Farris v. Avon Products, Inc. et al
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company, GG of Florida, Inc., Goulds Pumps (N.Y.) Inc., Morse TEC LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. sued individually formerly known as Aqua-Chem, Inc. doing business as Cleaver-Brooks Division, Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc., Burnham Corporation, BW/IP International, Inc., Carrier Corporation, Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Crosby Valve, LLC, Dana Companies LLC, ECR International, Inc., Emerson Electric Co., Empire, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, NAPA, Higbee, Inc., Higbee Gaskets and Sealing Products, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Henkel Corporation, Henry Company LLC, W.W. Henry Company, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, John Crane, Inc., Borg Warner Morse Tec LLC, ViacomCBS Inc., CBS Corporation, Viacom, Inc. successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f, Peerless Industries Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Redco Corporation doing business as Crane Co., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Specialty Minerals Inc., Peerless Pump Co., Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Weil-McLain, Atwood & Morrill, The William Powell Company, Zurn Industries, LLC., Edelbrock Corporation, Aqua-Chem, Inc., Aqua-Chem, Inc. d and Crane Co.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Brenntag Specialties LLC, DCO LLC, ITT, LLC, Viad Corp, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. formerly known as Aqua-Chem, Inc. d/b/a Cleaver-Brooks Division, Diane Farris, BASF Catalysts LLC, Block Drug Company, Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Chattem, Inc., FMC Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., ITT Inc., ITT Corporation, ITT Industries, Inc., R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Viad Corporation, The Dial Corporation, Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias, BW/IP International, Inc, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc, The Procter & Gamble Company, Special Ty Minerals Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC and Zurn Industries, LLC as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.
Cross Defendant: Burnham LLC, Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., Paramount Global, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Edelbrock, LLC, Avon Products, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Carrier Global Corporation, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Conopco, Inc., Dap Products, Inc., Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Flowserve US, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC, The Proctor & Gamble Company, Unilever United States, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Watts Water Technologies, Inc. and Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Cross Claimant: Goulds Pumps LLC, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, A.O. Smith Corporation, Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Flowserve Corporation, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated a division of Mestek, Inc., and d/b/a Smith Cast iron Boilers, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Mueller Company, LLC, PFizer Inc.,, Union Carbide Corporation, Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. and Redco Corporation
Counter Claimant: Lennox International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv02023
Filed: March 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
2 Judge: Jennifer H Rearden
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal - Suit against Federal Officer
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting #264 Motion for Christopher R. Hooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (dsh)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 265 STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE WITH PREJUDICE... IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the parties hereto, through their respective undersigned counsel, that Plaintiffs' claims against BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, incorrectly sued as "Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Charles of the Ritz", are dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. So Ordered., (Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (sued as successor-in-interest to Charles of the Ritz) terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/14/23) (yv)
November 14, 2023 Filing 264 MOTION for Christopher R. Hooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BASF Catalysts LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Engelhard Corporation and its subsidiary Pita Realty Limited successor-by-merger to Eastern Magnesia Talc Company). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Affidavit Certificate of Service).(Hooks, Christopher)
November 14, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #264 MOTION for Christopher R. Hooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
November 13, 2023 Filing 263 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc...(Cook, Kerryann)
November 13, 2023 Filing 262 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The William Powell Company..(Ciccia, Maria)
November 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting #257 Motion for James L. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
November 10, 2023 Filing 260 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. for Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. Document filed by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc...(Cook, Kerryann)
November 10, 2023 Filing 259 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of Steve Purdy on 11/15/23 at 10:00 AM.Document filed by Diane Farris(Executor of Estate of John Gallo, Deceased), Diane Farris(individually)..(Deruve, Michael)
November 9, 2023 Filing 258 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Christopher R. Hooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-28547140. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BASF Catalysts LLC(sued individually).(Hooks, Christopher) Modified on 11/9/2023 (va).
November 9, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #258 MOTION for Christopher R. Hooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-28547140. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Pennsylvania. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (va)
November 8, 2023 Filing 257 MOTION for James L. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John Crane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Christopher Massenburg, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of James Williams, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Electronic Service).(Halbardier, Suzanne)
November 8, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #257 MOTION for James L. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
November 1, 2023 Filing 256 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for James L. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28507459. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John Crane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Christopher Massenberg, #2 Affidavit James Williams, #3 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order Order, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Electronic Service).(Halbardier, Suzanne) Modified on 11/1/2023 (sgz).
November 1, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #256 MOTION for James L. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28507459. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
October 30, 2023 Filing 255 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent George Saccomando on behalf of Genuine Parts Company..(Saccomando, Vincent)
October 24, 2023 Filing 254 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of Steve Purdy on November 9, 2023 at 10:00 AM.Document filed by Diane Farris(Executor of Estate of John Gallo, Deceased), Diane Farris(individually)..(Deruve, Michael)
October 24, 2023 Filing 253 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of Dianne Farris on TBD at TBD.Document filed by Diane Farris(Executor of Estate of John Gallo, Deceased), Diane Farris(individually)..(Deruve, Michael)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER: Plaintiff has informed the Court that she and Defendant Emerson Electric Co. have resolved the discovery dispute regarding the use of New York City Asbestos Litigation (NYCAL) Standardized Demands. Accordingly, today's conference to address that issue is adjourned with no future date. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/17/2023) (dsh)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #250 Letter filed by Diane Farris. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's request to adjourn the October 13, 2023 conference is GRANTED. The conference is rescheduled to October 17, 2023, at 4:00 p.m. At that time, the relevant parties should call the Court's dedicated teleconferencing line at (877) 402-9757 and enter Access Code 7938632, followed by the pound (#) key. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 10/17/2023 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/12/2023) (dsh)
October 12, 2023 Filing 250 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brendan Tully, Esq. dated October 12, 2023 re: Conference. Document filed by Diane Farris(Executor of Estate of John Gallo, Deceased), Diane Farris(individually)..(Tully, Brendan)
October 10, 2023 Filing 249 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of Steve Purdy on November 7, 2023 at 10:00 AM.Document filed by Diane Farris(Executor of Estate of John Gallo, Deceased), Diane Farris(individually)..(Deruve, Michael)
October 10, 2023 Filing 248 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of Dianne Farris on October 31, 2023 at 10:00 AM.Document filed by Diane Farris(Executor of Estate of John Gallo, Deceased), Diane Farris(individually)..(Deruve, Michael)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER: On September 29, 2023, Plaintiff filed a letter updating the Court that Defendant Emerson Electric Co. objects to the use of New York City Asbestos Litigation (NYCAL) Standardized Demands. ECF No. 245. A conference is scheduled for October 13, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. to discuss Defendant Emerson's objection. At that time, the relevant parties should call the Court's dedicated teleconferencing line at (877) 402-9757 and enter Access Code 7938632, followed by the pound (#) key. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 10/13/2023 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/6/2023) (dsh)
October 4, 2023 Filing 246 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Stephen Novakidis, New Attorney: Kerryann M. Cook, Address: The Cook Group, PLLC, 115 Broadway, Suite 1602, New York, New York, United States 10006, 646-960-2214. Document filed by Avon Products, Inc...(Cook, Kerryann)
September 29, 2023 Filing 245 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael DeRuve, Esq. dated September 29, 2023 re: Discovery. Document filed by Diane Farris(Executor of Estate of John Gallo, Deceased), Diane Farris(individually)..(Deruve, Michael)
September 22, 2023 Filing 244 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The William Powell Company..(Cook, Kerryann)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #237 Letter filed by Diane Farris. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall file a status letter by September 29, 2023, updating the Court on the number of defendants who do not wish to use the New York City Asbestos Litigation ("NYCAL") Standardized Demands. In this letter, the parties shall summarize these defendants' objections to the NYCAL demands and outline any outstanding issues that have prevented the parties from reaching a compromise.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/14/2023) (dsh)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 242 STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION ONLY... IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the parties to this stipulation, that whereas no party is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or a conservatee, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above-entitled action is hereby discontinued as against UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. This Stipulation may be filed without further notice with the Clerk of the Court. SO ORDERED., (Union Carbide Corporation terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/13/23) (yv)
September 13, 2023 Filing 241 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Canvas Holdco, LLC., Corporate Parent Canvas SX, LLC for Watts Water Technologies, Inc.. Document filed by Watts Water Technologies, Inc...(Halbardier, Suzanne)
September 13, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #240 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for approval for the following reason(s): the stipulation of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
September 12, 2023 Filing 240 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Union Carbide Corporation and without costs. Document filed by Union Carbide Corporation. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Kromberg, Jonathan)
September 12, 2023 Filing 239 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Watts Water Technologies, Inc...(Halbardier, Suzanne) Modified on 9/12/2023 (lb).
September 12, 2023 Filing 238 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Suzanne M. Halbardier on behalf of Watts Water Technologies, Inc...(Halbardier, Suzanne)
September 12, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Suzanne M. Halbardier to RE-FILE Document No. #239 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
September 11, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Kromberg. RE-FILE Document No. #235 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
September 8, 2023 Filing 237 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael DeRuve, Esq. dated September 8, 2023 re: Discovery. Document filed by Diane Farris(Executor of Estate of John Gallo, Deceased), Diane Farris(individually)..(Deruve, Michael)
September 8, 2023 Filing 236 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Edward Morley on behalf of Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC..(Morley, Michael)
September 8, 2023 Filing 235 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Diane Farris(individually) and without costs. Document filed by Union Carbide Corporation. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Kromberg, Jonathan) Modified on 9/11/2023 (km).
