Matthew Stein et al v. Skatteforvaltningen
Case Number: 1:2023cv02508
Filed: February 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 100 Letter Motion for Discovery. In sum, McGee does not come remotely close to justifying his broad requests on a foreign prosecuting authority that has brought criminal charges against him and the named plaintiffs . Given their myriad flaws, the Court denies McGee's requests in full and respectfully requests the Clerk of Court to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 100. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/27/2024) (va) (Main Document 105 replaced on 3/27/2024) (va).
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: granting in part 96 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted in part. Stein, Lhote, and McGee are directed to propound their proposed discovery requests to SKAT by Sunday, March 17, 2024 at 12:00 p.m. The deadline to submit the requests to the Court is Monday, March 18, 2024 at 12:00 p.m. Submissions must be made by that deadline both electronically via ECF and in hard copy to the Court. The moving party shall submit two single-sided copies. Any objections to these requests must be submitted to the Court by Tuesday, March 19, 2024 at 12:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/14/2024) (ama)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 73 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference; denying 74 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference; denying 75 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. For the foregoing reasons, and except as noted, movants' discovery motions are denied. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at ECF Nos. 73, 74, and 75. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/1/2024) (vfr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthew Stein et al v. Skatteforvaltningen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?