Iftikhar et al v. Penske Leasing and Rental Comp et al
Plaintiff: Amna Iftikhar and Kinza Iftikhar
Defendant: Penske Leasing and Rental Comp, Komolo Inc. and Tuvshinjargal Duurenjargal
Case Number: 1:2023cv01768
Filed: March 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 au Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2023 Filing 5 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #4 Letter filed by Penske Leasing and Rental Comp. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for April 20, 2023, is hereby ADJOURNED to May 25, 2023, at 12:30 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file a notice of appearance on or before May 17, 2023. ( Initial Conference set for 5/25/2023 at 12:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/13/2023) (rro)
April 13, 2023 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Adam R. Dolan dated 04/13/2023 re: Request Adjournment of Initial Pre-trial Conference. Document filed by Penske Leasing and Rental Comp..(Dolan, Adam)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on April 20, 2023, at 4:30 p.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Additionally, in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file by ECF and to submit via e-mail (FaillaNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order in PDF format by Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-katherine-polk-failla. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that included with the Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, the parties jointly submit a letter, not to exceed five pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 4/20/2023 at 04:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/3/23) (yv)
March 3, 2023 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
March 3, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
March 2, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dolan, Adam)
March 2, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Adam Richard Dolan. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
March 2, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 2, 2023 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 2, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 810868/2022E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27407350).Document filed by Komolo Inc., Penske Leasing and Rental Comp, Tuvshinjargal Duurenjargal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Defendants Komolo, Inc. Tuvshinjargal Duurenjargal and Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., i/s/h/a Penske Leasing and Rental Comp Answer, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Defendants Komolo, Inc. Tuvshinjargal Duurenjargal and Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., i/s/h/a Penske Leasing and Rental Comp's Demand for Ad Damnum, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Email Response to Defendants' Demand for Ad Damnum).(Dolan, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iftikhar et al v. Penske Leasing and Rental Comp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amna Iftikhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinza Iftikhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Leasing and Rental Comp
Represented By: Adam Richard Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Komolo Inc.
Represented By: Adam Richard Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuvshinjargal Duurenjargal
Represented By: Adam Richard Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?