September 1, 2023 Filing 234 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company..(Montano, James)
August 10, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Status Conference held on 8/10/2023. (ras)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER: On August 10, 2023, the Court held a hearing to discuss issued in the parties' July 28, 2023 discovery letter. By September 8, 2023, the parties shall file a status letter updating the Court on the number of defendants who do not wish to use the New York City Asbestos Litigation ("NYCAL") Standardized Demands. In this letter, the parties shall summarize these defendants' objections to the NYCAL demands and outline any outstanding issues that have prevented the parties from reaching a compromise. Additionally, defendants will be presumptively required to produce discovery within 60 days of the deposition(s) of a product identification witness. Any defendant who objects to this schedule in good faith may make an application to the Court at the appropriate time. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/10/2023) (ras)
August 10, 2023 Filing 232 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa M. Pascarella on behalf of Rheem Manufacturing Company..(Pascarella, Lisa)
August 10, 2023 Filing 231 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Parties. Document filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company..(Pascarella, Lisa)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 230 STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC., ONLY... IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the parties to this stipulation, that whereas no party is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or a conservatee, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above-entitled action is hereby discontinued as against UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC. with prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. Granted. SO ORDERED., (Unilever United States, Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 8/3/23) (yv)
August 2, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #229 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for approval for the following reason(s): the stipulation of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
August 1, 2023 Filing 229 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Unilever United States, Inc. and without costs. Document filed by Unilever United States, Inc.. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Tempesta, Carol)
August 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Carol Tempesta. RE-FILE Document No. #227 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected. The docket entry text needs to match the document. When re-filing do not select that the document is pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Your document does not cite to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)). Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER: A conference to discuss the issues raised in the parties' discovery letter is scheduled for August 10, 2023, at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Court directs Counsel for Plaintiff and the Defendants' Executive Committee (or a representative thereof) to attend. ( Status Conference set for 8/10/2023 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/31/2023) (ate)
July 31, 2023 Filing 227 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Plaintiffs and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Unilever United States, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Tempesta, Carol) Modified on 8/1/2023 (km).
July 28, 2023 Filing 226 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael DeRuve, Esq. and Defendant's Executive Committee dated July 28, 2023 re: Discovery. Document filed by Diane Farris(Executor of Estate of John Gallo, Deceased)..(Deruve, Michael)
July 28, 2023 Filing 225 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yashana Fione McAuley-Parrish on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC(as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.)..(McAuley-Parrish, Yashana)
July 10, 2023 Filing 224 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Morse TEC LLC..(DiLonardo, Anna)
July 10, 2023 Filing 223 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anna Maria DiLonardo on behalf of Morse TEC LLC..(DiLonardo, Anna)
July 10, 2023 Filing 222 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Honeywell International, INc.(as successor-in-interest to Bendix Corporation), Honeywell International, Inc...(Chamra, Casey)
July 10, 2023 Filing 221 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Casey T Chamra on behalf of Honeywell International, INc.(as successor-in-interest to Bendix Corporation), Honeywell International, Inc...(Chamra, Casey)
July 10, 2023 Filing 220 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Honeywell International, INc.(as successor-in-interest to Bendix Corporation), Honeywell International, Inc...(Chamra, Casey)
June 22, 2023 Filing 219 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erich Gleber on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC..(Gleber, Erich)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 218 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties may move to amend the pleadings or join additional parties until 30 days from the last production identification witness. All fact discovery shall be completed by Friday, January 19, 2024.Sll expert discovery shall be completed by Monday, June 3, 2024. A joint letter informing the Court about the status of discovery shall be filed with the Court by Friday, July 28, 2023. Any summary judgment motion shall be filed, without a pre-motion letter, by Monday, July 1, 2024. The parties request a jury trial. (Motions due by 7/1/2024. Fact Discovery due by 1/19/2024. Expert Discovery due by 6/3/2024.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/21/2023) (ras)
June 16, 2023 Filing 217 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael DeRuve, Esq. dated June 16, 2023 re: Case Management Schedule. Document filed by Diane Farris(Executor of Estate of John Gallo, Deceased), Diane Farris(individually)..(Deruve, Michael)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff, DIANE FARRIS, as Executor of the Estate of JOHN GALLO, JR., Deceased, provides notice under F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) that all claims asserted against Defendant R. T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC., sued individually and as successor-in-interest to R. T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC,. are dismissed without prejudice. Defendant has neither served an answer nor a motion for summary judgment. Therefore, this case can be voluntarily dismissed upon notice by Plaintiff without a Court Order. F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1) (A)(i). Granted. SO ORDERED., (R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc. (sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.) and R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc. (sued individually) terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/6/23) (yv)
June 5, 2023 Filing 215 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Avon Products, Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC(sued individually), BASF Catalysts LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Engelhard Corporation and its subsidiary Pita Realty Limited successor-by-merger to Eastern Magnesia Talc Company), BW/IP International, Inc, BW/IP International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC('formerly known as Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias 'Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Burnham LLC, Carrier Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation'), Chattem, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Conopco, Inc., Crosby Valve, LLC, DCO LLC(sued individually), Dap Products, Inc., ECR International, Inc., Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Edelbrock, LLC, Emerson Electric Co., Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, Inc.), FMC Corporation(sued individually), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., Ford Motor Company, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Genuine Parts Company, Goulds Pumps (N.Y.) Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Henkel Corporation, Henry Company LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, INc., Honeywell International, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., ITT, LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Bell & Gossett), John Crane, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox International, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Mueller Company, LLC, PFizer Inc.,, Peerless Industries Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), Redco Corporation, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Special Ty Minerals Inc., Specialty Minerals Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated, The Procter & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Company, The William Powell Company, Unilever United States, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp(sued individually), Viad Corp(formerly known as Viad Corporation), Viad Corp(formerly known as The Dial Corporation), Viad Corp('sued as successor-in-interest to Griscom-Russel Company), W.W. Henry Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Weil-McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC(as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.). Document filed by Paramount Global..(Vega, Dennis)
June 5, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #214 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,, was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (nd)
June 2, 2023 Filing 214 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually). Document filed by R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.). Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(DiMarco, Erik)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's Order, the defendants have established a Defendants' Executive Committee (the "DEC") to facilitate the efficient and speedy resolution of this case. Accordingly, the Court appoints the following people to serve on the DEC: and further set forth in this Order. While the Court recognizes that some discovery and legal issues may be specific to certain sub-groups or even individual defendants, the Court prefers that the DEC serve as the primary representative of the defendants' interests with respect to discovery and motion practice. Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to negotiate with the DEC for purposes of establishing discovery deadlines, developing protocols, and negotiating discovery, where possible. The DEC shall represent the defendants in communications with the Court, where possible. The Plaintiff and the DEC are reminded of their obligation to meet and confer to discuss discovery, settlement, and scheduling. By June 16, 2023, the parties shall file a joint letter proposing a case management schedule (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/1/2023) (rro)
June 1, 2023 Filing 212 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.)..(DiMarco, Erik)
May 30, 2023 Filing 211 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Avon Products, Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC(sued individually), BW/IP International, Inc, Barretts Minerals Inc., Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC('formerly known as Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias 'Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Burnham LLC, Carrier Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation'), Cleaver-Brooks, Inc, Colgate-Palmolive Company, Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Conopco, Inc., Crosby Valve, LLC, DCO LLC(sued individually), Dap Products, Inc., ECR International, Inc., Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Edelbrock, LLC, Emerson Electric Co., Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, Inc.), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Goulds Pumps (N.Y.) Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Henkel Corporation, Henry Company LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., ITT, LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Bell & Gossett), John Crane, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox International, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Mueller Company, LLC, PFizer Inc.,, Paramount Global, Peerless Industries Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), Rheem Manufacturing Company, Specialty Minerals Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated, The Procter & Gamble Company, The William Powell Company, Unilever United States, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp(sued individually), W.W. Henry Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Weil-McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC(as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.). Document filed by Redco Corporation..(Pehush, Tara)
May 25, 2023 Filing 210 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FMC Corporation(sued individually)..(Carlucci, Maria)
May 25, 2023 Filing 209 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maria C. Carlucci on behalf of FMC Corporation(sued individually)..(Carlucci, Maria)
May 25, 2023 Filing 208 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC..(Carlucci, Maria)
May 25, 2023 Filing 207 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maria C. Carlucci on behalf of Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC..(Carlucci, Maria)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER denying as moot #24 Motion to Dismiss (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan)(Text Only Order) (Kaplan, Lewis)
May 25, 2023 Filing 205 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Joseph DiGregorio dated 05/25/23 re: Defendants Executive Committee. Document filed by John Crane, Inc...(DiGregorio, Joseph)
May 22, 2023 Filing 204 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by A.O. Smith Corporation..(Hollman, Laura)
May 22, 2023 Filing 203 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company). Document filed by Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company)..(Rizvi, Syed)
May 22, 2023 Filing 202 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yonit Caplow on behalf of MW Custom Papers, LLC..(Caplow, Yonit)
