Apruzzese v. Louis Vuitton North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MICOL APRUZZESE
Defendant: Louis Vuitton North America, Inc., 73 WEST LLC and PEARL REALTY MANAGEMENT LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv01458
Filed: February 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Louis Vuitton North America, Inc...(Chou, Elaine)
April 5, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew F. Pisanelli on behalf of Pearl Realty Management LLC..(Pisanelli, Andrew)
April 3, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew F. Pisanelli on behalf of 73 West LLC..(Pisanelli, Andrew)
March 31, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. 73 West LLC waiver sent on 2/23/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. Document filed by Micol Apruzzese..(Stadtmauer, Marc)
March 10, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Louis Vuitton North America, Inc. waiver sent on 3/9/2023, answer due 5/8/2023. Document filed by Micol Apruzzese..(Stadtmauer, Marc)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by May 1, 2023, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/28/2023) (jca)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by May 1, 2023, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. If this case has been settled or otherwise terminated, counsel are required to notify the Court before the deadline for the above submissions by calling (212) 805-0292 and must e-mail a stipulation of discontinuance, voluntary dismissal, or other proof of termination to the Orders and Judgments Clerk (judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov). (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/8/2023) (jca) Modified on 3/8/2023 (jca).
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/28/2023) (jca)
February 23, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 73 West LLC, Louis Vuitton North America, Inc., Pearl Realty Management LLC. (vf)
February 23, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marc Andrew Stadtmauer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: 73 WEST LLC, PEARL REALTY MANAGEMENT LLC, MICOL APRUZZESE. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (vf)
February 23, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marc Andrew Stadtmauer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.. (vf)
February 23, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 23, 2023 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 23, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 22, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stadtmauer, Marc)
February 22, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LOUIS VUITTON NORTH AMERICA, INC., 73 WEST LLC, and PEARL REALTY MANAGEMENT LLC,, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by MICOL APRUZZESE..(Stadtmauer, Marc)
February 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 73 WEST LLC, Louis Vuitton North America, Inc., PEARL REALTY MANAGEMENT LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27373842)Document filed by MICOL APRUZZESE..(Stadtmauer, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apruzzese v. Louis Vuitton North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICOL APRUZZESE
Represented By: Marc Andrew Stadtmauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 73 WEST LLC
Represented By: Andrew F. Pisanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEARL REALTY MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By: Andrew F. Pisanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?