Pineda v. Rotary Lift et al
Plaintiff: Julio Pineda
Defendant: Rotary Lift, Vehicle Service Group, LLC and Dover Corporation
Case Number: 1:2023cv02405
Filed: March 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pl Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: The case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 5/12/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 6/23/2023. Motions due by 9/12/2023. Responses due by 9/26/2023 Replies due by 10/3/2023. Deposition due by 8/8/2023. Discovery due by 8/29/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 10/10/2023. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/28/2023) (kv)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harris Lee Marks on behalf of Julio Pineda..(Marks, Harris)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 4/28/2023, ( Oral Argument set for 10/10/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff in courtroom 14B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan courthouse 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY.). (Kotowski, Linda)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Dover Corporation, Rotary Lift, Vehicle Service Group, LLC..(Schwartz, Daniel)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Mark Schwartz on behalf of Dover Corporation, Rotary Lift, Vehicle Service Group, LLC..(Schwartz, Daniel)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 4/28/2023, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:00am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 4/28/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/14/2023) (kv)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schaeffer-Roth, Sarah)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Dover Corporation for Vehicle Service Group, LLC. Document filed by Dover Corporation, Rotary Lift, Vehicle Service Group, LLC..(Schaeffer-Roth, Sarah)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy William Salter on behalf of Dover Corporation, Rotary Lift, Vehicle Service Group, LLC..(Salter, Timothy)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Sarah Henriette Emili Schaeffer-Roth to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Sarah Henriette Emili Schaeffer-Roth to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF for the civil cover sheet is not legible; multiple Citizenship Defendant codes was selected under Citizenship of Principal Parties; the PDF was not signed and dated by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Sarah Henriette Emili Schaeffer-Roth. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand $10,000,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dover Corporation, Rotary Lift, Vehicle Service Group, LLC..(Schaeffer-Roth, Sarah) Modified on 3/22/2023 (lb).
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schaeffer-Roth, Sarah) Modified on 3/22/2023 (jgo).
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 159635/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27499843).Document filed by Dover Corporation, Vehicle Service Group, LLC, Rotary Lift. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Appearance and Stipulation, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dover Corporation Answer, #5 Exhibit 5- Vehicle Service Group Answer, #6 Exhibit 6 - Request for Supplemental Demand, #7 Exhibit 7 - Motion to Compel, #8 Exhibit 8 - Response to Requet for Suppemental Demand).(Schaeffer-Roth, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pineda v. Rotary Lift et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Pineda
Represented By: Harris Lee Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rotary Lift
Represented By: Sarah Henriette Emili Schaeffer-Roth
Represented By: Daniel Mark Schwartz
Represented By: Timothy William Salter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vehicle Service Group, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Henriette Emili Schaeffer-Roth
Represented By: Daniel Mark Schwartz
Represented By: Timothy William Salter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover Corporation
Represented By: Sarah Henriette Emili Schaeffer-Roth
Represented By: Daniel Mark Schwartz
Represented By: Timothy William Salter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?