May 22, 2023 Filing 201 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against Viad Corp(sued individually), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Peerless Industries Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC(sued individually), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, John Crane, Inc., Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Zurn Industries, LLC(as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.), ECR International, Inc., Mueller Company, LLC, Paramount Global, FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, Inc.), Gardner Denver, Inc., The Procter & Gamble Company, Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Weil-McLain, Union Carbide Corporation, Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Brenntag Specialties LLC('formerly known as Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias 'Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Holley Performance Products, Inc., General Electric Company, Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation'), Avon Products, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Burnham LLC, Flowserve US, Inc., Conopco, Inc., R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), W.W. Henry Company, Emerson Electric Co., Pneumo Abex LLC, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Genuine Parts Company, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated, Lennox Industries, Inc., Specialty Minerals Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, BW/IP International, Inc, Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., BW/IP International, Inc., Henkel Corporation, Crosby Valve, LLC, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Barretts Minerals Inc., Lennox International, Inc., Henry Company LLC, Special Ty Minerals Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, PFizer Inc.,, GG of Florida, Inc., Redco Corporation, Hopeman Brothers Inc., DCO LLC(sued individually), The William Powell Company, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Edelbrock, LLC, Honeywell International, INc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Unilever United States, Inc., Dap Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Flowserve Corporation, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), A.O. Smith Corporation. Document filed by Viad Corp(sued individually), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Peerless Industries Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC(sued individually), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, John Crane, Inc., Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Zurn Industries, LLC(as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.), ECR International, Inc., Mueller Company, LLC, Paramount Global, FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, Inc.), Gardner Denver, Inc., The Procter & Gamble Company, Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Weil-McLain, Union Carbide Corporation, Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Brenntag Specialties LLC('formerly known as Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias 'Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Holley Performance Products, Inc., General Electric Company, Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation'), Avon Products, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Burnham LLC, Flowserve US, Inc., Conopco, Inc., R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), W.W. Henry Company, Emerson Electric Co., Pneumo Abex LLC, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Genuine Parts Company, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated, Lennox Industries, Inc., Specialty Minerals Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, BW/IP International, Inc, Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., BW/IP International, Inc., Henkel Corporation, Crosby Valve, LLC, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Barretts Minerals Inc., Lennox International, Inc., Henry Company LLC, Special Ty Minerals Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, PFizer Inc.,, GG of Florida, Inc., Redco Corporation, Hopeman Brothers Inc., DCO LLC(sued individually), The William Powell Company, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Edelbrock, LLC, Honeywell International, INc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Unilever United States, Inc., Dap Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Flowserve Corporation, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), A.O. Smith Corporation..(Elkins, Patrick)
May 22, 2023 Filing 200 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Mueller Company, LLC..(LaSala, Joseph)
May 22, 2023 Filing 199 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Emerson Electric Co...(LaSala, Joseph)
May 22, 2023 Filing 198 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Crosby Valve, LLC..(LaSala, Joseph)
May 22, 2023 Filing 197 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against Viad Corp(sued individually), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Peerless Industries Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC(sued individually), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, John Crane, Inc., Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Zurn Industries, LLC(as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.), ECR International, Inc., Mueller Company, LLC, Paramount Global, FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, Inc.), Gardner Denver, Inc., The Procter & Gamble Company, Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Weil-McLain, Union Carbide Corporation, Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Brenntag Specialties LLC('formerly known as Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias 'Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Holley Performance Products, Inc., General Electric Company, Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation'), Avon Products, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Burnham LLC, Flowserve US, Inc., Conopco, Inc., R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), W.W. Henry Company, Emerson Electric Co., Pneumo Abex LLC, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Genuine Parts Company, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated, Lennox Industries, Inc., Specialty Minerals Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, BW/IP International, Inc, Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Henkel Corporation, Crosby Valve, LLC, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Barretts Minerals Inc., Lennox International, Inc., Henry Company LLC, Special Ty Minerals Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, PFizer Inc.,, GG of Florida, Inc., Redco Corporation, Hopeman Brothers Inc., DCO LLC(sued individually), The William Powell Company, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Edelbrock, LLC, Honeywell International, INc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Unilever United States, Inc., Dap Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Flowserve Corporation, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), A.O. Smith Corporation. Document filed by Viad Corp(sued individually), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Peerless Industries Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC(sued individually), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, John Crane, Inc., Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Zurn Industries, LLC(as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.), ECR International, Inc., Mueller Company, LLC, Paramount Global, FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, Inc.), Gardner Denver, Inc., The Procter & Gamble Company, Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Weil-McLain, Union Carbide Corporation, Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Brenntag Specialties LLC('formerly known as Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias 'Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Holley Performance Products, Inc., General Electric Company, Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation'), Avon Products, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Burnham LLC, Flowserve US, Inc., Conopco, Inc., R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), W.W. Henry Company, Emerson Electric Co., Pneumo Abex LLC, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Genuine Parts Company, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated, Lennox Industries, Inc., Specialty Minerals Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, BW/IP International, Inc, Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Henkel Corporation, Crosby Valve, LLC, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Barretts Minerals Inc., Lennox International, Inc., Henry Company LLC, Special Ty Minerals Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, PFizer Inc.,, GG of Florida, Inc., Redco Corporation, Hopeman Brothers Inc., DCO LLC(sued individually), The William Powell Company, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Edelbrock, LLC, Honeywell International, INc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Unilever United States, Inc., Dap Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Flowserve Corporation, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), A.O. Smith Corporation..(Elkins, Patrick)
May 22, 2023 Filing 196 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Avon Products, Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC(sued individually), BW/IP International, Inc, Barretts Minerals Inc., Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC('formerly known as Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias 'Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Burnham LLC, Carrier Global Corporation, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation'), Colgate-Palmolive Company, Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Conopco, Inc., Crosby Valve, LLC, DCO LLC(sued individually), Dap Products, Inc., ECR International, Inc., Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Edelbrock, LLC, Emerson Electric Co., Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., FMC Corporation(sued individually), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Henkel Corporation, Henry Company LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, INc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., John Crane, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox International, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Mueller Company, LLC, PFizer Inc.,, Paramount Global, Peerless Industries Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), Redco Corporation, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Special Ty Minerals Inc., Specialty Minerals Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated, The Procter & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Company, The William Powell Company, Unilever United States, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp(sued individually), W.W. Henry Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Weil-McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC(as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.). Document filed by Carrier Corporation..(Elkins, Patrick)
May 22, 2023 Filing 195 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Avon Products, Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC(sued individually), BW/IP International, Inc, Barretts Minerals Inc., Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC('formerly known as Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias 'Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Burnham LLC, Carrier Global Corporation, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation'), Colgate-Palmolive Company, Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Conopco, Inc., Crosby Valve, LLC, DCO LLC(sued individually), DCo LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Victor Gasket Manufacturing Company), Dap Products, Inc., ECR International, Inc., Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Emerson Electric Co., Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, Inc.), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Henkel Corporation, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, INc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., John Crane, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox International, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC, Mueller Company, LLC, PFizer Inc.,, Paramount Global, Peerless Industries Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), Rheem Manufacturing Company, Special Ty Minerals Inc., Specialty Minerals Inc., The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated, The Procter & Gamble Company, The William Powell Company, Unilever United States, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp(sued individually), W.W. Henry Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Weil-McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC(as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.). Document filed by Goulds Pumps LLC..(Elkins, Patrick)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 194 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for Plaintiff and Defendant R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc. ("RTV"), in the above-entitled action, that the time within which RTV may answer or othe1wise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is hereby extended up to and including June 1, 2023. SO ORDERED. R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually) answer due 6/1/2023; R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.) answer due 6/1/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/19/2023) (tg)
May 19, 2023 Filing 193 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Canvas Holdco, LLC. for Mueller Company, LLC. Document filed by Mueller Company, LLC..(Halbardier, Suzanne)
May 19, 2023 Filing 192 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Suzanne M. Halbardier on behalf of Mueller Company, LLC..(Halbardier, Suzanne)
May 19, 2023 Filing 191 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Avon Products, Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Engelhard Corporation and its subsidiary Pita Realty Limited successor-by-merger to Eastern Magnesia Talc Company), BW/IP International, Inc, BW/IP International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC('formerly known as Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias 'Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC(sued individually), Brenntag Specialties LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Burnham LLC, Carrier Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation'), Chattem, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Conopco, Inc., Crosby Valve, LLC, DCO LLC(sued individually), DCo LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Victor Gasket Manufacturing Company), Dap Products, Inc., ECR International, Inc., Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Edelbrock, LLC, Emerson Electric Co., Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, Inc.), FMC Corporation(sued individually), FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, LLC), FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Peerless Pump Company), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., Ford Motor Company, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Genuine Parts Company, Goulds Pumps (N.Y.) Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Henkel Corporation, Henry Company LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, INc., Honeywell International, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., ITT, LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Bell & Gossett), ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Corporation), ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Industries, Inc.), John Crane, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox International, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Mueller Company, LLC, PFizer Inc.,, Peerless Industries Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), Redco Corporation, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Special Ty Minerals Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated, The Procter & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Company, The William Powell Company, Unilever United States, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp(sued individually), Viad Corp(formerly known as Viad Corporation), W.W. Henry Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Weil-McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC(as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.). Document filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation..(Vega, Dennis)
May 19, 2023 Filing 190 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Avon Products, Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC(sued individually), BASF Catalysts LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Engelhard Corporation and its subsidiary Pita Realty Limited successor-by-merger to Eastern Magnesia Talc Company), BW/IP International, Inc, BW/IP International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC('formerly known as Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias 'Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC(sued individually), Brenntag Specialties LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Burnham LLC, Carrier Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation'), Chattem, Inc., Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LlC, sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Conopco, Inc., Crosby Valve, LLC, DCO LLC(sued individually), DCo LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Victor Gasket Manufacturing Company), Dap Products, Inc., ECR International, Inc., Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Edelbrock, LLC, Emerson Electric Co., Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, Inc.), FMC Corporation(sued individually), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., Ford Motor Company, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Genuine Parts Company, Goulds Pumps (N.Y.) Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Henkel Corporation, Henry Company LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, INc., Honeywell International, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., ITT, LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Bell & Gossett), ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Corporation), ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Industries, Inc.), John Crane, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox International, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Mueller Company, LLC, PFizer Inc.,, Peerless Industries Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), Redco Corporation, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Special Ty Minerals Inc., Specialty Minerals Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated, The Procter & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Company, The William Powell Company, Unilever United States, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp(sued individually), Viad Corp(formerly known as Viad Corporation), W.W. Henry Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Weil-McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC(as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.), Zurn Industries, LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Zurn Industries, Inc.), Zurn Industries, LLC.. Document filed by General Electric Company..(Vega, Dennis)
