Global Brand Holdings, LLC v. Rae Dunn Design LLC et al
Plaintiff: Global Brand Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Rae Dunn Design LLC and Enchante Accessories Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01644
Filed: February 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Referring Judge: Dale E Ho
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Courts Individual Practices, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-dale-e-ho. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the cases reassignment. (Signed by Judge Dale E Ho on 10/19/23) (yv)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Enchante Accessories Inc...(Lieb, Katherine)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Rae Dunn Design LLC..(Fletcher, Jordan)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Dale E Ho. Judge John P. Cronan is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss ., #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Global Brand Holdings, LLC..(Misthal, Marc)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Rae Dunn Design LLC..(Fletcher, Jordan)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tzumi Electronics LLC, Corporate Parent Tzumi Innovations LLC, Corporate Parent Madison Home International LLC, Corporate Parent AMG Global JV LLC, Corporate Parent Inspired Home Dcor LLC for Enchante Accessories Inc.. Document filed by Enchante Accessories Inc...(Lieb, Katherine)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Enchante Accessories Inc...(Lieb, Katherine)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Enchante Accessories Inc...(Lieb, Katherine)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECLARATION of Jordan Fletcher in Support re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Rae Dunn Design LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Fletcher, Jordan)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECLARATION of Rae Dunn in Support re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Rae Dunn Design LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Fletcher, Jordan)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Rae Dunn Design LLC..(Fletcher, Jordan)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Document filed by Rae Dunn Design LLC. Responses due by 10/5/2023.(Fletcher, Jordan)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jordan Fletcher on behalf of Rae Dunn Design LLC. New Address: Fletcher Law, PLLC, 234 Fifth Avenue, 2nd Floor, New York, NY, USA 10001, 212-320-8945..(Fletcher, Jordan)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Cronan: Telephone Conference held on August 14, 2023. As discussed at the conference, Defendants shall move to dismiss the Complaint on September 7, 2023. Plaintiff shall file a single omnibus opposition brief, not to exceed 40 pages, by October 5, 2023, and Defendants shall file any replies by October 19, 2023. Defendants deadline to respond to the Complaint is adjourned sine die pending the Courts resolution of their motions to dismiss. Further, the Court stays the commencement of discovery and will refrain from entering a case management plan and scheduling order at this time. The parties shall meet and confer in good faith regarding limited discovery necessary for productive settlement discussions, and, if appropriate, shall file a letter requesting a referral to the Court-annexed Mediation Program or to Judge Cave for a settlement conference. (Court reporter Amy Walker). (mhe)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #16 Letter filed by Rae Dunn Design LLC ENDORSEMENT The Court will hold a status conference on August 14, 2023, at 11:30 a.m. to discuss the parties' joint request for a briefing schedule on Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss, as well as whether discovery should be stayed pending that motion. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 8/14/2023 at 11:30 AM before Judge John P. Cronan.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/11/2023) (jca)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jordan Fletcher dated July 10, 2023 re: Proposed Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule and Discovery Stay. Document filed by Rae Dunn Design LLC..(Fletcher, Jordan)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Marguerite Lieb on behalf of Enchante Accessories Inc...(Lieb, Katherine)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #13 Letter Motion for Conference re: #13 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Letter re Motion to Dismiss Complaint addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jordan Fletcher dated May 23, 2023. In the interest of judicial economy and conservation of the parties' resources, the Court declines to set a briefing schedule on RDD's anticipated motion to dismiss at this time, given that co-Defendant Enchante Accessories Inc. has until July 10, 2023 to respond to the Complaint. By July 10, 2023, the parties shall meet and confer regarding any anticipated motions to dismiss, and submit to the Court a status letter with a proposed briefing schedule (or proposals if the parties are unable to come to an agreement). All motions to dismiss shall be briefed simultaneously, and Plaintiff shall file one omnibus opposition, not to exceed 40 pages, in response to all motions. The parties should also provide their views as to whether discovery should be stayed pending the motions to dismiss. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Docket Number 13. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 5/24/2023) (jca)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Letter re Motion to Dismiss Complaint addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jordan Fletcher dated May 23, 2023. Document filed by Rae Dunn Design LLC..(Fletcher, Jordan)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Enchante Accessories Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2023, answer due 7/10/2023. Document filed by Global Brand Holdings, LLC..(Misthal, Marc)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Rae Dunn Design LLC waiver sent on 3/24/2023, answer due 5/23/2023. Document filed by Global Brand Holdings, LLC..(Misthal, Marc)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(gp)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rae Dunn Design LLC..(gp)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Enchante Accessories Inc...(gp)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (gp)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Burke Monahan on behalf of Global Brand Holdings, LLC..(Monahan, Patrick)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Enchante Accessories Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Global Brand Holdings, LLC..(Misthal, Marc)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rae Dunn Design LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Global Brand Holdings, LLC..(Misthal, Marc)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Global Brand Holdings, LLC..(Misthal, Marc)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Misthal, Marc)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Misthal, Marc)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Enchante Accessories Inc., Rae Dunn Design LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27396125)Document filed by Global Brand Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - XOXO Registrations, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - XOXO Press, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Infringing Blanket Photos, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Infringing Towel Product Listing).(Misthal, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Brand Holdings, LLC v. Rae Dunn Design LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Brand Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Burke Monahan
Represented By: Marc P. Misthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rae Dunn Design LLC
Represented By: Jordan Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enchante Accessories Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Marguerite Lieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?