchett v. Manahaeim. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mahanaim Shipping Line LLC. Return Date set for 4/14/2023 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Latimer, Peter)
March 21, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #36 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,, was reviewed and referred to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety;. (nd)
March 20, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) MSL Group Americas, LLC, Alphateam, Inc., DeNa Co., Ltd., Michael Kwadrat, MSL LLC, Nabtesco Motion Control, Inc., Nomad Brands Inc., Red Square Corp.. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Garbarini, Richard)
March 15, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: MSL Group Americas, LLC answer due 3/15/2023; Alphateam, Inc. answer due 3/15/2023; CML Exports and Moving Co. answer due 3/15/2023; DeNa Co., Ltd. answer due 3/15/2023; Michael Kwadrat answer due 3/15/2023; Madagascar Foundation answer due 3/15/2023; Mahanaim Shipping Line LLC answer due 3/15/2023; Nomad Brands Inc. answer due 3/15/2023; Red Square Corp. answer due 3/15/2023; Titan Industries, Inc., answer due 3/15/2023. (ate) Modified on 3/20/2023 (ate).
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER terminating #33 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #33 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #22 Amended Complaint,,, #30 Summons Returned Executed, #31 Summons Returned Executed, addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jenny Slocum dated March 13, 2023., #34 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #33 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #22 Amended Complaint,,, #30 Summons Returned Executed, #31 Summons Returned Executed, addressed to J, #22 Amended Complaint,,,. Madagascar Foundation answer due 3/29/2023; DeNa Co., Ltd. answer due 3/29/2023; Nabtesco Motion Control, Inc. answer due 3/29/2023; Red Square Corp. answer due 3/29/2023; Nomad Brands Inc. answer due 3/29/2023; Titan Industries, Inc., answer due 3/29/2023; MSL Group Americas, LLC answer due 3/29/2023; Alphateam, Inc. answer due 3/29/2023; Michael Kwadrat answer due 3/29/2023; CML Exports and Moving Co. answer due 3/29/2023; Mahanaim Shipping Line LLC answer due 3/29/2023; granting #34 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #33 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #22 Amended Complaint,,, #30 Summons Returned Executed, #31 Summons Returned Executed, addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jenny Slocum dated March 13, 2023., #34 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #33 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #22 Amended Complaint,,, #30 Summons Returned Executed, #31 Summons Returned Executed, addressed to J, #22 Amended Complaint. Application granted. Nabtesco Motion Control, Inc. answer due 3/29/2023. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/15/2023) (ate) Modified on 3/20/2023 (ate).
March 14, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #32 MOTION for Peter William Latimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27458178. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from NEW JERSEY;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (aea)
March 13, 2023 Filing 34 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #33 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #22 Amended Complaint,,, #30 Summons Returned Executed, #31 Summons Returned Executed, addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jenny Slocum dated March 13, 2023., #22 Amended Complaint,,, #30 Summons Returned Executed, addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jenny Slocum dated March 13, 2023. Document filed by Nabtesco Motion Control, Inc...(Slocum, Jenny)
March 13, 2023 Filing 33 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #34 Letter Motion) - FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #22 Amended Complaint, #30 Summons Returned Executed, #31 Summons Returned Executed, addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jenny Slocum dated March 13, 2023. Document filed by Titan Industries, Inc., (Slocum, Jenny) Modified on 3/17/2023 (db). As per ECF-ERROR Email Correspondence Received on 3/17/2023 @ 11:57am.
March 13, 2023 Filing 32 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Peter William Latimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27458178. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mahanaim Shipping Line LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Form of Order, #3 Errata Cert of Good Standing).(Latimer, Peter) Modified on 3/14/2023 (aea).