May 18, 2023 Filing 189 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.)..(DiMarco, Erik)
May 18, 2023 Filing 188 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by The Procter & Gamble Company..(Rutkowski, David)
May 18, 2023 Filing 187 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Procter & Gamble Company..(Rutkowski, David)
May 18, 2023 Filing 186 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Rutkowski on behalf of The Procter & Gamble Company..(Rutkowski, David)
May 18, 2023 Filing 185 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LlC, sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation'), Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued individually)..(Brown, Robert)
May 18, 2023 Filing 184 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC..(DiMarco, Erik)
May 18, 2023 Filing 183 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by BASF Catalysts LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Engelhard Corporation and its subsidiary Pita Realty Limited successor-by-merger to Eastern Magnesia Talc Company)..(Barrett, Stephen)
May 18, 2023 Filing 182 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Ford Motor Company..(Pennie, Nancy)
May 18, 2023 Filing 181 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR -(SEE #182) ANSWER to #175 Crossclaim. Document filed by A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(sued as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Avon Products, Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Engelhard Corporation and its subsidiary Pita Realty Limited successor-by-merger to Eastern Magnesia Talc Company), BW/IP International, Inc(sued as successor-in-interest to Byron Jackson Pump Company), Barretts Minerals Inc., Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company(sued individually), Burnham LLC, Carrier Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LlC, sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Cleaver-Brooks, Inc(sued as successor-in-interest to The Springfield Boiler Company,), Colgate-Palmolive Company, Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Conopco, Inc.(a subsidiary of Unilever Home & Personal Care USA), Crosby Valve, LLC, DCO LLC(sued individually), Dap Products, Inc., ECR International, Inc.(sued as successor to The Utica Companies, Inc.), Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Edelbrock, LLC, Emerson Electric Co., Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., FMC Corporation(sued individually), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (as successor to Felt-Products Manufacturing Corporation), Flowserve Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Invensys Systems, Inc. f/k/a BTR Siebe PLC as successor-interest to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, as successor-by-merger to Durco International), Flowserve US, Inc.(sued as successor to Edward Valve, Inc., BW/IP International, Inc., and Byron Jackson Pump Company), Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Goulds Pumps (N.Y.) Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc.(and its former subsidiary The Dial Corporation), Henkel Corporation(and its former subsidiary The Dial Corporation), Henry Company LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, INc.(as successor-in-interest to Bendix Corporation), Hopeman Brothers Inc., ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Corporation), John Crane, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox International, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC(as successor-in-interest to The Mead Corporation), Morse TEC LLC(sued as successor-by-merger to Borg Warner Corporation), Mueller Company, LLC(a subsidiary of Mueller Water Products, Inc.), PFizer Inc.,, Paramount Global, Peerless Industries Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Abex Corporation), R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), Redco Corporation, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Specialty Minerals Inc.(sued individually), Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated(a division of Mestek, Inc., and d/b/a Smith Cast iron Boilers), The Procter & Gamble Company(sued as successor-in-interest to The Gillette Company), The William Powell Company, Unilever United States, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC(sued as successor-by-merger to R. T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp('sued as successor-in-interest to Griscom-Russel Company), W.W. Henry Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watts Water Technologies, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Mueller Steam Specialty, Inc.), Weil-McLain(a division of the Marlye-Wylain Company), Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC(as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.)..(Pennie, Nancy) Modified on 5/19/2023 (kj).
May 18, 2023 Filing 180 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust..(McCann, Timothy)
May 18, 2023 Filing 179 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Conopco, Inc...(Tempesta, Carol)
May 18, 2023 Filing 178 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Avon Products, Inc...(Seltzer, Whitney)
May 18, 2023 Filing 177 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Honeywell International, Inc...(Pugliese, Donald)
May 18, 2023 Filing 176 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by MW Custom Papers, LLC..(Dwyer, Patrick)
May 18, 2023 Filing 175 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(sued as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Avon Products, Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC(sued individually), BW/IP International, Inc(sued as successor-in-interest to Byron Jackson Pump Company), Barretts Minerals Inc., Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC(sued individually), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company(sued individually), Burnham LLC, Carrier Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LlC, sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Cleaver-Brooks, Inc(sued as successor-in-interest to The Springfield Boiler Company,), Colgate-Palmolive Company, Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Conopco, Inc.(a subsidiary of Unilever Home & Personal Care USA), Crosby Valve, LLC, DCO LLC(sued individually), Dap Products, Inc., ECR International, Inc.(sued as successor to The Utica Companies, Inc.), Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Edelbrock, LLC, Emerson Electric Co., Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., FMC Corporation(sued individually), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (as successor to Felt-Products Manufacturing Corporation), Flowserve Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Invensys Systems, Inc. f/k/a BTR Siebe PLC as successor-interest to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, as successor-by-merger to Durco International), Flowserve US, Inc.(sued as successor to Edward Valve, Inc., BW/IP International, Inc., and Byron Jackson Pump Company), Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Goulds Pumps (N.Y.) Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc.(and its former subsidiary The Dial Corporation), Henkel Corporation(and its former subsidiary The Dial Corporation), Henry Company LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, INc.(as successor-in-interest to Bendix Corporation), Hopeman Brothers Inc., ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Corporation), John Crane, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox International, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC(as successor-in-interest to The Mead Corporation), Morse TEC LLC(sued as successor-by-merger to Borg Warner Corporation), Mueller Company, LLC(a subsidiary of Mueller Water Products, Inc.), PFizer Inc.,, Paramount Global, Peerless Industries Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Abex Corporation), R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), Redco Corporation, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Specialty Minerals Inc.(sued individually), Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated(a division of Mestek, Inc., and d/b/a Smith Cast iron Boilers), The Procter & Gamble Company(sued as successor-in-interest to The Gillette Company), The William Powell Company, Unilever United States, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC(sued as successor-by-merger to R. T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp(formerly known as Viad Corporation), W.W. Henry Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watts Water Technologies, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Mueller Steam Specialty, Inc.), Weil-McLain(a division of the Marlye-Wylain Company), Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC(as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.). Document filed by Ford Motor Company..(Pennie, Nancy)
May 18, 2023 Filing 174 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Empire Comfort Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cert of Service).(Wilensky, Margot)
May 18, 2023 Filing 173 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Lennox International, Inc...(Kromberg, Jonathan)
May 18, 2023 Filing 172 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc...(Kromberg, Jonathan)
May 18, 2023 Filing 171 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by DCo LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Victor Gasket Manufacturing Company)..(Kromberg, Jonathan)
May 18, 2023 Filing 170 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Gardner Denver, Inc...(Prelvukaj, Arian)
May 18, 2023 Filing 169 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Pneumo Abex LLC..(Sargente, Alfred)
May 18, 2023 Filing 168 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Velan Valve Corp...(DiMarco, Erik)
May 18, 2023 Filing 167 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company..(Squitieri, Virginia)
May 18, 2023 Filing 166 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by ECR International, Inc...(Prelvukaj, Arian)
May 18, 2023 Filing 165 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Henkel Consumer Goods Inc...(O'Rourke, Philip)
May 17, 2023 Filing 164 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Avon Products, Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC(sued individually), BASF Catalysts LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Engelhard Corporation and its subsidiary Pita Realty Limited successor-by-merger to Eastern Magnesia Talc Company), BW/IP International, Inc, BW/IP International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC(sued individually), Brenntag Specialties LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC('formerly known as Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias 'Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Burnham LLC, Carrier Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation'), Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LlC, sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Cleaver-Brooks, Inc, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Conopco, Inc., Crosby Valve, LLC, DCO LLC(sued individually), DCo LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Victor Gasket Manufacturing Company), Dap Products, Inc., ECR International, Inc., Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Edelbrock, LLC, Emerson Electric Co., Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., FMC Corporation(sued individually), FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, Inc.), FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, LLC), FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Peerless Pump Company), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Goulds Pumps (N.Y.) Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Henkel Corporation, Henry Company LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, INc., Honeywell International, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Corporation), ITT, LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Bell & Gossett), ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Inc.), ITT, LLC(sued individually), ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Industries, Inc.), John Crane, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox International, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Mueller Company, LLC, PFizer Inc.,, Paramount Global, Peerless Industries Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), Redco Corporation, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Special Ty Minerals Inc., Specialty Minerals Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated, The Procter & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Company, The William Powell Company, Unilever United States, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp(sued individually), Viad Corp('sued as successor-in-interest to Griscom-Russel Company), Viad Corp(formerly known as Viad Corporation), Viad Corp(formerly known as The Dial Corporation), W.W. Henry Company, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC(as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.), Zurn Industries, LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Zurn Industries, Inc.), Zurn Industries, LLC.. Document filed by Weil-McLain..(Goodearl, David)
May 17, 2023 Filing 163 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Avon Products, Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC(sued individually), BASF Catalysts LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Engelhard Corporation and its subsidiary Pita Realty Limited successor-by-merger to Eastern Magnesia Talc Company), BW/IP International, Inc, BW/IP International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC(sued individually), Brenntag Specialties LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC('formerly known as Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias 'Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Burnham LLC, Carrier Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation'), Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LlC, sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Cleaver-Brooks, Inc, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Conopco, Inc., Crosby Valve, LLC, DCO LLC(sued individually), DCo LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Victor Gasket Manufacturing Company), Dap Products, Inc., ECR International, Inc., Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Edelbrock, LLC, Emerson Electric Co., Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., FMC Corporation(sued individually), FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, Inc.), FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, LLC), FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Peerless Pump Company), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Goulds Pumps (N.Y.) Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Henkel Corporation, Henry Company LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, INc., Honeywell International, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Corporation), ITT, LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Bell & Gossett), ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Inc.), ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Industries, Inc.), ITT, LLC(sued individually), John Crane, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox International, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Mueller Company, LLC, PFizer Inc.,, Paramount Global, Peerless Industries Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), Redco Corporation, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Special Ty Minerals Inc., Specialty Minerals Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated, The Procter & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Company, The William Powell Company, Unilever United States, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp(sued individually), Viad Corp('sued as successor-in-interest to Griscom-Russel Company), Viad Corp(formerly known as The Dial Corporation), Viad Corp(formerly known as Viad Corporation), W.W. Henry Company, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Zurn Industries, Inc.), Zurn Industries, LLC(as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.), Zurn Industries, LLC.. Document filed by Warren Pumps, LLC..(Goodearl, David)
