Hameed v. Egyptair Airlines Company
Plaintiff: AAMENA HAMEED
Defendant: EGYPTAIR AIRLINES COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2023cv01757
Filed: February 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 pi Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Egyptair Airlines Company..(Carlsen, Christopher)
April 25, 2023 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Egyptair Airlines Company..(Carlsen, Christopher)
March 8, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Egyptair Airlines Company waiver sent on 3/2/2023, answer due 5/31/2023. Document filed by Aamena Hameed..(Zeitzoff, David)
March 6, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Egyptair Airlines Company..(jgo)
March 5, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EGYPTAIR AIRLINES COMPANY, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aamena Hameed..(Zeitzoff, David)
March 5, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Arthur Zeitzoff on behalf of Aamena Hameed..(Zeitzoff, David)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by May 2, 2023, file a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, as further set forth herein. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by May 2, 2023, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/3/2023) (vfr)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by May 2, 2023, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/3/2023) (vfr)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/3/2023) (vfr)
March 3, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Abram I. Bohrer to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Plaintiff's attorney information not provided on PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
March 2, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Egyptair Airlines Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aamena Hameed..(Bohrer, Abram) Modified on 3/3/2023 (sj).
March 2, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bohrer, Abram)
March 1, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 1, 2023 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 1, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Abram I. Bohrer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: AAMENA HAMEED, EGYPTAIR AIRLINES COMPANY. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
March 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Abram I. Bohrer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code White Plains; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to Foley Square; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
March 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Abram I. Bohrer to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
March 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Abram I. Bohrer to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
February 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EGYPTAIR AIRLINES COMPANY. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27403993)Document filed by AAMENA HAMEED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Bohrer, Abram)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hameed v. Egyptair Airlines Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AAMENA HAMEED
Represented By: Abram I. Bohrer
Represented By: David Arthur Zeitzoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EGYPTAIR AIRLINES COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher Carlsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?