Reif et al v. The Art Institute of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Reif, David Fraenkel and Milos Vavra
Defendant: The Art Institute of Chicago and An Artwork, Russian Prisoner of War (1916) by the Artist Egon Schiele
Case Number: 1:2023cv02443
Filed: March 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The Court received the attached correspondence, which the Court now forwards to the parties. The Clerk is directed to enter this Order in 22-cv-10625, 23-cv-346, 23-cv-2108, 23-cv-3009, and 23-cv-2443. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/05/2023) (ama)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: As discussed during the telephone conference this afternoon, all of the related actions except Reif v. Republic of Austria, No. 22-cv-10625, are consolidated for purposes of pretrial. The time for the defendants in those actions (Reif v. Carnegie Institute, No. 23-cv-346; Reif v. Oberlin College, No.23-cv-2108; Reif v. The Santa Barbara Museum of Art, No. 23-cv- 3009; and Reif v. The Art Institute of Chicago, No. 23-cv-2443) to move or answer with respect to the operative complaints is extended to Thursday, June 8, 2023. The plaintiffs may file an amended complaint in the Santa Barbara action by Monday, April 24, 2023. The plaintiffs should update the Court at the end of each month on the efforts to serve the defendants in the Austria action. Discovery is stayed in the Carnegie, Oberlin, Santa Barbara, and Art Institute of Chicago actions pending a decision on any motions to dismiss in those actions. To the extent there are any other outstanding deadlines imposed by Judge Torres, those are no longer operable. The Clerk is directed to enter this Order in 22-cv-10625, 23-cv-346, 23-cv-2108, 23-cv-3009, and 23-cv-2443. SO ORDERED., ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/24/2023.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/17/2023) (ama)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: On April 13, 2023, this Court was reassigned five related cases: 22-cv-10625, 23-cv-346, 23-cv-2108, 23-cv-3009, and 23-cv-2443. The parties in all five actions are directed to appear for a telephone conference on Monday, April 17, 2023 at noon to discuss the status of these actions. Dial-in: 888-363-4749, with access code 8140049. The Clerk is directed to enter this Order in 22-cv-10625, 23-cv-346, 23-cv-2108, 23-cv-3009, and 23-cv-2443. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/14/2023) ( Telephone Conference set for 4/17/2023 at 12:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (ks)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #22 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Jessica Lonergan dated April 14, 2023.. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/14/2023) The Art Institute of Chicago answer due 5/12/2023 (ks)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Jessica Lonergan dated April 14, 2023. Document filed by The Art Institute of Chicago..(Lonergan, Jessica)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case..(aea)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Accordingly: 1. The Court has already ruled on Carnegie Institute and Oberlin College's request that a single motion to dismiss briefing schedule be set for the related cases. Carnegie Institute, 23 Civ. 346, ECF No. 29. If Oberlin College intends to file a motion to dismiss in Reif v. Oberlin College, it is directed to either do so in accordance with the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases or explain whether it intends to rely on the pre-motion letter filed in Reif v. Carnegie Institute so Plaintiffs are able to respond. The same applies to AIC. The Court shall not adjourn Carnegie Institute's April 27, 2023 deadline to file its motion to dismiss on this basis. Accordingly, Carnegie Institute and Oberlin College's request is DENIED without prejudice to renewal. 2. By April 17, 2023, Plaintiffs shall state their position on Defendants' proposal that the cases be consolidated for pretrial purposes, but not for trial purposes. On April 11, 2023, another related case, Reif v. The Santa Barbara Museum of Art, 23 Civ. 3009, ECF No. 1, was removed to this Court. By April 17, 2023, Plaintiffs shall inform the Court whether there are or will be any other actions that that the Court should be aware of as it considers consolidation of the above-captioned cases. 3. By April 17, 2023, Defendant The Santa Barbara Museum of Art shall submit any opposition to consolidation. This order does not stay any of the applicable deadlines in each of the above captioned cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/12/2023) (kv)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jessica Lonergan dated April 10, 2023 re: partial opposition to the Court's suggested consolidation. Document filed by The Art Institute of Chicago..(Lonergan, Jessica)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Eric P. Tuttle to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (vpdt)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Luis Li to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (vpdt)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Eric P. Tuttle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27562340. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (dsh)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Luis Li to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27561729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (dsh)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Eric P. Tuttle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27562340. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Art Institute of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit E. Tuttle Affidavit ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Tuttle, Eric)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Luis Li to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27561729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Art Institute of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit L. Li Affidavit ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Li, Luis)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against An Artwork, Russian Prisoner of War (1916) by the Artist Egon Schiele, The Art Institute of Chicago.Document filed by Timothy Reif, Milos Vavra, David Fraenkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Dr. Jonathan Petropoulos, #2 Exhibit A - Petropoulos CV, #3 Exhibit B - 1925 Wurthle Gallery, #4 Exhibit C - Kallir Grunbaum Correspondence, #5 Exhibit D - Kallir Excerpt, #6 Exhibit E - Gutekunst and Klipstein Catalogue, #7 Exhibit F - Receipt, #8 Exhibit G - Carnegie Museum 2005 Production, #9 Exhibit H - Boston 1960 Schiele Exhibition, #10 Exhibit I - Power of Attorney, #11 Exhibit J - Jewish Property Declaration, #12 Exhibit K- Aryan Trustee, #13 Exhibit L - Elisabeth Grunbaum Property Declaration, #14 Exhibit M - Certificate of Heirship, #15 Exhibit N - Kostohryz Declaration, #16 Exhibit 2 - Falkenhausen Letter, #17 Exhibit 3 - Mountain Landscape, #18 Exhibit 4 - NYT Article, #19 Exhibit 5 - Leopold Collection, #20 Exhibit 6 - BC Holland Invoice and Receipt, #21 Exhibit 7 - Cuno Testimony).(Dowd, Raymond)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court is inclined to consolidate Reif v. Carnegie Institute, 23 Civ. 346, with Reif v. Oberlin College, 23 Civ. 2108, and Reif v. The Art Institute of Chicago, 23 Civ. 2443, and appoint Plaintiffs' counsel as lead counsel. Any opposition to consolidation shall be filed by April 10, 2023. This order does not stay any of the applicable deadlines in each of the above-captioned cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/27/2023) ( Responses due by 4/10/2023) (ks)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (unopposed) addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jessica Lonergan dated March 24, 2023.. GRANTED. By April 14, 2023, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/27/2023) The Art Institute of Chicago answer due 4/14/2023 (ks)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claudia Grossman Jaffe on behalf of David Fraenkel, Timothy Reif, Milos Vavra..(Jaffe, Claudia)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (unopposed) addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jessica Lonergan dated March 24, 2023. Document filed by An Artwork, Russian Prisoner of War (1916) by the Artist Egon Schiele, The Art Institute of Chicago..(Lonergan, Jessica)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by May 22, 2023, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/23/2023) (ks)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b) (5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/23/2023) (ks)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by May 22, 2023, e-mail a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, to Orders_and_Judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by May 22, 2023, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/23/2023) (ks)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Plaintiffs on 3/23/2023. Document filed by An Artwork, Russian Prisoner of War (1916) by the Artist Egon Schiele, The Art Institute of Chicago..(Lonergan, Jessica)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Raymond Dowd on behalf of David Fraenkel, Timothy Reif, Milos Vavra..(Dowd, Raymond)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED TO Judge Analisa Torres as possibly related to 22-cv-10625 (AT), 23-cv-2108 (AT), 23-cv-346 (AT). (vf)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-10625-AT. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Lonergan on behalf of An Artwork, Russian Prisoner of War (1916) by the Artist Egon Schiele, The Art Institute of Chicago..(Lonergan, Jessica)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Art Institute of Chicago..(Lonergan, Jessica)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 23-cv-2108 (AT), 23-cv-346 (AT), 22-cv-10625 (AT). Document filed by The Art Institute of Chicago..(Lonergan, Jessica)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lonergan, Jessica)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 654836/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27505992).Document filed by The Art Institute of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 4), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 4), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 4), #4 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 4)).(Lonergan, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reif et al v. The Art Institute of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Reif
Represented By: Claudia Grossman Jaffe
Represented By: Raymond Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fraenkel
Represented By: Claudia Grossman Jaffe
Represented By: Raymond Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milos Vavra
Represented By: Claudia Grossman Jaffe
Represented By: Raymond Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Art Institute of Chicago
Represented By: Jessica Lonergan
Represented By: Eric Preston Tuttle
Represented By: Luis Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: An Artwork, Russian Prisoner of War (1916) by the Artist Egon Schiele
Represented By: Jessica Lonergan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?