May 17, 2023 Filing 162 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc...(LaSala, Joseph)
May 17, 2023 Filing 161 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Flowserve Corporation..(LaSala, Joseph)
May 17, 2023 Filing 160 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Avon Products, Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC(sued individually), BASF Catalysts LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Engelhard Corporation and its subsidiary Pita Realty Limited successor-by-merger to Eastern Magnesia Talc Company), BW/IP International, Inc, BW/IP International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC(sued individually), Brenntag Specialties LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC('formerly known as Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias 'Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Burnham LLC, Carrier Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation'), Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LlC, sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Cleaver-Brooks, Inc, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Conopco, Inc., Crosby Valve, LLC, DCO LLC(sued individually), DCo LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Victor Gasket Manufacturing Company), Dap Products, Inc., ECR International, Inc., Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Edelbrock, LLC, Emerson Electric Co., Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., FMC Corporation(sued individually), FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, Inc.), FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, LLC), FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Peerless Pump Company), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Goulds Pumps (N.Y.) Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Henkel Corporation, Henry Company LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, INc., Honeywell International, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Corporation), ITT, LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Bell & Gossett), ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Inc.), ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Industries, Inc.), ITT, LLC(sued individually), Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox International, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, PFizer Inc.,, Paramount Global, Peerless Industries Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), Redco Corporation, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Special Ty Minerals Inc., Specialty Minerals Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated, The Procter & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Company, The William Powell Company, Unilever United States, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp(sued individually), Viad Corp('sued as successor-in-interest to Griscom-Russel Company), Viad Corp(formerly known as The Dial Corporation), Viad Corp(formerly known as Viad Corporation), W.W. Henry Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Weil-McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC(sued as successor-in-interest to Zurn Industries, Inc.), Zurn Industries, LLC(as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.), Zurn Industries, LLC.. Document filed by John Crane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Electronic Service).(Halbardier, Suzanne)
May 17, 2023 Filing 159 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Viad Corp(sued individually)..(Margolis, Ellen)
May 17, 2023 Filing 158 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Suzanne M. Halbardier dated 5/17/23 re: Withdrawing Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by John Crane, Inc...(Halbardier, Suzanne)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: On May 15, 2023, the parties appeared for an Initial Pretrial Conference. Given the number of defendants in this case, the Court believes the creation of a Defendants' Executive Committee would facilitate the efficient and speedy resolution of this case. Accordingly, the Court directs Defendants to meet and confer to select representatives for each subgroup of defendants identified in Plaintiffs letter at ECF No. 147. By May 30, 2023, Defendants shall file a joint letter identifying representatives for a Defendants' Executive Committee or advising the Court on the status of those discussions. Once a Defendants' Executive Committee is established, Plaintiff is directed to meet and confer with this committee to discuss discovery, settlement, and scheduling. By June 16, 2023, the parties shall file a joint letter proposing a case management schedule. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/16/2023) (mml)
May 16, 2023 Filing 156 ANSWER to #144 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by BW/IP International, Inc..(Wells, Andrew)
May 15, 2023 Filing 155 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/15/2023. (ras)
May 15, 2023 Filing 154 RESPONSE re: #113 Answer to Complaint, / Defendant Redco Corporation's Answer to Cross-Claims of Defendant Henkel US Operations Corporation. Document filed by Redco Corporation..(Pehush, Tara)
May 15, 2023 Filing 153 RESPONSE re: #115 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim / Defendant Redco Corporation's Answer to Cross-Claims of Defendant General Electric Company. Document filed by Redco Corporation..(Pehush, Tara)
May 15, 2023 Filing 152 RESPONSE re: #85 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,, / Defendant Redco Corporation's Answer to Cross-Claims of Defendant Ford Motor Company. Document filed by Redco Corporation..(Pehush, Tara)
May 15, 2023 Filing 151 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Holley Performance Products, Inc...(Dunn, Courtney)
May 15, 2023 Filing 150 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent High Performance Industries, Inc. for Holley Performance Products, Inc.. Document filed by Holley Performance Products, Inc...(Dunn, Courtney)
May 15, 2023 Filing 149 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Empire Comfort Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit OF SERVICE).(Wilensky, Margot)
May 9, 2023 Filing 148 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam DeSipio on behalf of BASF Catalysts LLC..(DeSipio, Adam)
May 8, 2023 Filing 147 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael DeRuve, Esq. dated May 8, 2023 re: Defendant Exposures and Service of Defendants. Document filed by Diane Farris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants and Exposures, #2 Exhibit B - Service Chart).(Tully, Brendan)
May 8, 2023 Filing 146 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BASF SE, Corporate Parent BASF USA Holding LLC, Corporate Parent BASF Corporation, Corporate Parent BASF Nederland B.V., Corporate Parent BASF Alpha Holding LLC for BASF Catalysts LLC. Document filed by BASF Catalysts LLC..(Barrett, Stephen)
May 8, 2023 Filing 145 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen H. Barrett on behalf of BASF Catalysts LLC..(Barrett, Stephen)
May 8, 2023 Filing 144 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(sued as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Avon Products, Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC, BASF Catalysts LLC, BW/IP International, Inc, BW/IP International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Block Drug Company, Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued individually), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC, Brenntag Specialties LLC('formerly known as Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias 'Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC (sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Burnham LLC, Carrier Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation'), Chattem, Inc. (a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LlC, sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Cleaver-Brooks, Inc, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.(sued individually), Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Conopco, Inc.(a subsidiary of Unilever Home & Personal Care USA), Crosby Valve, LLC, DCO LLC, DCo LLC, Dap Products, Inc., ECR International, Inc.(sued as successor to The Utica Companies, Inc.), Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Edelbrock, LLC, Emerson Electric Co., Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., FMC Corporation, FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Peerless Pump Company), FMC Corporation (sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, Inc.), FMC Corporation (sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, LLC), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Flowserve Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Invensys Systems, Inc. f/k/a BTR Siebe PLC as successor-interest to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, as successor-by-merger to Durco International), Flowserve US, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Goulds Pumps (N.Y.) Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc.(and its former subsidiary The Dial Corporation), Henkel Corporation(and its former subsidiary The Dial Corporation), Henry Company LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, INc., Honeywell International, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., ITT, LLC(sued individually), ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Inc.), ITT, LLC (formerly known as ITT Corporation), ITT, LLC (sued as successor-in-interest to Bell & Gossett), ITT, LLC (formerly known as ITT Industries, Inc.), John Crane, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox International, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC(as successor-in-interest to The Mead Corporation), Morse TEC LLC(sued as successor-by-merger to Borg Warner Corporation), Mueller Company, LLC, PFizer Inc.,, Paramount Global, Peerless Industries Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Redco Corporation, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Special Ty Minerals Inc., Specialty Minerals Inc.(sued individually), Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated, The Procter & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Company(sued individually), The William Powell Company, Unilever United States, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC(sued as successor-by-merger to R. T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp, Viad Corp ('sued as successor-in-interest to Grtscom-Russel Company), Viad Corp (formerly known as The Dial Corporation), Viad Corp (formerly known as Viad Corporation), W.W. Henry Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Weil-McLain(a division of the Marlye-Wylain Company), Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC (sued as successor-in-interest to Zurn Industries, Inc.), Zurn Industries, LLC (as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.), Zurn Industries, LLC.(sued individually) with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Diane Farris. Related document: #140 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,..(Tully, Brendan)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER: The Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, May 10, 2023, is RESCHEDULED for Monday, May 15, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Initial Conference set for 5/15/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/5/2023) (ras)
May 5, 2023 Filing 142 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Zurn Industries, LLC...(O'Connor, Keith)
May 5, 2023 Filing 141 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Keith Michael O'Connor on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC...(O'Connor, Keith)
May 5, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brendan Tully to RE-FILE Document No. #140 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (gp)
May 4, 2023 Filing 140 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - COMPLAINT against A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(sued as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Avon Products, Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC, BASF Catalysts LLC, BW/IP International, Inc, BW/IP International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Block Drug Company, Inc.(sued individually), Block Drug Company, Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued individually), Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued as successor-in-interest to Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC, Brenntag Specialties LLC('formerly known as Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias 'Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.), Brenntag Specialties LLC (sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.), Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Burnham LLC, Carrier Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Chattem, Inc.(a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation'), Chattem, Inc. (a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LlC, sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company), Cleaver-Brooks, Inc, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.(sued individually), Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Conopco, Inc.(a subsidiary of Unilever Home & Personal Care USA), Crosby Valve, LLC, DCO LLC, DCo LLC, Dap Products, Inc., ECR International, Inc.(sued as successor to The Utica Companies, Inc.), Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Edelbrock, LLC, Emerson Electric Co., Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., FMC Corporation, FMC Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Peerless Pump Company), FMC Corporation (sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, Inc.), FMC Corporation (sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, LLC), Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Flowserve Corporation(sued as successor-in-interest to Invensys Systems, Inc. f/k/a BTR Siebe PLC as successor-interest to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, as successor-by-merger to Durco International), Flowserve US, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Goulds Pumps (N.Y.) Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc.(and its former subsidiary The Dial Corporation), Henkel Corporation(and its former subsidiary The Dial Corporation), Henry Company LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, INc., Honeywell International, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., ITT, LLC(sued individually), ITT, LLC(formerly known as ITT Inc.), ITT, LLC (formerly known as ITT Corporation), ITT, LLC (sued as successor-in-interest to Bell & Gossett), ITT, LLC (formerly known as ITT Industries, Inc.), John Crane, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Lennox International, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC(as successor-in-interest to The Mead Corporation), Morse TEC LLC(sued as successor-by-merger to Borg Warner Corporation), Mueller Company, LLC, PFizer Inc.,, Paramount Global, Peerless Industries Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.(sued individually), R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Redco Corporation, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Special Ty Minerals Inc., Specialty Minerals Inc.(sued individually), Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated, The Procter & Gamble Company, The Proctor & Gamble Company(sued individually), The William Powell Company, Unilever United States, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC(sued as successor-by-merger to R. T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.), Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp, Viad Corp ('sued as successor-in-interest to Grtscom-Russel Company), Viad Corp (formerly known as The Dial Corporation), Viad Corp (formerly known as Viad Corporation), W.W. Henry Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Weil-McLain(a division of the Marlye-Wylain Company), Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC (sued as successor-in-interest to Zurn Industries, Inc.), Zurn Industries, LLC (as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.), Zurn Industries, LLC.(sued individually). Document filed by Diane Farris..(Tully, Brendan) Modified on 5/5/2023 (gp).