February 21, 2023 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,, served. Titan Industries, Inc., served on 2/20/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. Service was accepted by Connie Neely, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
February 21, 2023 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,, served. Nabtesco Motion Control, Inc. served on 2/21/2023, answer due 3/14/2023. Service was accepted by Amber McCullogh, Agent. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
February 21, 2023 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alphateam, Inc...(pc)
February 18, 2023 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alphateam, Inc., re: #22 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
February 17, 2023 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CML Exports and Moving Co...(pc)
February 17, 2023 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSL Group Americas, LLC..(pc)
February 17, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. #24 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
February 17, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard M Garbarini. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MSL Group Americas, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CML Exports and Moving Co., re: #22 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
February 16, 2023 Filing 24 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alphateam, Inc., re: #22 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 2/17/2023 (pc).
February 16, 2023 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSL Group Americas, LLC, re: #22 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
February 15, 2023 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against CML Exports and Moving Co., DeNa Co., Ltd., Michael Kwadrat, Madagascar Foundation, Mahanaim Shipping Line LLC, Nabtesco Motion Control, Inc., Nomad Brands Inc., Red Square Corp., Titan Industries, Inc.,, MSL Group Americas, Inc., Alphateam, Inc..Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration and assignment, #2 Exhibit Notice, #3 Exhibit Notice, #4 Exhibit Notice, #5 Exhibit Notice, #6 Exhibit Notice, #7 Exhibit Notice, #8 Exhibit Notice, #9 Exhibit Notice, #10 Exhibit Notice, #11 Exhibit Notice, #12 Exhibit Notice, #13 Exhibit Notice, #14 Exhibit Notice).(Garbarini, Richard)
February 6, 2023 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DeNa Co., Ltd.. (vf)
February 6, 2023 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Titan Industries, Inc.,. (vf)
February 6, 2023 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Kwadrat. (vf)
February 6, 2023 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Red Square Corp.. (vf)
February 6, 2023 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Madagascar Foundation. (vf)
February 6, 2023 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mahanaim Shipping Line LLC. (vf)
February 6, 2023 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Corrossion USA. (vf)
February 6, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nabtesco Motion Control, Inc.. (vf)
February 6, 2023 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSL LLC. (vf)
February 6, 2023 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 6, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard M Garbarini. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff). (vf)
February 6, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 6, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 6, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE re: Document No. #12 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 121 Copyright form is not correct. Docket Number field Error on the AO 121 Copyright form. Re-file the document using the event type AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 121 Copyright PDF form. (vf)
February 3, 2023 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT PDF ERROR - AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 2/6/2023 (vf).
February 3, 2023 Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Garbarini, Richard)
February 3, 2023 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DeNa Co., Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
February 3, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Titan Industries Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
February 3, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Kwadrat, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
February 3, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Red Square Corp., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
February 3, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Madagascar Foundation, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
February 3, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mahanaim Shipping Line LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
February 3, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Corrossion USA, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
February 3, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nabteso Motion Control, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
February 3, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSL LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
February 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CML Exports and Moving Co., Corrossion USA, DeNa Co., Ltd., Michael Kwadrat, MSL LLC, Madagascar Foundation, Mahanaim Shipping Line LLC, Nabtesco Motion Control, Inc., Nomad Brands Inc., Red Square Corp., Titan Industries, Inc.,. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number CNYSDC-27290865)Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration and Assignment, #2 Exhibit Notice, #3 Exhibit Notice, #4 Exhibit Notice, #5 Exhibit Notice, #6 Exhibit Notice, #7 Exhibit Notice, #8 Exhibit Notice, #9 Exhibit Notice, #10 Exhibit Notice, #11 Exhibit Notice, #12 Exhibit Notice, #13 Exhibit Notice, #14 Exhibit Notice).(Garbarini, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. MSL LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nabtesco Motion Control, Inc.
Represented By: Jenny Theresa Slocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrossion USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahanaim Shipping Line LLC
Represented By: Peter W Latimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madagascar Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Square Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kwadrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomad Brands Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CML Exports and Moving Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeNa Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titan Industries, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSL Group Americas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphateam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?