May 4, 2023 Filing 139 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver-Brooks Acquisition, LLC for Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. Document filed by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc...(Elkins, Patrick)
May 4, 2023 Filing 138 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc...(Elkins, Patrick)
May 4, 2023 Filing 137 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco Inc. for Goulds Pumps LLC. Document filed by Goulds Pumps LLC..(Elkins, Patrick)
May 4, 2023 Filing 136 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins on behalf of Goulds Pumps LLC..(Elkins, Patrick)
May 4, 2023 Filing 135 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco Inc. for ITT, LLC. Document filed by ITT, LLC..(Elkins, Patrick)
May 4, 2023 Filing 134 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins on behalf of ITT, LLC..(Elkins, Patrick)
May 3, 2023 Filing 133 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Carrier Global Corporation for Carrier Corporation. Document filed by Carrier Corporation..(Elkins, Patrick)
May 3, 2023 Filing 132 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins on behalf of Carrier Corporation..(Elkins, Patrick)
May 3, 2023 Filing 131 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Diane Farris..(Deruve, Michael)
May 2, 2023 Filing 130 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerryann Marie Cook on behalf of The William Powell Company..(Cook, Kerryann)
May 2, 2023 Filing 129 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerryann Marie Cook on behalf of Henry Company LLC..(Cook, Kerryann)
May 2, 2023 Filing 128 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerryann Marie Cook on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc...(Cook, Kerryann)
May 2, 2023 Filing 127 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerryann Marie Cook on behalf of W.W. Henry Company..(Cook, Kerryann)
May 2, 2023 Filing 126 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerryann Marie Cook on behalf of GG of Florida, Inc...(Cook, Kerryann)
May 2, 2023 Filing 125 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerryann Marie Cook on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc...(Cook, Kerryann)
May 1, 2023 Filing 124 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Dap Products, Inc...(Howarth, John)
May 1, 2023 Filing 123 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dap Products, Inc...(Howarth, John)
May 1, 2023 Filing 122 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Samuel Howarth on behalf of Dap Products, Inc...(Howarth, John)
May 1, 2023 Filing 121 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Flowserve Corporation..(O'Connor, Keith)
May 1, 2023 Filing 120 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Keith Michael O'Connor on behalf of Flowserve Corporation..(O'Connor, Keith)
April 28, 2023 Filing 119 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Margot Nicole Wilensky on behalf of Empire Comfort Systems, Inc...(Wilensky, Margot)
April 28, 2023 Filing 118 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Henkel AG & Co. KGaA, Other Affiliate Henkel Consumer Goods, Inc. for Henkel Corporation; Corporate Parent Henkel AG & Co. KGaA, Other Affiliate Henkel US Operations Corporation for Henkel Consumer Goods Inc.. Document filed by Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Henkel Corporation..(O'Rourke, Philip)
April 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney John Samuel Howarth to RE-FILE Document No. #117 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
April 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Philip Justin O'Rourke to RE-FILE Document No. #112 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): not all corporate parents/other affiliates were added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
April 27, 2023 Filing 117 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation..(Howarth, John) Modified on 4/28/2023 (lb).
April 27, 2023 Filing 116 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Samuel Howarth on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation..(Howarth, John)
April 27, 2023 Filing 115 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against Zurn Industries, LLC.. Document filed by General Electric Company..(Vega, Dennis)
April 27, 2023 Filing 114 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY for General Electric Company. Document filed by General Electric Company..(Vega, Dennis)
April 26, 2023 Filing 113 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Henkel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Henkel's Answer to Simon Greenstone Panatier, PC's Standard Asbestos Complaint No. 2 for Personal Injury and Wrongful Death).(O'Rourke, Philip)
April 26, 2023 Filing 112 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Henkel AG & Co. KGaA for Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Henkel Corporation. Document filed by Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Henkel Corporation..(O'Rourke, Philip) Modified on 4/28/2023 (lb).
April 26, 2023 Filing 111 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Justin O'Rourke on behalf of Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Henkel Corporation..(O'Rourke, Philip)
April 26, 2023 Filing 110 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Henkel Corporation..(O'Rourke, Philip) Modified on 4/27/2023 (lb).
April 26, 2023 Filing 109 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by General Electric Company..(Vega, Dennis) Modified on 4/26/2023 (lb).
April 26, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Dennis Enrique Vega to RE-FILE Document No. #109 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
April 25, 2023 Filing 108 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc...(Kromberg, Jonathan)
April 25, 2023 Filing 107 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Brier Kromberg on behalf of Hopeman Brothers Inc...(Kromberg, Jonathan)
April 25, 2023 Filing 106 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust..(McCann, Timothy)
April 25, 2023 Filing 105 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Lennox International Inc. for Lennox Industries, Inc.. Document filed by Lennox Industries, Inc...(Kromberg, Jonathan)
April 25, 2023 Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Brier Kromberg on behalf of Lennox Industries, Inc...(Kromberg, Jonathan)
April 25, 2023 Filing 103 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation. Document filed by Union Carbide Corporation..(Kromberg, Jonathan)
April 25, 2023 Filing 102 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin William Turbert on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc...(Turbert, Kevin)
April 25, 2023 Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Brier Kromberg on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation..(Kromberg, Jonathan)
April 24, 2023 Filing 100 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Enstar Holdings (US), Inc. for DCO LLC. Document filed by DCO LLC..(Kromberg, Jonathan)
April 24, 2023 Filing 99 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Brier Kromberg on behalf of DCO LLC..(Kromberg, Jonathan)
April 24, 2023 Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Syed Kazim Rizvi on behalf of Block Drug Company, Inc...(Rizvi, Syed)
April 24, 2023 Filing 97 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by A.O. Smith Corporation..(Hollman, Laura)
April 24, 2023 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Beth Hollman on behalf of A.O. Smith Corporation..(Hollman, Laura)
April 24, 2023 Filing 95 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ECR US Holdings, Inc. for ECR International, Inc.. Document filed by ECR International, Inc...(Prelvukaj, Arian)
April 24, 2023 Filing 94 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arian Prelvukaj on behalf of ECR International, Inc...(Prelvukaj, Arian)
April 21, 2023 Filing 93 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pneumo Abex LLC..(Sargente, Alfred)
April 21, 2023 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alfred J Sargente on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC..(Sargente, Alfred)
April 21, 2023 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy M. McCann on behalf of Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust..(McCann, Timothy)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #75 Letter Pretrial Conference Order filed by Diane Farris. ENDORSEMENT: The Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for April 26, 2023, is adjourned to May 10, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The parties must submit a proposed Civil Case Management Order by May 3, 2023. Plaintiff must submit a letter summarizing the claims against Defendants and describe any open service issues by May 8, 2023. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 5/10/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/20/23) (yv)
April 20, 2023 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Alan Tanenbaum on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation..(Tanenbaum, Michael)
April 20, 2023 Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dennis Enrique Vega on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation..(Vega, Dennis)
April 20, 2023 Filing 87 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate JOHN WOOD GROUP PLC for Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Document filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation..(Vega, Dennis)
April 20, 2023 Filing 86 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Alan Tanenbaum on behalf of Paramount Global..(Tanenbaum, Michael)
April 20, 2023 Filing 85 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc., Avon Products, Inc., BASF Catalysts LLC, BW/IP International, Inc., Barretts Minerals Inc., Block Drug Company, Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties LLC, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Burnham LLC, Carrier Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown, Conopco, Inc., Crosby Valve, LLC, DCO LLC, Dap Products, Inc., ECR International, Inc., Eastern Magnesia Talc Company, Edelbrock, LLC, Emerson Electric Co., Empire Comfort Systems, Inc., FMC Corporation, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, GG of Florida, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Genuine Parts Company, Goulds Pumps (N.Y.) Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, Henkel Consumer Goods Inc., Henkel Corporation, Henry Company LLC, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., ITT, LLC, John Crane, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Mueller Company, LLC, PFizer Inc.,, Paramount Global, Peerless Industries Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Redco Corporation, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Specialty Minerals Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated, The Proctor & Gamble Company, The William Powell Company, Unilever United States, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp, W.W. Henry Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Weil-McLain, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC.. Document filed by Ford Motor Company..(Pennie, Nancy)
April 20, 2023 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dennis Enrique Vega on behalf of Paramount Global..(Vega, Dennis)
April 20, 2023 Filing 83 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Paramount Global, Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for Paramount Global. Document filed by Paramount Global..(Vega, Dennis)
April 20, 2023 Filing 82 REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS.Document filed by Ford Motor Company..(Pennie, Nancy)
April 20, 2023 Filing 81 NOTICE of To Preserve Evidence. Document filed by Ford Motor Company..(Pennie, Nancy)
April 20, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ori Shafirstein on behalf of Viad Corp..(Shafirstein, Ori)
April 20, 2023 Filing 79 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #85 ANSWER) - ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against Avon Products, Inc.. Document filed by Ford Motor Company..(Pennie, Nancy) As per ECF-ERROR Email Correspondence received on 4/20/2023 @ 1:01pm. Modified on 4/21/2023 (db).
April 20, 2023 Filing 78 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Unilever PLC, a publicly traded company, Other Affiliate wholly-owned subsidiary of Unilever United States, Inc. for Conopco, Inc.. Document filed by Conopco, Inc...(Tempesta, Carol)
April 20, 2023 Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carol M Tempesta on behalf of Conopco, Inc...(Tempesta, Carol)
April 19, 2023 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael J Deruve on behalf of Diane Farris..(Deruve, Michael)
April 19, 2023 Filing 75 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael DeRuve, Esq. dated April 19, 2023 re: Pretrial Conference Order. Document filed by Diane Farris..(Deruve, Michael)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/26/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/18/2023) (rro)
April 5, 2023 Filing 73 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for BW/IP International, Inc.. Document filed by BW/IP International, Inc...(Wells, Andrew)
April 5, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew John Wells on behalf of BW/IP International, Inc...(Wells, Andrew)
April 4, 2023 Filing 71 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve Corporation. Document filed by Flowserve Corporation..(LaSala, Joseph)
April 4, 2023 Filing 70 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Emerson Electric Co., Other Affiliate The J.R. Clarkson Company, LLC for Crosby Valve, LLC. Document filed by Crosby Valve, LLC..(LaSala, Joseph)
April 4, 2023 Filing 69 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Emerson Electric Co...(LaSala, Joseph)
April 4, 2023 Filing 68 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mueller Water Products, Inc. for Mueller Company, LLC. Document filed by Mueller Company, LLC..(LaSala, Joseph)
April 4, 2023 Filing 67 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Almax LLC for Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc.. Document filed by Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc...(LaSala, Joseph)
April 4, 2023 Filing 66 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Flowserve Corporation..(LaSala, Joseph) Modified on 4/5/2023 (lb).
April 4, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Joseph P. LaSala to RE-FILE Document Nos. #63 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #64 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #65 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and #62 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. These filings are deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
April 3, 2023 Filing 65 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Emerson Electric Co...(LaSala, Joseph) Modified on 4/4/2023 (lb).
April 3, 2023 Filing 64 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Mueller Company, LLC..(LaSala, Joseph) Modified on 4/4/2023 (lb).
April 3, 2023 Filing 63 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Crosby Valve, LLC..(LaSala, Joseph) Modified on 4/4/2023 (lb).
April 3, 2023 Filing 62 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc...(LaSala, Joseph) Modified on 4/4/2023 (lb).
April 3, 2023 Filing 61 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PFizer Inc.,..(Gasior, Joan)
April 3, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joan M. Gasior on behalf of PFizer Inc.,..(Gasior, Joan)
April 3, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Donald Richard Pugliese to RE-FILE Document No. #55 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
March 30, 2023 Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss . STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS. Document filed by Diane Farris..(Deruve, Michael)
March 30, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Melody Kozin on behalf of Redco Corporation..(Kozin, Nicole)
March 30, 2023 Filing 57 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC for Redco Corporation. Document filed by Redco Corporation..(Pehush, Tara)
March 30, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Lynne Pehush on behalf of Redco Corporation..(Pehush, Tara)
March 28, 2023 Filing 55 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Honeywell International, Inc...(Pugliese, Donald) Modified on 4/3/2023 (lb).
March 28, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald Richard Pugliese, Sr on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc...(Pugliese, Donald)
March 28, 2023 Filing 53 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Henkel Corporation..(O'Rourke, Philip)
March 28, 2023 Filing 52 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - COMPLAINT against Henkel Corporation. Document filed by Henkel Corporation..(O'Rourke, Philip) Modified on 3/28/2023 (gp)..
March 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Philip O'Rourke to RE-FILE Document #52 Complaint. Use the event type Proposed Order. (gp)
March 27, 2023 Filing 51 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Minerals Technologies Inc. for Specialty Minerals Inc.. Document filed by Specialty Minerals Inc...(Gasior, Joan)
March 27, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joan M. Gasior on behalf of Specialty Minerals Inc...(Gasior, Joan)
March 27, 2023 Filing 49 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Specialty Minerals Inc., Corporate Parent Minerals Technologies Inc. for Barretts Minerals Inc.. Document filed by Barretts Minerals Inc...(Gasior, Joan)
March 27, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joan M. Gasior on behalf of Barretts Minerals Inc...(Gasior, Joan)
March 24, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph P. LaSala on behalf of Mueller Company, LLC..(LaSala, Joseph)
March 24, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph P. LaSala on behalf of Emerson Electric Co...(LaSala, Joseph)
March 24, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph P. LaSala on behalf of Crosby Valve, LLC..(LaSala, Joseph)
March 24, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph P. LaSala on behalf of Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc...(LaSala, Joseph)
March 23, 2023 Filing 43 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent WestRock Company, Other Affiliate WestRock MWV, LLC for MW Custom Papers, LLC. Document filed by MW Custom Papers, LLC..(Dwyer, Patrick)
March 23, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Patrick Joseph Dwyer to RE-FILE Document No. #42 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE ENTERED INCORRECTLY;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
March 22, 2023 Filing 42 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE ENTERED INCORRECTLY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent WestRock Company, Other Affiliate WestRock MWV, LLC for MW Custom Papers, LLC. Document filed by MW Custom Papers, LLC..(Dwyer, Patrick) Modified on 3/23/2023 (lb).
March 22, 2023 Filing 41 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Natura & Co for Avon Products, Inc.. Document filed by Avon Products, Inc...(Seltzer, Whitney)
March 22, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Whitney Daye Seltzer on behalf of Avon Products, Inc...(Seltzer, Whitney)
March 22, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Patrick Joseph Dwyer to RE-FILE Document No. #37 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE ENTERED INCORRECTLY;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
March 21, 2023 Filing 39 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ford Motor Company..(Pennie, Nancy)
March 21, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy Loraine Pennie on behalf of Ford Motor Company..(Pennie, Nancy)
March 21, 2023 Filing 37 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE ENTERED INCORRECTLY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent WestRock Company, Other Affiliate WestRock MWV, LLC for MW Custom Papers, LLC. Document filed by MW Custom Papers, LLC..(Dwyer, Patrick) Modified on 3/22/2023 (lb).
March 21, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Joseph Dwyer on behalf of MW Custom Papers, LLC..(Dwyer, Patrick)
March 21, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph P. LaSala on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc...(LaSala, Joseph)
March 20, 2023 Filing 34 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand, Inc. for Gardner Denver, Inc.. Document filed by Gardner Denver, Inc...(Prelvukaj, Arian)
March 20, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arian Prelvukaj on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc...(Prelvukaj, Arian)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/20/23) (yv)
March 20, 2023 Filing 31 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Aventis Inc. for Chattem, Inc.. Document filed by Chattem, Inc...(Brown, Robert)
March 20, 2023 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Chattem, Inc...(Brown, Robert)
March 20, 2023 Filing 29 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Chattem, Inc...(Brown, Robert) Modified on 3/20/2023 (lb).
March 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Robert Dorrance Brown to RE-FILE Document No. #29 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
March 17, 2023 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company..(Montano, James)
March 17, 2023 Filing 27 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company..(Montano, James)
March 17, 2023 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Weil-McLain..(Goodearl, David)
March 17, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David James Goodearl on behalf of Weil-McLain..(Goodearl, David)
March 17, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by John Crane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration, #2 Supplement Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim, #3 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit SGP's NYCAL Standard Complaint for Personal Injury and W, #5 Exhibit Order in Trella, #6 Exhibit Order in Holczer, #7 Exhibit Order in Nybeck).(Halbardier, Suzanne)
March 16, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brendan James Tully on behalf of Diane Farris, Diane Farris..(Tully, Brendan)
March 16, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Judge Louis L. Stanton is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
March 14, 2023 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Velan Inc. for Velan Valve Corp.. Document filed by Velan Valve Corp...(DiMarco, Erik)
March 14, 2023 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc. for Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC. Document filed by Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC..(DiMarco, Erik)
March 14, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erik Christopher DiMarco on behalf of Velan Valve Corp...(DiMarco, Erik)
March 14, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erik Christopher DiMarco on behalf of Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC..(DiMarco, Erik)
March 14, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erik Christopher DiMarco on behalf of Colgate-Palmolive Company..(DiMarco, Erik)
March 14, 2023 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation for Warren Pumps, LLC. Document filed by Warren Pumps, LLC..(Goodearl, David)
March 14, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David James Goodearl on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC..(Goodearl, David)
March 14, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Olga Sekulic on behalf of Viad Corp..(Sekulic, Olga)
March 14, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ellen Gayle Margolis on behalf of Viad Corp..(Margolis, Ellen)
March 14, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph DiGregorio on behalf of John Crane, Inc...(DiGregorio, Joseph)
March 14, 2023 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Smiths Group PLC for John Crane, Inc.. Document filed by John Crane, Inc...(Halbardier, Suzanne)
March 14, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Oxamendi on behalf of Colgate-Palmolive Company..(Oxamendi, David)
March 14, 2023 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company..(Squitieri, Virginia)
March 14, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Virginia Paula Squitieri on behalf of Colgate-Palmolive Company..(Squitieri, Virginia)
March 14, 2023 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Capital Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Blackrock, Inc. for Viad Corp. Document filed by Viad Corp..(Margolis, Ellen)
March 14, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Jennifer H. Rearden is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
March 13, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Suzanne M. Halbardier to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
March 10, 2023 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Halbardier, Suzanne)
March 10, 2023 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by John Crane, Inc...(Halbardier, Suzanne) Modified on 3/13/2023 (lb).
March 10, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Suzanne M. Halbardier on behalf of John Crane, Inc...(Halbardier, Suzanne)
March 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Suzanne M. Halbardier on behalf of John Crane, Inc...(Halbardier, Suzanne)
March 10, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Halbardier, Suzanne) Modified on 3/10/2023 (jgo).
March 10, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 190027/2023..Document filed by John Crane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - SGP's NYCAL Standar Complaint for Personal Injury and Wrongful Death #2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Military Specifications, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Federal Specifications, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - MIL-P-17303C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - HH-P-131c, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - State Court Filings, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H -Supreme Notice of Filing Notice of Removal).(Halbardier, Suzanne)
March 10, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Suzanne M. Halbardier. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Plaintiff and all of defendants. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party names were modified to add party text and alias separately. (jgo)
March 10, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Suzanne M. Halbardier to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
March 10, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Suzanne M. Halbardier re: Document No. #2 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add parties: Diane Farris with party text 'as Fiduciary of the Estate of John Gallo, deceased', BASF Catalysts LLC with party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to Engelhard Corporation and its subsidiary Pita Realty Limited successor-by-merger to Eastern Magnesia Talc Company', Block Drug Company, Inc. with party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company', Brenntag North America, Inc. with party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.', Brenntag North America, Inc. with party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.', Brenntag Specialties LLC with alias 'formerly known as Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias 'Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.' and with party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to Whttaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.', Bristol-Myers Squibb Company with party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to Charles of the Ritz', BW/IP International, Inc. with party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to Byron Jackson Pump Company', Chattem, Inc. with party text 'a subsidiary of Sanofi-aventis U.S. LLC, sued as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation', Chattem, Inc. with party text 'a subsidiary of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LlC, sued as successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company', Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. with alias 'formerly known as Aqua-Chem, Inc. d/b/a Cleaver-Brooks Division' and party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to The Springfield Boiler Company', DCO LLC with party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to Victor Gasket Manufacturing Company', FMC Corporation with party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to Peerless Pump Company', FMC Corporation with party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, LLC', FMC Corporation with party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to Crosby Valve, Inc.', Honeywell International, Inc. with party text 'as successor-in-interest to Bendix Corporation', ITT, LLC with alias 'formerly known as ITT Inc.' alias 'formerly known as ITT Corporation, alias 'formerly known as ITT Industries, Inc.' and party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to Bell & Gossett', The Procter & Gamble Company with party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to The Gillette Comp any', R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc. with party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to R.T. Vanderbilt Comp any, Inc.', Special Ty Minerals Inc. with party text 'sued as subsidiary of Minerals Technologies Inc.', Viad Corp with alias 'formerly known as Viad Corporation' alias 'formerly known as The Dial Corporation' and party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to Grtscom-Russel Company', Zurn Industries, LLC with party text 'sued as successor-in-interest to Zurn Industries, Inc., and, Zurn Industries, LLC with party text 'as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
March 10, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 10, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Suzanne M. Halbardier. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: AS America, Inc.. The party was added to the case in error. (jgo)
March 10, 2023 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents The Procter & Gamble Company, R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc., Special Ty Minerals Inc., Viad Corp, Viad Corp, Viad Corp, Zurn Industries, LLC, Zurn Industries, LLC added. Party added pursuant to #2 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by John Crane, Inc.. Related document: #2 Notice of Removal,,..(Halbardier, Suzanne)
March 10, 2023 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Brenntag Specialties LLC added. Party added pursuant to #2 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by John Crane, Inc.. Related document: #2 Notice of Removal,,..(Halbardier, Suzanne)
March 10, 2023 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Brenntag Specialties LLC, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, BW/IP International, Inc, Chattem, Inc., Chattem, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #2 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by John Crane, Inc.. Related document: #2 Notice of Removal,,..(Halbardier, Suzanne)
March 10, 2023 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc, DCo LLC, FMC Corporation, FMC Corporation, FMC Corporation, Honeywell International, INc., ITT, LLC, ITT, LLC, ITT, LLC, ITT, LLC added. Party added pursuant to #2 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by John Crane, Inc.. Related document: #2 Notice of Removal,,..(Halbardier, Suzanne)
March 10, 2023 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Brenntag North America, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #2 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by John Crane, Inc.. Related document: #2 Notice of Removal,,..(Halbardier, Suzanne)
March 10, 2023 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Block Drug Company, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #2 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by John Crane, Inc.. Related document: #2 Notice of Removal,,..(Halbardier, Suzanne)
March 10, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 10, 2023 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 10, 2023 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners John Crane, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #2 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by John Crane, Inc.. Related document: #2 Notice of Removal,,..(Halbardier, Suzanne)
March 10, 2023 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents BASF Catalysts LLC added. Party added pursuant to #2 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by John Crane, Inc.. Related document: #2 Notice of Removal,,..(Halbardier, Suzanne)
March 9, 2023 Filing 1 FILING ERROR DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 190027/2023. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27448028).Document filed by John Crane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - SGP's NYCAL Standar Complaint for Personal Injury and Wrongful Death #2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Military Specifications, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Federal Specifications, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - MIL-P-17303C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - HH-P-131c, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - State Court Filings, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H -Supreme Notice of Filing Notice of Removal).(Halbardier, Suzanne) Modified on 3/10/2023 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farris v. Avon Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Brenntag Specialties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: DCO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: ITT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Viad Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. formerly known as Aqua-Chem, Inc. d/b/a Cleaver-Brooks Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Diane Farris
Represented By: Brendan James Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: BASF Catalysts LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Block Drug Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Brenntag North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Chattem, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: ITT Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: ITT Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: R. T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Viad Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: The Dial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Brenntag Specialties, Inc., alias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: BW/IP International, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: The Procter & Gamble Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Special Ty Minerals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Zurn Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Zurn Industries, LLC as successor-in-interest to Erie City Iron Works d/b/a Keystone Boiler Works, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Burnham LLC
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Empire Comfort Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Margot Nicole Wilensky
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Dennis Enrique Vega
Represented By: Michael Alan Tanenbaum
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Edelbrock, LLC
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Avon Products, Inc.
Represented By: Whitney Daye Seltzer
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: John Samuel Howarth
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Armstrong International, Inc. As America, Inc.
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Barretts Minerals Inc.
Represented By: Joan M. Gasior
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. LaSala
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By: Virginia Paula Squitieri
Represented By: David Oxamendi
Represented By: Erik Christopher DiMarco
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Conopco, Inc.
Represented By: Carol M Tempesta
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Dap Products, Inc.
Represented By: John Samuel Howarth
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
Represented By: Timothy M. McCann
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. LaSala
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Arian Prelvukaj
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Dennis Vega
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Holley Performance Products, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney Dunn
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Brier Kromberg
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: MW Custom Papers, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Dwyer
Represented By: Yonit Caplow
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: The Proctor & Gamble Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Unilever United States, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: David James Goodearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Watts Water Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Vincent George Saccomando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GG of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps (N.Y.) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse TEC LLC
Represented By: Anna Maria DiLonardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Erik Christopher DiMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. sued individually formerly known as Aqua-Chem, Inc. doing business as Cleaver-Brooks Division
Represented By: Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP International, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve, LLC
Represented By: Joseph P. LaSala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Brier Kromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECR International, Inc.
Represented By: Arian Prelvukaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.
Represented By: Joseph P. LaSala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire, Inc.
Represented By: Margot Nicole Wilensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Nancy Loraine Pennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Michael Alan Tanenbaum
Represented By: Dennis Enrique Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAPA
Represented By: Vincent George Saccomando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higbee, Inc.
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higbee Gaskets and Sealing Products, Inc.
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Represented By: Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henkel Corporation
Represented By: Philip Justin O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Company LLC
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.W. Henry Company
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollingsworth & Vose Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Suzanne M. Halbardier
Represented By: Joseph DiGregorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg Warner Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Anna Maria DiLonardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Enrique Vega
Represented By: Michael Alan Tanenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Dennis Enrique Vega
Represented By: Michael Alan Tanenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc. successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f
Represented By: Dennis Enrique Vega
Represented By: Michael Alan Tanenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Alfred J Sargente
Represented By: Erich Gleber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation doing business as Crane Co.
Represented By: Tara Lynne Pehush
Represented By: Nicole Melody Kozin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rheem Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Minerals Inc.
Represented By: Joan M. Gasior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Pump Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC
Represented By: Erik Christopher DiMarco
Represented By: Michael Edward Morley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Erik Christopher DiMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil-McLain
Represented By: David James Goodearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC.
Represented By: Keith Michael O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edelbrock Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aqua-Chem, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aqua-Chem, Inc. d
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Tara Lynne Pehush
Represented By: Nicole Melody Kozin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Laura Beth Hollman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Eastern Magnesia Talc Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Keith Michael O'Connor
Represented By: Joseph P. LaSala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: The H.B. Smith Company, Incorporated a division of Mestek, Inc., and d/b/a Smith Cast iron Boilers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Henkel Consumer Goods Inc.
Represented By: Philip Justin O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Lennox Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Brier Kromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Mueller Company, LLC
Represented By: Joseph P. LaSala
Represented By: Suzanne M. Halbardier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: PFizer Inc.,
Represented By: Joan M. Gasior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Brier Kromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: Tara Lynne Pehush
Represented By: Nicole Melody Kozin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Lennox International, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Brier Kromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?